Dancel v. Groupon, Inc.
Plaintiff: Christine Dancel
Defendant: Groupon, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02027
Filed: March 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey Cole
Presiding Judge: Ronald A. Guzman
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 199 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: For the reasons stated below, Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment 157 is denied. The parties are directed to appear for a telephonic hearing on September 15, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. to set a trial date. Throughou t the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore couns el must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is (888) 684-8852 and the access code is 1246152. Counsel of record will receive an email the day before the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and reb roadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Signed by the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 8/21/2020. Mailed notice. (kp, )
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 3/4/2019: The Court denies Plaintiff's motion for class certification 19 . [For further details see Statement]. Mailed notice (is, )
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 12/4/2018: For the reasons stated below and in its previous order of October 10, 2018 (Dkt. # 113), the Court denies Plaintiff's motion to remand 31 . [For further details see Statement]. Mailed notice(is, )
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 10/10/2018: For the reasons stated below, the Court concludes that Plaintiff has standing to sue Groupon in federal court and thus denies that basis for Plaintiff's motion to remand. The Court, however, has determined that additional briefing is required with respect to the timing of the removal. [For further details see Statement]. Mailed notice (is, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dancel v. Groupon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Groupon, Inc.
Represented By: Brian E. Cohen
Represented By: Eric Neal Macey
Represented By: Christopher S. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Dancel
Represented By: Rafey S. Balabanian
Represented By: Jay Edelson
Represented By: Benjamin Harris Richman
Represented By: Ari Jonathan Scharg
Represented By: Benjamin Scott Thomassen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?