Zamarin v. Dillon et al
Plaintiff: BARBARA ELIAS ZAMARIN
Defendant: SCOTT M. SETTERSTEN, MICHAEL R. MACDONALD, VANESSA A. WITTMAN, MARY N. DILLON, CATHERINE A. HALLIGAN, DENNIS K. ECK, MICHELLE L. COLLINS, LORNA E. NAGLER, CHARLES J. PHILIPPIN, GEORGE R. MRKONIC, ROBERT F. DIROMUALDO, ULTA BEAUTY, INC. and CHARLES HEILBRONN
Case Number: 1:2018cv04137
Filed: June 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: XX US, Outside the State of IL
Presiding Judge: Martha M Pacold
Nature of Suit: Contract: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: Plaintiff's motion to withdraw the appearances of Alex B. Heller and Stuart J. Guber #39 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 12/11/2020: Mailed notice (rc, )
December 10, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION by Plaintiff Barbara Elias Zamarin to withdraw Alex B. Heller and Stuart J. Guber as counsel (Varindani, Nina)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER: Nina M. Varindani's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of PlaintiffBarbara Elias Zamarin #37 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 11/23/2020:Mailed notice (daj, )
November 12, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17638408. (Varindani, Nina)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk2, Docket)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket3, )
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket3, )
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: Defendant's motion for withdrawal of counsel is granted. Howard Steven Suskin; Paul Benjamin Rietema terminated. Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 4/21/2020Mailed notice(nsf, )
April 21, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION by Defendants Michelle L. Collins, Mary N. Dillon, Robert F. Diromualdo, Dennis K. Eck, Catherine A. Halligan, Charles Heilbronn, Michael R. MacDonald, George R. Mrkonic, Lorna E. Nagler, Charles J. Philippin, Scott M. Settersten, Vanessa A. Wittman to withdraw Howard Steven Suskin and Paul Benjamin Rietema of Jenner & Block LLP as counsel (Martin, Craig)
April 14, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE by Amanda S Amert of Change of Address (Amert, Amanda)
April 14, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE by Craig Christopher Martin of Change of Address (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Martin, Craig)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (pj, )
March 16, 2020 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold:In light of the current situation regarding COVID-19, the status hearing set for 3/24/2020 is stricken. (rao, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 27 STIPULATION FOR CONSOLIDATION, APPOINTMENT OF CO-LEAD COUNSEL AND STAY OF THE FEDERAL DERIVATIVE ACTIONS (Carroll, Katrina)
November 12, 2019 Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold:Status hearing held on 11/12/2019 and continued to 3/24/2020 at 9:45 a.m. The parties are to submit an updated Stipulation for appointment of co-lead counsel and stay of the federal derivative actions. (rao, )
November 8, 2019 Filing 25 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Michelle L. Collins, Mary N. Dillon, Robert F. Diromualdo, Dennis K. Eck, Catherine A. Halligan, Charles Heilbronn, Michael R. MacDonald, George R. Mrkonic, Lorna E. Nagler, Charles J. Philippin, Scott M. Settersten, Vanessa A. Wittman by Paul Benjamin Rietema (Rietema, Paul)
November 8, 2019 Filing 24 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Michelle L. Collins, Mary N. Dillon, Robert F. Diromualdo, Dennis K. Eck, Catherine A. Halligan, Charles Heilbronn, Michael R. MacDonald, George R. Mrkonic, Lorna E. Nagler, Charles J. Philippin, Scott M. Settersten, Vanessa A. Wittman by Amanda S Amert (Amert, Amanda)
November 8, 2019 Filing 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Michelle L. Collins, Mary N. Dillon, Robert F. Diromualdo, Dennis K. Eck, Catherine A. Halligan, Charles Heilbronn, Michael R. MacDonald, George R. Mrkonic, Lorna E. Nagler, Charles J. Philippin, Scott M. Settersten, Vanessa A. Wittman by Howard Steven Suskin (Suskin, Howard)
November 8, 2019 Filing 22 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Michelle L. Collins, Mary N. Dillon, Robert F. Diromualdo, Dennis K. Eck, Catherine A. Halligan, Charles Heilbronn, Michael R. MacDonald, George R. Mrkonic, Lorna E. Nagler, Charles J. Philippin, Scott M. Settersten, Vanessa A. Wittman by Craig Christopher Martin (Martin, Craig)
October 24, 2019 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold:The status hearing set for 11/1/2019 is stricken and reset to 11/12/2019 at 10:00 a.m. (rao, )
October 22, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: The parties are directed to file a joint status report by 10/28/2019. The Court will hold a status hearing in open court on 11/1/2019 at 10:00 a.m. (Attachments: #1 Reassignment Status Report) (rao, )
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Stuart J. Gubers motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #18 on behalf of Plaintiff is granted. Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 10/2/2019. Mailed notice (nsf, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16183135. (Guber, Stuart)
August 23, 2019 Filing 17 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: GENERAL ORDER 19-0025 Pursuant that to the Executive Committee Order entered on August 9, 2019 the civil cases on the attached list have been selected for reassignment to form the initial calendar of the Honorable Martha M. Pacold; therefore IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the attached list of 342 cases be reassigned to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all parties affected by this Order must review the Honorable Martha M. Pacolds webpage on the Courts website for the purpose of reviewing instructions regarding scheduling and case management procedures; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any civil case that has been reassigned pursuant to this Order will not be randomly reassigned to create the initial calendar of a new district judge for twelve months from the date of this Order; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to add the Honorable Martha M. Pacold to the Courts civil case assignment system during the next business day, so that she shall receive a full share of such cases; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to add the Honorable Martha M. Pacold to the Courts criminal case assignment system thirty days from the entry of this Order so that she shall receive a full share of such cases. Case reassigned to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold for all further proceedings. Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 8/23/2019.(lma, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motion to withdraw as attorney #14 is granted. Attorney Stuart J Guber terminated. Notice of motion date of 7/2/2019 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed notice (cdh, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion by Stuart J Guber for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #14 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 7/2/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Guber, Stuart)
June 21, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION by Attorney Stuart J. Guber to withdraw as attorney for Barbara Elias Zamarin. No party information provided (Guber, Stuart)
June 20, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Kyle Alan Shamberg of Change of Address (Notice of Change of Firm Affiliation) (Shamberg, Kyle)
June 20, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Katrina Carroll of Change of Address (Notice of Change of Firm Affiliation) (Carroll, Katrina)
April 1, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motions by Alex Heller and Stuart Guber for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Barbara Elias Zamarin #9 and #10 are granted. Mailed notice (cdh, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15367382. (Heller, Alex)
January 14, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15367284. (Guber, Stuart)
August 13, 2018 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing set before Judge Ellis for 8/14/2018 is stricken. Unopposed motion to reassign related matters: Sbriglio v. Philippin, et al., No. 18-cv-03606, pending before Judge Gettleman, and Zamarin v. Dillon, et al., No. 18-cv-04137, pending before Judge Ellis 61 is granted; the two cases will be consolidated as one derivited action and will proceed under the lower number 18-cv-3606; and the cases are stayed until further order of court. As to No. 18-cv-1577, the briefing schedule is modified as follows: Plaintiffs' amended complaint is due September 10, 2018; Defendants' responsive pleadings are due November 9, 2018; Plaintiffs' opposition, if necessary, is due January 8, 2019; and Defendants' reply brief, if necessary, is due February 7, 2019; the Court will issue a ruling by mail and set the cases for a further status hearing. Mailed notice (cdh, )
August 9, 2018 Filing 7 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr for all further proceedings, pursuant to Local Rule 40.4. Honorable Sara L. Ellis no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/9/2018. (ph, )
July 3, 2018 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 8/14/2018 at 9:30AM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 8/7/2018. Mailed notice (rj, )
June 14, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pk, )
June 14, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. (ec, )
June 13, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff BARBARA ELIAS ZAMARIN by Kyle Alan Shamberg (Shamberg, Kyle)
June 13, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff BARBARA ELIAS ZAMARIN by Katrina Carroll (Carroll, Katrina)
June 13, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Carroll, Katrina)
June 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by BARBARA ELIAS ZAMARIN; Y. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14584879. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carroll, Katrina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zamarin v. Dillon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT M. SETTERSTEN
Represented By: Craig Christopher Martin
Represented By: Howard Steven Suskin
Represented By: Amanda S Amert
Represented By: Paul Benjamin Rietema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL R. MACDONALD
Represented By: Craig Christopher Martin
Represented By: Howard Steven Suskin
Represented By: Amanda S Amert
Represented By: Paul Benjamin Rietema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VANESSA A. WITTMAN
Represented By: Craig Christopher Martin
Represented By: Howard Steven Suskin
Represented By: Amanda S Amert
Represented By: Paul Benjamin Rietema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY N. DILLON
Represented By: Craig Christopher Martin
Represented By: Howard Steven Suskin
Represented By: Amanda S Amert
Represented By: Paul Benjamin Rietema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATHERINE A. HALLIGAN
Represented By: Craig Christopher Martin
Represented By: Howard Steven Suskin
Represented By: Amanda S Amert
Represented By: Paul Benjamin Rietema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DENNIS K. ECK
Represented By: Craig Christopher Martin
Represented By: Howard Steven Suskin
Represented By: Amanda S Amert
Represented By: Paul Benjamin Rietema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHELLE L. COLLINS
Represented By: Craig Christopher Martin
Represented By: Howard Steven Suskin
Represented By: Amanda S Amert
Represented By: Paul Benjamin Rietema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LORNA E. NAGLER
Represented By: Craig Christopher Martin
Represented By: Howard Steven Suskin
Represented By: Amanda S Amert
Represented By: Paul Benjamin Rietema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES J. PHILIPPIN
Represented By: Craig Christopher Martin
Represented By: Howard Steven Suskin
Represented By: Amanda S Amert
Represented By: Paul Benjamin Rietema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE R. MRKONIC
Represented By: Craig Christopher Martin
Represented By: Howard Steven Suskin
Represented By: Amanda S Amert
Represented By: Paul Benjamin Rietema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT F. DIROMUALDO
Represented By: Craig Christopher Martin
Represented By: Howard Steven Suskin
Represented By: Amanda S Amert
Represented By: Paul Benjamin Rietema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ULTA BEAUTY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES HEILBRONN
Represented By: Craig Christopher Martin
Represented By: Howard Steven Suskin
Represented By: Amanda S Amert
Represented By: Paul Benjamin Rietema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA ELIAS ZAMARIN
Represented By: Kyle Alan Shamberg
Represented By: Katrina Carroll
Represented By: Alex B. Heller
Represented By: Nina Varindani
Represented By: Stuart J Guber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?