Boardman v. Service Employees International Union et al
Plaintiff: |
Christine Boardman |
Defendant: |
Service Employees International Union, Eliseo Medina, Dian Palmer, SEIU 73 and Mary Kay Henry |
Case Number: |
1:2018cv02728 |
Filed: |
April 16, 2018 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois |
Office: |
Chicago Office |
County: |
Cook |
Presiding Judge: |
Rebecca R. Pallmeyer |
Nature of Suit: |
Labor/Management Relations |
Cause of Action: |
29 U.S.C. § 0401 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 30, 2022 |
Filing
100
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 9/30/2022: For the reasons discussed in the accompanying order, the court grants Defendants' motion for summary judgment 85 . The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiffs. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (as, )
|
February 28, 2020 |
Filing
59
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint 45 is granted in part and denied in part. Specifically, the court denies Defendants' motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' Title III claims, but those claims are limited as set forth in this opinion. The court also denies Defendants' motion to dismiss: (1) Plaintiffs' claims under Section 101(a)(2) for loss of elected office and loss of union membership; (2) Boardman's claim under Section 101(a)(2) for exclusion from the February 23, 2019 membership meeting; (3) Plaintiffs' claims under Section 101(a)(5) for loss of union membership; and (4) Boardman's claim for "retaliation." The court grants Defendants&# 039; motion to dismiss: (1) Barnett's claim under Section 101(a)(2) for loss of staff employment; (2) Plaintiffs' claims under Section 101(a)(5) for loss of elected office; and (3) Barnett's claim under Section 101(a)(5) for loss of staff employment. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 2/28/2020. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?