McClure v. Kings Express, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joseph McClure
Defendant: Kings Express, Inc., Infinity Logistics, Inc., Dennis McCormick and CJ Leasing, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv02977
Filed: April 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 17 LETTER from Wells Fargo dated 9/11/2019. (nsf, )
September 25, 2018 Filing 16 THIRD PARTY respondent answer to citation proceedings regarding Dennis McCormick #15 (Attachment). (yap, )
September 17, 2018 Filing 15 ANSWER to Citation Proceedings by Third Party Respondent Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Exhibit) (sxb, )
August 6, 2018 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joseph McClure by Ryan R. Van Osdol (Van Osdol, Ryan)
July 18, 2018 Filing 13 ENTERED JUDGMENT. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice(lk, )
July 18, 2018 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Motion hearing held on 7/18/2018. Plaintiff's Motion for default judgment against Defendant Dennis McCormick #6 is granted. Enter Order of Default as to Defendant Dennis McCormick. Judgement to follow. Plaintiff's Motion to voluntarily dismiss Defendants Kings Express, Inc., CJ Leasing, LLC and Infinity Logistics, Inc. without prejudice #8 is granted. Mailed notice (lk, )
July 16, 2018 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. On the Court's own Motion, Motion and Status hearing set for 7/17/2018 are reset for 7/18/2018 at 9:00 AM.Mailed notice (lk, )
July 10, 2018 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. By request of counsel, Initial Status hearing reset for 7/17/2018 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (lk, )
July 9, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Jordan Aaron Finfer for presentment of motion to dismiss #8 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 7/17/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Finfer, Jordan)
July 9, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION by Plaintiff Joseph McClure to dismiss certain defendants (Finfer, Jordan)
July 9, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion by Jordan Aaron Finfer for presentment of motion for default judgment #6 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 7/17/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Finfer, Jordan)
July 9, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff Joseph McClure for default judgment as to Dennis McCormick (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Finfer, Jordan)
June 5, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph McClure as to Dennis McCormick on 5/15/2018, answer due 6/5/2018. (Finfer, Jordan)
May 4, 2018 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial status hearing set for 7/12/2018 at 9:00 a.m. Joint Status Report due by 7/9/2018. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate Judge) (lk, )
April 27, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (tt, )
April 26, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants CJ Leasing, LLC, Infinity Logistics, Inc., Kings Express, Inc., Dennis McCormick (pj, )
April 26, 2018 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joseph McClure by Jordan Aaron Finfer (Finfer, Jordan)
April 26, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. (acm, )
April 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Joseph McClure; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14401464. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Finfer, Jordan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McClure v. Kings Express, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kings Express, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infinity Logistics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CJ Leasing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph McClure
Represented By: Jordan Aaron Finfer
Represented By: Ryan R. Van Osdol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?