People of the State of Illinois, ex rel. Kimberly M. Foxx v. Facebook, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: People of the State of Illinois, ex rel. Kimberly M. Foxx
Defendant: SCL Group Limited, Cambridge Analytica LLC and Facebook, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv02667
Filed: April 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2018 ELECTRONIC Acknowledgement of case transferred to the California Northern District as case 3:18-cv-06486, filed 10/24/2018. (nsf, )
October 12, 2018 Filing 57 TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of California the the electronic record. (nsf, )
October 9, 2018 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to MDL 2843 Conditional Transfer Order filed 10/09/2018. (nsf, )
October 9, 2018 Filing 56 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to Northern District of California. (nsf, )
July 17, 2018 Filing 55 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Given the notice of bankruptcy filing #50 filed by Defendants Cambridge Analytica LLC and SCL Group Limited, the motion to withdraw as counsel filed by counsel of record for said Defendants #42 is granted. Mailed notice (cdh, )
May 29, 2018 Filing 54 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Defendant Facebook's motion for leave to file sur-reply #51 is taken under advisement. The Court will consider the response #53 and determine if a sur-reply (and any additional briefing) is warranted after a thorough review of the briefing as a whole. Notice of motion date of 5/30/2018 is stricken and no appearances are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling (and any further guidance) by mail. Mailed notice (cdh, )
May 22, 2018 Filing 53 RESPONSE by People of the State of Illinois, ex rel. Kimberly M. Foxx in Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Facebook, Inc. for leave to file Surreply in Support of Opposition to Motion for Remand #51 (Balabanian, Rafey)
May 21, 2018 Filing 52 NOTICE of Motion by Nathan P. Eimer for presentment of motion for leave to file #51 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 5/30/2018 at 09:15 AM. (Eimer, Nathan)
May 21, 2018 Filing 51 MOTION by Defendant Facebook, Inc. for leave to file Surreply in Support of Opposition to Motion for Remand (Attachments: #1 Proposed Surreply, #2 Exhibit A to Surreply, #3 Exhibit B to Surreply)(Eimer, Nathan)
May 18, 2018 Filing 50 NOTICE by Cambridge Analytica LLC, SCL Group Limited re order on motion to withdraw,, motion hearing, #46 , MOTION by Defendants Cambridge Analytica LLC, SCL Group Limited to withdraw COUNSEL OF RECORDS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW #42 NOTICE OF CAMBRIDGE ANALYTICA LLC'S BANKRUPTCY FILING (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kapnick, Richard)
May 16, 2018 Filing 49 REPLY by People of the State of Illinois, ex rel. Kimberly M. Foxx to response in opposition to motion #44 (Balabanian, Rafey)
May 16, 2018 Filing 48 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff People of the State of Illinois, ex rel. Kimberly M. Foxx by Rafey S. Balabanian (Balabanian, Rafey)
May 15, 2018 Filing 47 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing set for 5/24/2018 and the deadline for the joint status report are stricken. Mailed notice (cdh, )
May 9, 2018 Filing 46 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: For the reasons stated on the record, Mark C. Scarsi, Richard B. Kapnick, and Nancy A. Temple's motion to withdraw as attorneys of record for Defendant Cambridge Analytica LLC and Defendant SCL Group Limited #42 is taken under advisement. After the bankruptcy filing has be entered on the docket, the Court will rule on the motion. Mailed notice (cdh, )
May 9, 2018 Filing 45 DOCUMENT ENTERED ON THE INCORRECT CASE. (cdh)
May 9, 2018 Filing 44 RESPONSE by Facebook, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff People of the State of Illinois, ex rel. Kimberly M. Foxx to remand to State Court #34 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Eimer, Nathan)
May 3, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE of Motion by Richard Bradshaw Kapnick for presentment of motion to withdraw #42 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 5/9/2018 at 09:15 AM. (Kapnick, Richard)
May 3, 2018 Filing 42 MOTION by Defendants Cambridge Analytica LLC, SCL Group Limited to withdraw COUNSEL OF RECORDS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notification of Party Contact Information)(Kapnick, Richard)
April 25, 2018 Filing 41 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motion hearing held. Attorneys Orin Snyder, Joshua Lipshultz, and Kristin Linsley's motions for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant Facebook, Inc. #5 , #6 , and #7 are granted. Motions #13 , #15 , #23 , #28 , #30 , and #32 are entered and continued. Defendants' response to the Plaintiff's motion to remand #32 is due 5/9/2018. Plaintiff's reply is due 5/16/2018. Notice of motion date of date of 5/2/2018 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed notice (cdh, )
April 24, 2018 Filing 40 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Mark C. Scarsi's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of SCL Group Ltd. and Cambridge Analytica LLC #37 is granted. Attorney J. Eli Wade-Scott to withdraw as attorney for People of the State of Illinois #38 is granted. Mailed notice (cdh, )
April 24, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE of Motion by J. Eli Wade Scott for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #38 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 5/2/2018 at 09:15 AM. (Wade Scott, J.)
April 24, 2018 Filing 38 MOTION by Attorney J. Eli Wade-Scott to withdraw as attorney for People of the State of Illinois, ex rel. Kimberly M. Foxx. No party information provided (Wade Scott, J.)
April 23, 2018 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14382314. (Mark, Scarsi)
April 20, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE of Motion by Jay Edelson for presentment of motion to remand #34 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 5/2/2018 at 09:15 AM. (Edelson, Jay)
April 20, 2018 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM by People of the State of Illinois, ex rel. Kimberly M. Foxx in support of motion to remand #34 (Edelson, Jay)
April 20, 2018 Filing 34 MOTION by Plaintiff People of the State of Illinois, ex rel. Kimberly M. Foxx to remand to State Court (Edelson, Jay)
April 20, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE of Motion by Richard Bradshaw Kapnick for presentment of extension of time #32 , extension of time #28 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 4/25/2018 at 09:15 AM. (Kapnick, Richard)
April 20, 2018 Filing 32 MOTION by Defendants Cambridge Analytica LLC, SCL Group Limited for extension of time Amended and Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint (Kapnick, Richard)
April 19, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE of Motion by Richard Bradshaw Kapnick for presentment of motion for joinder, #30 , motion to stay #13 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 4/25/2018 at 09:15 AM. (Kapnick, Richard)
April 19, 2018 Filing 30 MOTION by Defendants Cambridge Analytica LLC, SCL Group Limited for joinder NOTICE OF JOINDER BY DEFENDANTS CAMBRIDGE ANALYTICA LLC AND SCL GROUP LIMITED IN DEFENDANT FACEBOOK INC.S MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING RULING BY JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION (Kapnick, Richard)
April 19, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Motion by Richard Bradshaw Kapnick for presentment of extension of time #28 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 4/25/2018 at 09:15 AM. (Kapnick, Richard)
April 19, 2018 Filing 28 MOTION by Defendants Cambridge Analytica LLC, SCL Group Limited for extension of time AGREED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT (Kapnick, Richard)
April 19, 2018 Filing 27 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Cambridge Analytica LLC, SCL Group Limited by Richard Bradshaw Kapnick (Kapnick, Richard)
April 19, 2018 Filing 26 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Cambridge Analytica LLC, SCL Group Limited by Nancy Anne Temple (Temple, Nancy)
April 19, 2018 Filing 25 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Facebook, Inc. (Eimer, Nathan)
April 18, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Motion by Nathan P. Eimer for presentment of extension of time #23 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 4/25/2018 at 09:15 AM. (Eimer, Nathan)
April 18, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION by Defendant Facebook, Inc. for extension of time Amended and Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Eimer, Nathan)
April 18, 2018 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: At the request of the Defendant Facebook, Inc., motions #13 and #15 noticed up for 4/24/2018 are reset to 4/25/2018 at 9:15 a.m. Mailed notice (cdh, )
April 17, 2018 Filing 21 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff People of the State of Illinois, ex rel. Kimberly M. Foxx by Jay Edelson (Edelson, Jay)
April 17, 2018 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff People of the State of Illinois, ex rel. Kimberly M. Foxx by J. Eli Wade Scott (Wade Scott, J.)
April 17, 2018 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff People of the State of Illinois, ex rel. Kimberly M. Foxx by Alfred Kirkland Murray, II (Murray, Alfred)
April 17, 2018 Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff People of the State of Illinois, ex rel. Kimberly M. Foxx by Benjamin Harris Richman (Richman, Benjamin)
April 17, 2018 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff People of the State of Illinois, ex rel. Kimberly M. Foxx by Ari Jonathan Scharg (Scharg, Ari)
April 17, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion by Nathan P. Eimer for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #15 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 4/24/2018 at 09:15 AM. (Eimer, Nathan)
April 17, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION by Defendant Facebook, Inc. for extension of time to file answer (Eimer, Nathan)
April 17, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion by Nathan P. Eimer for presentment of motion to stay #13 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 4/24/2018 at 09:15 AM. (Eimer, Nathan)
April 17, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION by Defendant Facebook, Inc. to stay Proceedings Pending Ruling by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (Eimer, Nathan)
April 17, 2018 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial status hearing is set for 5/24/2018 at 9:30 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the courts action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least two days prior to the initial status. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (cdh, )
April 13, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (tt, )
April 13, 2018 Filing 10 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (tt, )
April 13, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service Corrected Certificate of Service of Notice to Adverse Parties [Dkt. 1-3] by Nathan P. Eimer on behalf of Facebook, Inc. (Eimer, Nathan)
April 13, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service Corrected Certificate of Service of Notice of Removal by Nathan P. Eimer on behalf of Facebook, Inc. (Eimer, Nathan)
April 13, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. (kb, )
April 12, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14348228. for Kristin Linsley (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Linsley, Kristin)
April 12, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14348217. for Joshua Lipshutz (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Lipshutz, Joshua)
April 12, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14348207. for Orin Snyder (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Snyder, Orin)
April 12, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Facebook, Inc. by Susan M. Razzano (Razzano, Susan)
April 12, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Facebook, Inc. by Nathan P. Eimer (Eimer, Nathan)
April 12, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Eimer, Nathan)
April 12, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2018-CH-03868) filed by Facebook, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14348138. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Eimer, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: People of the State of Illinois, ex rel. Kimberly M. Foxx v. Facebook, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCL Group Limited
Represented By: Richard Bradshaw Kapnick
Represented By: Nancy Anne Temple
Represented By: Mark C. Scarsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cambridge Analytica LLC
Represented By: Richard Bradshaw Kapnick
Represented By: Nancy Anne Temple
Represented By: Mark C. Scarsi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Nathan P. Eimer
Represented By: Susan M. Razzano
Represented By: Joshua S. Lipshutz
Represented By: Kristin Andrea Linsley
Represented By: Orin Samuel Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: People of the State of Illinois, ex rel. Kimberly M. Foxx
Represented By: Kent Stephen Ray
Represented By: Rafey S. Balabanian
Represented By: Ari Jonathan Scharg
Represented By: Jay Edelson
Represented By: Alfred Kirkland Murray, II
Represented By: Benjamin Harris Richman
Represented By: J. Eli Wade Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?