Human Rights Defense Center v. Baldwin et al
Plaintiff: Human Rights Defense Center
Defendant: John Baldwin, Daniel Sullivan, Shelith Hansbro, Stephanie Dorethy, Jacqueline Lashbrook, Kim Butler, Karen Jaimet, Michael Melvin, David Rains, Jeff Dennison, David Gomez, Randy Pfister, Matthew Swalls, Cameron Watson, Stacey Carter, Billy Rose, David Shemonic, Pamela Scott, Tyler Bradley, Rick Anderson, Sherry Benton, Billie Greer, Melissa Phoenix and Does 1-30
Case Number: 1:2018cv01136
Filed: February 13, 2018
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: Robert M. Dow
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 356 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: HRDC's motion for summary judgment 290 and Defendants' motion for summary judgment 305 are granted in part and denied in part. Enter order. HRDC is entitled to declaratory relief as to their facial attacks on the STG Provision and Catch All Provision of the 2022 AD. HRDC is further entitled to declaratory relief as to their facial attack on the notice and appeal provisions of the 2006 and 2019 AD. HRDC is entitled to declaratory and injunctive relief a s to the censorship of PLN Vol. 27, No. 3 (March 2016), PLN Vol. 27, No. 7 (July 2016), and CLN Vol. 1 No. 10 (September 2018) and the absence of notice and appeal opportunities as to PLN Vol. 27, No. 7 PLN Vol. 28, No. 2, PLN Vol. 28, No. 3, PLN Vol . 28, No. 4, PLN Vol. 28, No. 8, PLN Vol. 28, No. 10, PLN Vol. 29, No. 1, PLN Vol. 29, No. 2, PLN Vol. 29, No. 3, PLN Vol. 29, No. 5, PLN Vol. 29, No. 6, PLN Vol. 29, No. 7. Finally, HRDC is entitled to nominal damages against Defendants Hansbro (Fir st Amendment claim), Carter (First Amendment claim), Scott (Fourteenth Amendment claim), Watson (Fourteenth Amendment claim), Anderson (First and Fourteenth Amendment claims), and Baldwin (First and Fourteenth Amendment claims). The following Defenda nts are entitled to summary judgment: Dennison (First and Fourteenth Amendment claims), Dorethy (First and Fourteenth Amendment claims), Gomez (First and Fourteenth Amendment claims), Jaimet (First and Fourteenth Amendment claims), Swalls (First and Fourteenth Amendment claims), Butler (First and Fourteenth Amendment claims), Rose (First and Fourteenth Amendment claims), Hansbro (Fourteenth Amendment claim), Carter (Fourteenth Amendment claim), Lashbrook (First Amendment and Fourteenth Amendment claim), Bradley (First Amendment claim), Rose (First and Fourteenth Amendment claim), Scott (First Amendment claim), Shemonic (First and Fourteenth Amendment claim), Melvin (First and Fourteenth Amendment claim), Pfister (First and Fourteenth Amendm ent claim), Rains (First and Fourteenth Amendment claim), Watson (First Amendment claim), Sullivan (Fourteenth Amendment claim), Jeffreys (First Amendment claim). The following Defendants are thus dismissed with prejudice from the litigation: Denniso n, Dorethy, Gomez, Jaimet, Swalls, Butler, Lashbrook, Bradley, Rose, Shemonic, Melvin, Pfister, and Rains. Finally, the Court denies summary judgment to both parties on HRDC's due process facial challenge to the 2022 AD,the First Amendment as ap plied as-applied challenges related to PLN Vol. 28, No. 2 (February 2017), PLN Vol. 28, No. 3 (March 2017), PLN Vol. 28, No. 4 (April 2017), PLN Vol. 29, No. 2 (February 2018), PLN Vol. 29, No. 3 (March 2018), PLN Vol. 29, No. 5 (May 2018), PLN Vol. 29, No. 6 (June 2018), PLN Vol. 29, No. 7 (July 2018), PLN Vol. 29, No. 8 (August 2018), and the Fourteenth Amendment as-applied challenge to PLN Vol. 30, No. 11. The parties are to confer and file a status report regarding the remaining claims by May 5, 2025. Signed by the Honorable Mary M. Rowland on 3/31/2025. Mailed notice. (kp, )
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 215 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER: For the reasons in the Memorandum Opinion and Order entered this day, Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Responses to its Discovery Requests and to Compel Defendants to Permit its Request for Inspection 194 is granted in part and denied in part. Defendants shall produce responsive information and documents within their possession, custody, or control consistent with this opinion by October 4, 2022. Signed by the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani on 9/22/2022. Mailed notice (ags)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 197 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 8/4/2022. The Court: grants Plaintiff's motion for leave to file sur-reply 180 ; grants Benton's and Pelker's motion for judgment on the pleadings [163-1]; a nd denies Jeffreys' and Baldwin's motion for judgment on the pleadings 158 . As noted above, the dismissal of the claims against Benton and Pelker is without prejudice and with leave to replead by September 5, 2022, if Plaintiff believes that it can do so consistent with this opinion and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11. Emailed notice(cdh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Human Rights Defense Center v. Baldwin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Human Rights Defense Center
Represented By: Jason Phillip Greenhut
Represented By: Daniel Lucas Marshall
Represented By: Alan S. Mills
Represented By: Masimba M Mutamba, Mutam
Represented By: Sabarish Perambur Neelakanta
Represented By: Kenneth G. Schuler
Represented By: Nicole Rae Schult
Represented By: Sarah Wenxuan Wang
Represented By: Marc N. Zubick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Baldwin
Represented By: Blanca R. Dominguez
Represented By: Sarah Hughes Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Sullivan
Represented By: Blanca R. Dominguez
Represented By: Sarah Hughes Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelith Hansbro
Represented By: Blanca R. Dominguez
Represented By: Sarah Hughes Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Dorethy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Lashbrook
Represented By: Blanca R. Dominguez
Represented By: Sarah Hughes Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Butler
Represented By: Blanca R. Dominguez
Represented By: Sarah Hughes Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Jaimet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Melvin
Represented By: Blanca R. Dominguez
Represented By: Sarah Hughes Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Rains
Represented By: Blanca R. Dominguez
Represented By: Sarah Hughes Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Dennison
Represented By: Blanca R. Dominguez
Represented By: Sarah Hughes Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Gomez
Represented By: Blanca R. Dominguez
Represented By: Sarah Hughes Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Pfister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Swalls
Represented By: Blanca R. Dominguez
Represented By: Sarah Hughes Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacey Carter
Represented By: Blanca R. Dominguez
Represented By: Sarah Hughes Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Rose
Represented By: Blanca R. Dominguez
Represented By: Sarah Hughes Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Shemonic
Represented By: Blanca R. Dominguez
Represented By: Sarah Hughes Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Scott
Represented By: Blanca R. Dominguez
Represented By: Sarah Hughes Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Bradley
Represented By: Blanca R. Dominguez
Represented By: Sarah Hughes Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Anderson
Represented By: Blanca R. Dominguez
Represented By: Sarah Hughes Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry Benton
Represented By: Blanca R. Dominguez
Represented By: Sarah Hughes Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billie Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Phoenix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?