Hudson Insurance Group v. AAA Expedited Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Hudson Insurance Group
Defendant: Star Freight, LLC, Whalen Trucking, Inc, GS Express, Inc, M& M Trans, Inc, Cargo Solutions Express, Inc., Tac Trans, Inc, Dimaslogistic Inc, Stela Express, Inc, Shamrock Trucking, LLC, VKP Line, Inc, Route 66 Logistics, Inc, I&H, LLC, Blast Transport, Inc, SW Trucking, LLC, RP Trucking, LLC, U.S. Expediters, Inc, Five Mountains Transport, Inc, Eagle GC, Inc, Stronghaul, Inc, Ideality, Inc, M3 Delivery, Inc, Lechuga Transport Inc, AGA Express, LLC, Margen Trucking, Super Sonic Solutions, LLC, Nationwide Transport Finance, Floyd, Inc, BNT Transport, LLC, Direct Transport Solutions Inc, DDM Logistics, Inc, Gold Star Carriers, Inc, Western Specialized, Inc, Best Truck Line, Inc, Accurate Transportation Inc, Comrade Transport Inc, Delta Freight, Inc, Evans Delivery Company, Inc., Good Source Trucking, Bohren Logistics, Namanagh, Inc, AAA Expedited Services LLC, Golden Eagle Transportation, NVK Logistics, Inc, Pro Trans Group, LLC, Keystone Lines, Bongo Express, BMS Trucking, LLC, Favored Express, LLC, Baenen Dairy, LLC, Via Logistics, RRM Transportation Inc, Trans Recovery Solutions, LLC, Redline Trucking, Tesla Cargo Solutions Inc, Lida Express, Inc, Kings Eagle, Inc, Diji Trans, Trucker Path Inc, Van Dam Egg Co. Inc, Splendid, LLC, MGM Transport, LLC, Millennium Group, Inc, Lucky World Inc, PM Global, Inc, Vynera Transportation, Inc, Honey Locust Farms, LLC, Skyway Holdings, Inc, THK Trucking, Inc, Progress Freight, LLC, CNA Freight LLC, Bing Logistics, Inc, EH Trucking, LLC, AC Express, Inc, Medallion Transport & Logistics, LLC, UniTrans Inc, Marvin Keller Trucking, Inc., Seminole Express, Franco Transport, Inc, Road Kings, Inc, Pacific Western Transportation Ltd, Tadz Logistics, Inc, JM Express, Inc, Losev Trucking, LLC, LRD Transport, LLC, First Class Carriers, Inc, Roxmel Trucking Company, Inc, WLD Services Ltd, TBS Factoring Service, LLC, Continental Logistics Services, Inc, Global Enterprises & Logistics, Inc, Hub Systems, Inc, ROC Enterprises Corp, Eva Logistics, Inc, F5 Express Inc, Ameri Transport Inc, Fernando Perez, Paris Freight, Inc, Thank God 4 Trucking, LLC, DMA Services, Inc., Sims Freightlines, Inc, Sandra Slizyte, Vladi Trucking, Inc, Complete Trucking, Inc, Ultimate Freight, Inc, Baylor Trucking, Inc, Seagate Freight LLC, Kit Logistics, Inc, Mikhail Trucking, LLC, KGI Group Inc, Geejo Transport, LLC, MS US Inc, Star Trucking, LLC, Thoroughbread Direct, J Anthony Express, Inc, GSA International Ltd, MO Trucking, Inc., Oak Hill Capital Corp., Cargo Speed Corp., GSV Transportation Inc., Good Source Trucking, Inc., Canon U.S.A., Inc., Thunder Logistics, Inc., Convoy, Inc. and Sant Trucking Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02630
Filed: April 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Referring Judge: Amy J Eve
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Filing 42 DEFAULT JUDGMENT ORDER Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 1/9/2019. Mailed notice(gel, )
January 9, 2019 Filing 41 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Plaintiff's motion for entry of default and default judgment #38 is granted. Enter Default Judgment Order. All set dates and deadlines, including the 1/9/19 status hearing, are stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (gel, )
December 12, 2018 Filing 40 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Status hearing held on 12/12/2018 and continued to 1/9/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Plaintiff shall submit any revised proposed order and exhibits to Chambers on or before 1/3/2019. Mailed notice (gel, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 39 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: On the Court's own motion, status hearing previously set for 12/5/2018 is reset for 12/12/2018 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, )
November 26, 2018 Filing 38 MOTION by Plaintiff Hudson Insurance Group for default judgment as to The Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate of Service)(Shah, Saloni)
November 15, 2018 Filing 37 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Minute entry #36 is corrected as follows: Joint motion by Plaintiff and Defendant, KGI Group, Inc. to dismiss pursuant to a settlement agreement #35 is granted and this case is hereby dismissed without prejudice as to KGI Group, Inc. only. Absent reinstatement on or before 2/16/2019, the dismissal will convert to one with prejudice without further order of the Court. Status hearing previously set for 12/5/2018, to stand. Mailed notice (gel, )
November 15, 2018 Filing 36 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Joint motion by Plaintiff and Defendant to dismiss pursuant to a settlement agreement #35 is granted and this case is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Absent reinstatement on or before 2/16/2019, the dismissal will convert to one with prejudice without further order of the Court. All pending deadlines and hearings, are stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (gel, )
November 14, 2018 Filing 35 MOTION by Plaintiff Hudson Insurance Group for settlement between Plaintiff and Defendant KGI Group Inc to Dismiss Pursuant a Settlement Agreement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shah, Saloni)
November 1, 2018 Filing 34 Second AMENDED complaint by Hudson Insurance Group against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shah, Saloni)
October 23, 2018 Filing 33 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Plaintiff's motions for summary judgment #26 and default judgment #30 , #32 are denied without prejudice. Oral request to file an amended complaint is granted, and Plaintiff is given leave to file any amended complaint #23 by 11/1/18. The motion hearing set for 10/25/18 is stricken, and the parties need not appear. The case is set for a status hearing on 12/5/18 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, )
October 18, 2018 Filing 32 MOTION by Plaintiff Hudson Insurance Group for default judgment as to The Defendants (Amended) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Shah, Saloni)
October 16, 2018 Filing 31 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Case called for motion hearing on 10/16/2018. Any revised motions or proposed orders shall be filed or submitted on or before 10/18/2018, as stated in open court. Motion hearing reset for 10/25/2018 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, )
October 10, 2018 Filing 30 MOTION by Plaintiff Hudson Insurance Group for default judgment as to The Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Notice of Filing)(Shah, Saloni)
October 3, 2018 Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Status hearing held on 10/3/2018. Any motion for default judgment shall be filed on or before 10/10/2018 and set for presentment on 10/16/2018 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, )
September 13, 2018 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM by Hudson Insurance Group in support of motion for summary judgment #26 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shah, Saloni)
September 13, 2018 Filing 27 RULE 56 1 Statement by Hudson Insurance Group regarding motion for summary judgment #26 Undisputed Material Facts in Support of (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shah, Saloni)
September 13, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION by Plaintiff Hudson Insurance Group for summary judgment (Shah, Saloni)
September 5, 2018 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Status hearing held on 9/5/2018 and continued to 10/3/2018 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, )
August 29, 2018 Filing 24 ANSWER to amended complaint by KGI Group Inc(Vragel, Kurt)
August 27, 2018 Filing 23 First AMENDED complaint by Hudson Insurance Group against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shah, Saloni)
August 27, 2018 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file its first amended complaint #20 is granted. Plaintiff shall file the amended complaint as a separate docket entry. The 9/6/18 Notice of Motion date is stricken, and the parties need not appear. The 9/5/18 status hearing date stands. Mailed notice (gel, )
August 22, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Motion by Saloni Shah for presentment of motion for leave to file #20 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 9/6/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Shah, Saloni)
August 21, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION by Plaintiff Hudson Insurance Group for leave to file Its First Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shah, Saloni)
July 16, 2018 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Hudson Insurance Group. Millennium Group, Inc waiver sent on 4/18/2018, answer due 6/18/2018. (Shah, Saloni)
July 3, 2018 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Status hearing held on 7/3/2018 and continued to 9/5/2018 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, )
June 25, 2018 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Hudson Insurance Group as to Dimaslogistic Inc. waiver sent on 4/18/2018, answer due 6/18/2018; Super Sonic Solutions, LLC waiver sent on 4/18/2018, answer due 6/18/2018; Thank God 4 Trucking, LLC waiver sent on 4/18/2018, answer due 6/18/2018; Trans Recovery Solutions, LLC waiver sent on 6/6/2018, answer due 8/6/2018. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of summons, #2 Waiver of summons, #3 Waiver of summons)(Shah, Saloni) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 6/26/2018 (jh, ).
June 25, 2018 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Based upon Plaintiff filing the required status report #15 , this case is hereby reinstated and set for an initial status conference on 7/3/18 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. The parties should review this Court's prior order #12 , issued 5/29/18, for information about the initial status conference. Mailed notice (gel, )
June 22, 2018 Filing 15 STATUS Report by Hudson Insurance Group (Shah, Saloni)
June 22, 2018 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case is dismissed for want of prosecution for the parties' failure to file either individual status reports or a joint status report by 6/15/18, pursuant to this Court's order issued 5/29/18 #12 . The initial status conference set for 6/28/18 is stricken. The parties may call Judge Blakey's chambers at (312) 435-6058 with any questions about this order. Mailed notice (gel, )
June 6, 2018 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant Seagate Freight LLC. (jn, )
June 6, 2018 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendants BNT Transport, LLC, Eagle GC, Inc, Eva Logistics, Inc, Favored Express, LLC, Golden Eagle Transportation, Kings Eagle, Inc, Margen Trucking, RP Trucking, LLC, TBS Factoring Service, LLC, Tac Trans, Inc. (acm)
May 31, 2018 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Hudson Insurance Group. Accurate Transportation Inc waiver sent on 4/18/2018, answer due 6/18/2018; Baylor Trucking, Inc waiver sent on 4/18/2018, answer due 6/18/2018; Five Mountains Transport, Inc waiver sent on 4/18/2018, answer due 6/18/2018; Geejo Transport, LLC waiver sent on 4/18/2018, answer due 6/18/2018; JM Express, Inc waiver sent on 4/18/2018, answer due 6/18/2018; KGI Group Inc waiver sent on 4/18/2018, answer due 6/18/2018; Lechuga Transport Inc waiver sent on 4/18/2018, answer due 6/18/2018; M& M Trans, Inc waiver sent on 4/18/2018, answer due 6/18/2018; Marvin Keller Trucking, Inc. waiver sent on 4/18/2018, answer due 6/18/2018; Progress Freight, LLC waiver sent on 4/18/2018, answer due 6/18/2018; Roxmel Trucking Company, Inc waiver sent on 4/18/2018, answer due 6/18/2018; Sims Freightlines, Inc waiver sent on 4/18/2018, answer due 6/18/2018; Star Freight, LLC waiver sent on 4/18/2018, answer due 6/18/2018; Western Specialized, Inc waiver sent on 44/18/2018, answer due 6/18/2018. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Summons, #2 Waiver of Summons, #3 Waiver of Summons, #4 Waiver of Summons, #5 Waiver of Summons, #6 Waiver of Summons, #7 Waiver of Summons, #8 Waiver of Summons, #9 Waiver of Summons, #10 Waiver of Summons, #11 Waiver of Summons, #12 Waiver of Summons, #13 Waiver of Summons)(Shah, Saloni) (Docket text modified by Clerk's Office)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been reassigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Pursuant to General Order 17-0005, this case falls within the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Project, and the "Standing Order in MIDP Cases" now governs the conduct of the litigants in this matter. Under the MIDP, this Court shall enforce the MIDP Standing Order via the Court's inherent authority (including the contempt of court power) and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Consequently, both the parties and their attorneys are hereby ordered to review and fully comply with the MIDP Standing Order, which is available on the Courts homepage: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/MIDP%20Standing%20Order.pdf. The parties are further advised that in light of the MIDPs intended goal of reducing the traditional cost and delay of federal civil litigation, this Court will not grant routine motions for extensions of time to meet the deadlines imposed by the MIDP Standing Order (even agreed motions made jointly by the parties). During the course of the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312) 818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. The litigants are further ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Courts own standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Court's official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. An initial status conference is hereby set for 6/28/18 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. At the status conference, the Court will discuss the MIDP and ask the parties questions to verify that they have reviewed and complied with the MIDP Standing Order. Without exception, the parties must also file a status report no later than 6/15/18, using the model template set forth in this Courts standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. The 5/31/18 status hearing set by Judge St. Eve is stricken. Mailed notice (gel, )
May 24, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by KGI Group Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Vragel, Kurt)
May 24, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by KGI Group Inc. KGI Group Inc waiver sent on 4/24/2018, answer due 6/25/2018. (Vragel, Kurt)
May 24, 2018 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant KGI Group Inc by Kurt E. Vragel, Jr (Vragel, Kurt)
May 23, 2018 Filing 8 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that cases previously assigned to the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve requires reassignment; therefore It is hereby ordered that the cases on the attached list are to be reassigned to the other judges of this Court as indicated, pursuant to Local Rule 40.1(f) within the guidelines of IOP 16. Case reassigned to the Honorable John Robert Blakey for all further proceedings. Honorable Amy J. St. Eve no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/23/2018.(pk, )
May 18, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hudson Insurance Group (dlc, )
May 18, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed. LRD Transport, LLC waiver sent on 4/18/2018, answer due 6/18/2018. (aee, )
April 23, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants SW Trucking, LLC, Stela Express, Inc, Stronghaul, Inc, Super Sonic Solutions, LLC, TBS Factoring Service, LLC, THK Trucking, Inc, Tac Trans, Inc, Tadz Logistics, Inc, Tesla Cargo Solutions Inc, Thank God 4 Trucking, LLC, Thoroughbread Direct, Trans Recovery Solutions, LLC, Trucker Path Inc, U.S. Expediters, Inc (jjr, )
April 23, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Star Trucking, LLC (jjr, )
April 23, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Via Logistics (jjr, )
April 20, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants ROC Enterprises Corp, RP Trucking, LLC, RRM Transportation Inc, Redline Trucking, Road Kings, Inc, Route 66 Logistics, Inc, Roxmel Trucking Company, Inc, Seagate Freight LLC, Seminole Express, Shamrock Trucking, LLC, Sims Freightlines, Inc, Skyway Holdings, Inc, Sandra Slizyte, Splendid, LLC, Star Freight, LLC. (lw, )
April 20, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants I&H, LLC, Ideality, Inc, J Anthony Express, Inc, JM Express, Inc, KGI Group Inc, Keystone Lines, Kings Eagle, Inc, Kit Logistics, Inc, LRD Transport, LLC, Lechuga Transport Inc, Lida Express, Inc, Losev Trucking, LLC, Lucky World Inc, M& M Trans, Inc, M3 Delivery, Inc (ags, )
April 20, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Ultimate Freight, Inc; UniTrans Inc; VKP Line, Inc; Van Dam Egg Co. Inc; Vladi Trucking, Inc; Vynera Transportation, Inc; WLD Services Ltd; Western Specialized, Inc; Whalen Trucking, Inc. (kb, )
April 20, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants MGM Transport, LLC, MS US Inc, Margen Trucking, Marvin Keller Trucking, Inc., Medallion Transport & Logistics, LLC, Mikhail Trucking, LLC, Millennium Group, Inc, NVK Logistics, Inc, Namanagh, Inc, Nationwide Transport Finance, PM Global, Inc, Pacific Western Transportation Ltd, Paris Freight, Inc, Pro Trans Group, LLC, Progress Freight, LLC (mma, )
April 20, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Favored Express, LLC, First Class Carriers, Inc, Five Mountains Transport, Inc, Floyd, Inc, Franco Transport, Inc, GS Express, Inc, GSA International Ltd, Geejo Transport, LLC, Global Enterprises & Logistics, Inc, Gold Star Carriers, Inc, Golden Eagle Transportation, Good Source Trucking, Honey Locust Farms, LLC, Hub Systems, Inc, Fernando Perez (ags, )
April 20, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants CNA Freight LLC, Complete Trucking, Inc, Comrade Transport Inc, Continental Logistics Services, Inc, Continental Logistics Services, Inc, DDM Logistics, Inc, DMA Services, Inc., Delta Freight, Inc, Diji Trans, Dimaslogistic Inc, Direct Transport Solutions Inc, EH Trucking, LLC, Eagle GC, Inc, Eva Logistics, Inc, Evans Delivery Company, Inc., F5 Express Inc (ags, )
April 20, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants AAA Expedited Services LLC, AC Express, Inc, AGA Express, LLC, Accurate Transportation Inc, Ameri Transport Inc, BMS Trucking, LLC, BNT Transport, LLC, Baenen Dairy, LLC, Baylor Trucking, Inc, Best Truck Line, Inc, Bing Logistics, Inc, Blast Transport, Inc, Bohren Logistics, Bongo Express, Cargo Solutions Express, Inc. (ags, )
April 16, 2018 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Initial status hearing set for 5/31/18 at 8:30 a.m. in courtroom 1241. Parties shall refer to Judge St. Eve's web page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov and file a Rule 26(f) Initial Status Report by 5/29/18 as set forth in the Rule 26(f) Report procedure. If the defendants have not been served as of 5/29/18, the Court will continue the filing date for the Rule 26(f) Report until the defendants are served. Mailed notice (kef, )
April 13, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (aee, )
April 12, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Michael T. Mason. (pj, )
April 12, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Interpleader Hudson Insurance Group by Thomas Scott Leo (Leo, Thomas)
April 12, 2018 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Interpleader Hudson Insurance Group by Saloni Shah (Shah, Saloni)
April 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Statutory Interpleader Relief filed by Hudson Insurance Group; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14344534. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shah, Saloni)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hudson Insurance Group v. AAA Expedited Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Star Freight, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whalen Trucking, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GS Express, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M& M Trans, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargo Solutions Express, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tac Trans, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dimaslogistic Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stela Express, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shamrock Trucking, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VKP Line, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Route 66 Logistics, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I&H, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blast Transport, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SW Trucking, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RP Trucking, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Expediters, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Five Mountains Transport, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle GC, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stronghaul, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ideality, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M3 Delivery, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lechuga Transport Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGA Express, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margen Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Super Sonic Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Transport Finance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Floyd, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNT Transport, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Direct Transport Solutions Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DDM Logistics, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gold Star Carriers, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Specialized, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Truck Line, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accurate Transportation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comrade Transport Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Freight, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evans Delivery Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Good Source Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bohren Logistics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Namanagh, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AAA Expedited Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Eagle Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NVK Logistics, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pro Trans Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keystone Lines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bongo Express
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMS Trucking, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Favored Express, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baenen Dairy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Via Logistics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RRM Transportation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Recovery Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redline Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesla Cargo Solutions Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lida Express, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kings Eagle, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diji Trans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trucker Path Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Van Dam Egg Co. Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Splendid, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MGM Transport, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millennium Group, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucky World Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PM Global, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vynera Transportation, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honey Locust Farms, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skyway Holdings, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THK Trucking, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progress Freight, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNA Freight LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bing Logistics, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EH Trucking, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AC Express, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medallion Transport & Logistics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UniTrans Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Keller Trucking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seminole Express
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franco Transport, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Road Kings, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Western Transportation Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tadz Logistics, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JM Express, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Losev Trucking, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LRD Transport, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Class Carriers, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roxmel Trucking Company, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WLD Services Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TBS Factoring Service, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Logistics Services, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Enterprises & Logistics, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hub Systems, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROC Enterprises Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eva Logistics, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F5 Express Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameri Transport Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fernando Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paris Freight, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thank God 4 Trucking, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DMA Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sims Freightlines, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Slizyte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vladi Trucking, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Complete Trucking, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ultimate Freight, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baylor Trucking, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seagate Freight LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kit Logistics, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mikhail Trucking, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KGI Group Inc
Represented By: Kurt E. Vragel, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geejo Transport, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MS US Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Star Trucking, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thoroughbread Direct
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Anthony Express, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GSA International Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MO Trucking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oak Hill Capital Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargo Speed Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GSV Transportation Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Good Source Trucking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canon U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thunder Logistics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Convoy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sant Trucking Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hudson Insurance Group
Represented By: Saloni Shah
Represented By: Thomas Scott Leo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?