Thomas v. Kohl's Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Patricia Thomas
Defendant: Kohl's Corporation and Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv05857
Filed: August 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Amy J. St. Eve
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2019 Filing 112 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Pursuant to the joint stipulation of dismissal #111 , and pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), all claims in this matter are dismissed with prejudice in their entirety pursuant to settlement. Any pending motions or schedules in this case are stricken as moot. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (is, )
April 17, 2019 Filing 111 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal (Sender, Jennifer)
January 29, 2019 Filing 110 MOTION by Plaintiff Patricia Thomasin limine PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE #6 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE TO SUPPORT DEFENDANTS' AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES NOS. FIVE THROUGH NINE AND 11 (Sender, Jennifer)
January 29, 2019 Filing 109 MOTION by Plaintiff Patricia Thomasin limine PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE #5 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT OF ALTERNATIVE ROUTES OF ACCESS (Sender, Jennifer)
January 29, 2019 Filing 108 MOTION by Plaintiff Patricia Thomasin limine PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE #4 TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFF'S LAY TESTIMONY REGARDING INJUNCTIVE RELIEF SOUGHT OR THE COSTS RELATED TO MODIFICATIONS (Sender, Jennifer)
January 29, 2019 Filing 107 MOTION by Plaintiff Patricia Thomasin limine PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE #3 TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY REGARDING WHETHER PLAINTIFF REQUESTED ASSISTANCE (Sender, Jennifer)
January 29, 2019 Filing 106 MOTION by Plaintiff Patricia Thomasin limine PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE #2 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF KOHL'S POLICY OR PRACTICE TO ASSIST CUSTOMERS WITH DISABILITIES (Sender, Jennifer)
January 29, 2019 Filing 105 MOTION by Plaintiff Patricia Thomasin limine PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE #1 TO EXCLUDE WITNESSES NOT PREVIOUSLY DISCLOSED (Sender, Jennifer)
January 29, 2019 Filing 104 TRIAL Brief PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW by Patricia Thomas (Sender, Jennifer)
January 29, 2019 Filing 103 TRIAL Brief PLAINTIFF'S TRIAL BRIEF by Patricia Thomas (Sender, Jennifer)
January 29, 2019 Filing 102 PROPOSED Pretrial Order [PROPOSED] FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Exhibits expected to be offered in evidence)(Sender, Jennifer)
January 23, 2019 Filing 101 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Status hearing held on 1/23/2019. Parties are to exchange all documents and exhibits to be introduced into evidence by 6/7/2019. Any objections to be filed by 6/21/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/9/2019 at 10:00 AM. Bench Trial set for 7/29/2019 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (is, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 100 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Status hearing set for 1/10/2019 is stricken and reset to 1/23/2019 at 09:30 AM. on Court's own motion. Mailed notice (is, )
December 3, 2018 Filing 99 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Status hearing set for 12/5/2018 is stricken and reset to 1/10/2019 at 09:30 AM. on Court's own motion. Mailed notice (is, )
November 13, 2018 Filing 98 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Status hearing set for 11/14/2018 is stricken and reset to 12/5/2018 at 09:30 AM. on request of parties. Mailed notice (is, )
November 5, 2018 Filing 97 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Status hearing set for 11/6/2018 is stricken and reset to 11/14/2018 at 09:30 AM. on Court's own motion. Mailed notice (is, )
October 19, 2018 Filing 96 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Status hearing set for 10/23/2018 is stricken and reset to 11/6/2018 at 09:30 AM. on request of parties. Mailed notice (is, )
September 27, 2018 Filing 95 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: In court hearing held on 9/27/2018. Status hearing set for 10/23/2018 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (is, )
September 27, 2018 Filing 94 MOTION by Defendant Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.in limine #5 to exclude Eugene Kelly's Deposition Testimony (Griswold, Joel)
September 27, 2018 Filing 93 MOTION by Defendant Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.in limine #4 to exclude evidence or argument regarding other stores (Griswold, Joel)
September 27, 2018 Filing 92 MOTION by Defendant Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.in limine #3 to exclude evidence or argument that the ADA requires implementation of any policy or training regarding distance between movable racks (Griswold, Joel)
September 27, 2018 Filing 91 MOTION by Defendant Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.in limine #2 to exclude evidence or argument that the ADA requires any definite distance between movable racks (Griswold, Joel)
September 27, 2018 Filing 90 MOTION by Defendant Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.in limine #1 to exclude evidence or argument regarding readily achievable remediation plan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Griswold, Joel)
September 27, 2018 Filing 89 Defendant's Combined Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, and Trial Brief by Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. (Griswold, Joel)
September 27, 2018 Filing 88 Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. (Griswold, Joel)
September 26, 2018 Filing 87 MOTION by Plaintiff Patricia Thomas for leave to file Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Motion Pursuant to F.R.C.P. Rule 16(c)(2)(A) Motion to Narrow Issues (Sender, Jennifer)
September 24, 2018 Filing 86 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: The Court having directed that this case will be resolved by a trial, all pending motions #40 are stricken. Mailed notice (is, )
September 6, 2018 Filing 85 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Patricia Thomas by Jonathan Smith (Smith, Jonathan)
August 30, 2018 Filing 84 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Defendants' unopposed request for an extension of the pretrial submission deadline #82 is granted in part. All pretrial submissions shall be presented in open court on 9/27/2018 at 10:30 a.m. No further extensions will be granted. Motion hearing set for 9/11/2018 and status hearing of 9/13/2018 are stricken and no appearance is required. Mailed notice (is, )
August 30, 2018 Filing 83 Unopposed NOTICE of Motion by Joel Griswold for presentment of motion for extension of time to file #82 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 9/11/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Griswold, Joel)
August 30, 2018 Filing 82 MOTION by Defendant Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. for extension of time to file / Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline for Pretrial Submissions and Rescheduling Pre-Trial Hearing (Griswold, Joel)
August 29, 2018 Filing 81 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Status hearing set for 9/11/2018 is stricken and reset to 9/13/2018 at 09:30 AM. on Court's own motion. Mailed notice (is, )
August 20, 2018 Filing 80 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Joint motion to extend deadline for pretrial submissions #78 is granted. Final Pretrial Order due by 9/6/2018 including all motions in limine, witnesses list and exhibits list. Motion hearing noticed for 8/21/2018 is stricken and no appearance is necessary. Mailed notice (is, )
August 17, 2018 Filing 79 NOTICE of Motion by Bonnie Keane DelGobbo for presentment of extension of time #78 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 8/21/2018 at 09:30 AM. (DelGobbo, Bonnie)
August 17, 2018 Filing 78 MOTION by Defendants Kohl's Corporation, Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. for extension of time for pretrial submissions (Joint) (DelGobbo, Bonnie)
July 24, 2018 Filing 77 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Status hearing held on 7/24/2018. Final Pretrial Order due by 8/23/2018 including all motions in limine, witnesses list and exhibits list. Judge Guzman's standing order regarding the filing of a Final Pretrial Order is posted on the Court's website: www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Status hearing set for 9/11/2018 at 09:30 AM. to set final pretrial conference and trial dates. Mailed notice (is, )
July 17, 2018 Filing 76 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Status hearing set for 7/18/2018 is stricken and reset to 7/24/2018 at 10:00 AM. on Court's own motion. Mailed notice (is, )
June 19, 2018 Filing 75 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Defendant's unopposed motion to postpone status hearing #73 is granted. Status hearing set for 6/28/2018 is stricken and reset to 7/18/2018 at 10:00 AM. Motion hearing noticed for 6/21/2018 is stricken and no appearance is necessary. Mailed notice (is, )
June 15, 2018 Filing 74 Unopposed NOTICE of Motion by Bonnie Keane DelGobbo for presentment of motion to reset #73 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 6/21/2018 at 09:30 AM. (DelGobbo, Bonnie)
June 15, 2018 Filing 73 MOTION by Defendant Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. to reset Status Hearing by two weeks (DelGobbo, Bonnie)
June 6, 2018 Filing 72 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Status hearing held on 6/6/2018. Plaintiff to designate experts including their reports by 7/6/2018. Defendants' designation of experts and reports due by 8/6/2018. Status hearing set for 6/28/2018 at 10:00 AM. Mailed notice (is, )
June 6, 2018 Filing 71 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 6/6/2018: Defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings #34 and Plaintiff's motion to transfer the case #18 are denied. Plaintiff's motion for alternative relief #58 is denied without prejudice to renewal at the appropriate time. [For further details see Statement]. Mailed notice(is, )
June 5, 2018 Filing 70 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Plaintiff's motion for leave to cite subsequent supplemental authority #68 is granted. Motion hearing noticed for 6/14/2018 is stricken and no appearance is required. Mailed notice (is, )
June 5, 2018 Filing 69 Plaintiff's Notice of Motion to present Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Cite Subsequent Supplemental Authority NOTICE of Motion by Jennifer Lundy Sender for presentment of motion for leave to file #68 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 6/14/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Sender, Jennifer)
June 5, 2018 Filing 68 MOTION by Plaintiff Patricia Thomas for leave to file Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Cite Subsequent Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- 6/4/18 Order)(Sender, Jennifer)
May 30, 2018 Filing 67 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Status hearing set for Wednesday, June 6, 2018 at 10:30 a.m. Counsel with knowledge of the case is directed to appear. Mailed notice (is, )
May 23, 2018 Filing 66 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that cases previously assigned to the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve requires reassignment; therefore It is hereby ordered that the cases on the attached list are to be reassigned to the other judges of this Court as indicated, pursuant to Local Rule 40.1(f) within the guidelines of IOP 16. Case reassigned to the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman for all further proceedings. Honorable Amy J. St. Eve no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/23/2018. (ph, )
May 8, 2018 Filing 65 REPLY by Plaintiff Patricia Thomas to motion to transfer case #18 , motion to transfer case #58 Reply in Support of Her Request for Alternative Relief Concerning Her Motion for Transfer of Venue (Sender, Jennifer)
May 1, 2018 Filing 64 RESPONSE by Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Patricia Thomas to transfer case Plaintiff's Request for Alternative Relief Concerning Her Motion for Transfer of Venue #58 (Griswold, Joel)
April 23, 2018 Filing 63 REPLY by Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. to response in opposition to motion, #57 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Thomas' Answers to Interrogatories)(Griswold, Joel)
April 23, 2018 Filing 62 REPLY by Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. to memorandum in opposition to motion, #56 (DelGobbo, Bonnie)
April 17, 2018 Filing 61 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Status hearing held by phone. Parties are unable to resolve this matter at this time. All matters relating to the referral of this action having been concluded, the referral is closed and the case is returned to the assigned District Judge. Mailed notice (ma,)
April 17, 2018 Filing 60 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve:Motion hearing held on 4/17/2018. Plaintiff's request for alternative relief concerning her motion for transfer of venue #58 is entered. Response by 5/1/18. Reply by 5/8/18. Mailed notice (kef, )
April 10, 2018 Filing 59 Plaintiff's Request for Alternative Relief Concerning Her Motion for Transfer of Venue NOTICE of Motion by Jennifer Lundy Sender for presentment of motion to transfer case #58 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 4/17/2018 at 08:30 AM. (Sender, Jennifer)
April 10, 2018 Filing 58 MOTION by Plaintiff Patricia Thomas to transfer case Plaintiff's Request for Alternative Relief Concerning Her Motion for Transfer of Venue (Sender, Jennifer)
April 10, 2018 Filing 57 RESPONSE by Patricia Thomasin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. for reconsideration regarding memorandum opinion and order #38 , order on motion for summary judgment, terminate deadlines and hearings, set/reset hearings, add and terminate parties,,,, #37 #40 Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Reconsider Summary Judgment Order and Opinion [Doc. 38] (Sender, Jennifer)
April 10, 2018 Filing 56 MEMORANDUM by Patricia Thomas in Opposition to motion for judgment on the pleadings #34 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Handley, Matthew)
April 10, 2018 Filing 55 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Status hearing held by phone and continued to April 17, 2018, at 2:30 p.m. by phone. Parties are to use the same call-in information. Parties are still considering and weighing settlement options. Mailed notice (ma,)
April 5, 2018 Filing 54 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve:Status hearing held on 4/5/2018 and continued to 6/6/2018 at 08:30 AM. Parties are directed to contact the courtroom deputy, 312/435-5879, after the phone call with Magistrate Judge Kim. Mailed notice (kef, )
April 4, 2018 Filing 53 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Defendants' motion for reconsideration #40 and motion for judgment on the pleadings #34 are entered. Plaintiff's responses shall be filed by 4/16/18. Replies by 4/23/18. Status hearing remains set for 4/5/18 at 8:30 a.m. Mailed notice (kef, )
March 29, 2018 Filing 52 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: In-person settlement conference held. Parties were unable to resolve the matter at this time. Parties are to reconsider the settlement issues discussed and contact the court by phone or by email if they wish to confer further about them confidentially. A status hearing is scheduled for April 10, 2018, at 9:30 a.m. by phone to discuss whether further settlement discussions would be productive. Parties are to use the same call-in information. Mailed notice (ma,)
February 27, 2018 Filing 51 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Parties have confirmed that they would like to move forward with the in-person settlement conference on March 29, 2018. Plaintiff to provide a written global settlement position to Defendant, with a copy to the court (settlement_statement_kim@ilnd.uscourts.gov) by March 15, 2018. Given the nature of this case, and the related cases to be discuss at the settlement conference, Plaintiff is urged to provide specific provisions she prefers to include in a settlement agreement. Defendant to respond in writing, with a copy to the court, by March 22, 2018. Defendant must also provide a draft settlement and release to Plaintiff along with its position statement so that Plaintiff is advised of the collateral terms Defendant requires to resolve this matter. Defendant is encouraged to incorporate those specific settlement provisions, demanded by Plaintiff, it is willing to accept, either in full or with modifications, into the draft settlement agreement. If the settlement position statements, along with exhibits, are more than 10 pages, parties must submit a hard copy by hand delivery or by mail to Chambers 1000. These settlement position statements are not to be filed with the clerk's office. Mailed notice (ma,)
February 26, 2018 Filing 50 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 2/12/18 before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve. Court Reporter Contact Information: Joseph Rickhoff, 312-435-5562, joseph_rickhoff@ilnd.uscourts.gov.

< Redaction Request due 3/19/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/29/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/29/2018. (Rickhoff, Joseph)
February 26, 2018 Filing 49 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Motion hearing held on 2/26/18. Defendant's motion to stay case pending completion of settlement conference #46 is granted. Responses to the pending motions shall be filed ten days after the settlement conference. Replies shall be filed 17 days after the settlement conference. Status hearing set for 3/12/18 is stricken and reset to 4/5/18 at 8:30 a.m. (as opposed to the 4/19/18 date given in open court). Mailed notice (kef, )
February 26, 2018 Filing 48 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Preliminary settlement discussion held by phone. An in-person settlement conference is scheduled for March 29, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. in courtroom 1019. If this date and time pose a scheduling conflict for those who are required to appear, parties are to contact the court by noon tomorrow. If the settlement conference must be rescheduled, it will be rescheduled for March 30, 2018. Parties are ordered to review and following this court's standing order on "Settlement Conferences" on its webpage. The court will enter a follow-up order setting a schedule for exchanging settlement position statements once the parties confirm the in-person settlement conference date. Mailed notice (ma,)
February 19, 2018 Filing 47 NOTICE of Motion by Bonnie Keane DelGobbo for presentment of motion to stay #46 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 2/26/2018 at 08:30 AM. (DelGobbo, Bonnie)
February 19, 2018 Filing 46 MOTION by Defendant Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. to stay case pending completion of settlement conference (DelGobbo, Bonnie) Modified on 2/20/2018 (sm, ).
February 16, 2018 Filing 45 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: A preliminary settlement discussion with the attorneys of record is scheduled for February 26, 2018, at 8:30 a.m. by phone. The conference call number is (877) 336-1839 and the passcode is 4333213. Mailed notice (ma,)
February 16, 2018 Filing 44 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Young B. Kim for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: settlement conference.(kef, )Mailed notice.
February 16, 2018 Filing 43 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Defendants' motion for reconsideration #40 is entered. Response by 2/26/18. Reply by 3/5/18. No appearance is required on the 2/21/18 notice motion date. Mailed notice (kef, )
February 15, 2018 Filing 42 NOTICE of Motion by Joel Griswold for presentment of motion for reconsideration, #40 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 2/21/2018 at 08:30 AM. (Griswold, Joel)
February 15, 2018 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM by Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. in support of motion for reconsideration, #40 (Griswold, Joel)
February 15, 2018 Filing 40 MOTION by Defendant Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. for reconsideration regarding memorandum opinion and order #38 , order on motion for summary judgment, terminate deadlines and hearings, set/reset hearings, add and terminate parties,,,, #37 (Griswold, Joel)
February 12, 2018 Filing 39 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve:Status hearing held on 2/12/2018 and continued to 3/12/18 at 8:30 a.m. Defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings #34 is entered. Response by 3/5/18. Reply by 3/19/18. Parties are directed to contact the courtroom deputy, 312/435-5879, by 2/16/18 to inform the court whether or not the parties are interested in participating in a settlement conference. Mailed notice (kef, )
February 5, 2018 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 2/5/2018:Mailed notice(kef, )
February 5, 2018 Filing 37 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: The Court grants in part and denies in part Defendants' motion for summary judgment. #12 . Kohl's Corporation (a Wisconsin corporation) terminated. Status hearing set for 2/15/18 is stricken and reset to 2/12/2018 at 08:30 AM. [For further details, see separate Memorandum Opinion and Order.] Mailed notice (kef, )
February 2, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE of Motion by Joel Griswold for presentment of motion for judgment on the pleadings #34 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 2/12/2018 at 08:30 AM. (Griswold, Joel)
February 2, 2018 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM by Kohl's Corporation, Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. in support of motion for judgment on the pleadings #34 Based on Res Judicata (Griswold, Joel)
February 2, 2018 Filing 34 MOTION by Defendants Kohl's Corporation, Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. for judgment on the pleadings Based on Res Judicata (Griswold, Joel)
December 20, 2017 Filing 33 RESPONSE by Kohl's Corporation, Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Patricia Thomas to transfer case Plaintiff's Motion for Transfer #18 (Griswold, Joel)
December 12, 2017 Filing 32 RESPONSE by Defendants Kohl's Corporation, Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. to Response,,, #26 Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Rule 56.1 Statement of Additional Facts (McIlwee, John)
December 12, 2017 Filing 31 REPLY by Defendants Kohl's Corporation, Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. to motion for summary judgment #12 (McIlwee, John)
November 29, 2017 Filing 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Motion hearing held on 11/29/2017. Plaintiff's motion to transfer #19 is entered. Response by 12/20/17. Mailed notice (kef, )
November 29, 2017 Filing 29 SEALED RESPONSE by Patricia Thomas to Rule 56 statement #16 Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Rule 56 Statement of Facts and Plaintiff's Statement of Additional Facts (Under Seal) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit E Kohl's Visual Standards, #2 Exhibit Exhibit I Kohl's General Planning)(Sender, Jennifer)
November 29, 2017 Filing 28 SEALED RESPONSE by Patricia Thomas to MOTION by Defendants Kohl's Department Stores, Inc., Kohl's Corporation for summary judgment #12 Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Under Seal) (Sender, Jennifer)
November 29, 2017 Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal #21 and motion for leave to file in excess pages #22 are granted. No appearance is required on the 12/4/17 notice motion date. Mailed notice (kef, )
November 28, 2017 Filing 26 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Patricia Thomas to Defendants' Rule 56 Statement of Facts and Plaintiff's Statement of Additional Facts (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits List, #2 Exhibit Dep. Trans. of P. Thomas, #3 Exhibit Declaration of P. Thomas 11.28.17, #4 Exhibit Kohl's Form10-K, #5 Exhibit Dep.Trans. Ann Horter, #6 Exhibit Dep. Trans. Nicole Reed, #7 Exhibit Dep. Trans. Bethany Borkes, #8 Exhibit Dep. Trans. Bryan Groh, #9 Exhibit Dep. Trans. Tony Lassos, #10 Exhibit Def.'s Objections and Response to Plaintiff's Request Nos. 5 & 6, #11 Exhibit Kohl's ADA Policy, #12 Exhibit Declaration of P. Thomas 11.15.17, #13 Exhibit Dep. Trans. of Eugene Kelly)(Sender, Jennifer)
November 28, 2017 Filing 25 RESPONSE by Patricia Thomasin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Kohl's Department Stores, Inc., Kohl's Corporation for summary judgment #12 (Corrected to link to Doc. No. 12) (Sender, Jennifer)
November 28, 2017 Filing 24 RESPONSE by Patricia Thomasin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Patricia Thomas for leave to file certain documents under seal #21 , MOTION by Plaintiff Patricia Thomas for leave to file excess pages in response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment #22 Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Sender, Jennifer)
November 28, 2017 Filing 23 NOTICE of Motion by Jennifer Lundy Sender for presentment of motion for leave to file #21 , motion for leave to file excess pages #22 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 12/4/2017 at 08:30 AM. (Sender, Jennifer)
November 28, 2017 Filing 22 MOTION by Plaintiff Patricia Thomas for leave to file excess pages in response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Sender, Jennifer)
November 28, 2017 Filing 21 MOTION by Plaintiff Patricia Thomas for leave to file certain documents under seal (Sender, Jennifer)
November 17, 2017 Filing 20 Plaintiff's Notice of Motion NOTICE of Motion by Jennifer Lundy Sender for presentment of motion to transfer case #18 , motion to transfer case, #19 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 11/29/2017 at 08:30 AM. (Sender, Jennifer)
November 17, 2017 Filing 19 MOTION by Plaintiff Patricia Thomas to transfer case Plaintiff Patricia Thomas's Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Patricia Thomas, #2 Exhibit Deposition of Patricia Thomas, #3 Exhibit Defendants' Second Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures)(Sender, Jennifer)
November 17, 2017 Filing 18 MOTION by Plaintiff Patricia Thomas to transfer case Plaintiff's Motion for Transfer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration of Patricia Thomas)(Sender, Jennifer)
October 19, 2017 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve:Status hearing held on 10/19/2017 and continued to 2/15/18 at 8:30 a.m. Defendants' motion for summary judgment #12 is entered. Response by 11/28/17. Reply by 12/12/17. No appearance is required on the 10/23/17 notice motion date. Mailed notice (kef, )
October 16, 2017 Filing 16 RULE 56 Statement by Kohl's Corporation, Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. regarding motion for summary judgment #12 (McIlwee, John)
October 16, 2017 Filing 15 APPENDIX memorandum in support of motion #14 for summary judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 4A, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 5A, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 6A, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8)(McIlwee, John)
October 16, 2017 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM by Kohl's Corporation, Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. in support of motion for summary judgment #12 (McIlwee, John)
October 16, 2017 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by John Conlaeth McIlwee for presentment of motion for summary judgment #12 before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 10/23/2017 at 08:30 AM. (McIlwee, John)
October 16, 2017 Filing 12 MOTION by Defendants Kohl's Department Stores, Inc., Kohl's Corporation for summary judgment (McIlwee, John)
September 22, 2017 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Patricia Thomas by Matthew K Handley (Handley, Matthew)
September 18, 2017 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve:Status hearing held on 9/18/2017 and continued to 10/19/2017 at 08:30 AM. Any potentially dispositive motion, with supporting memorandum, shall be filed by 10/16/17. Mailed notice (kef, )
September 6, 2017 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Patricia Thomas by Deepa Goraya (Goraya, Deepa)
September 1, 2017 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Patricia Thomas by Andres Javier Gallegos Appearance for plaintiff Patricia Thomas by Andres Javier Gallegos (Gallegos, Andres)
September 1, 2017 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Patricia Thomas by Jennifer Lundy Sender Attorney for Plaintiff Patricia Thomas by Matthew K. Handley (Sender, Jennifer)
September 1, 2017 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Patricia Thomas by Jennifer Lundy Sender by Deepa K. Goraya (Sender, Jennifer)
August 30, 2017 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve:Status hearing held on 8/30/2017 and continued to 9/18/2017 at 08:30 AM. Matthew Handley and Deepa Goraya are given leave to file their appearances on behalf of plaintiff. Any potentially dispositive motion, with supporting memorandum, shall be filed by 10/2/17. Mailed notice (kef, )
August 28, 2017 Filing 4 STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by Patricia Thomas (Sender, Jennifer)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/16/2017: Joint status report shall be filed by 8/28/17. Status hearing set for 8/30/17 at 8:30 a.m. in courtroom 1241. [For further details, see Order.] Mailed notice(kef, )
August 11, 2017 Filing 2 SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION complaint by Patricia Thomas against Kohl's Corporation, Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. (tt, )
August 11, 2017 Filing 1 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 8/11/2017. Mailed notice (tt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Kohl's Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Thomas
Represented By: Andres Javier Gallegos
Represented By: Deepa Goraya
Represented By: Matthew K Handley
Represented By: Jennifer Lundy Sender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl&#039;s Corporation
Represented By: Brian C Blair
Represented By: Bonnie Keane DelGobbo
Represented By: Joel Griswold
Represented By: John Conlaeth McIlwee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl&#039;s Department Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Brian C Blair
Represented By: Bonnie Keane DelGobbo
Represented By: Joel Griswold
Represented By: John Conlaeth McIlwee
Represented By: Jennifer Lundy Sender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?