Semmerling v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Tim Jon Semmerling
Defendant: Michael A Schwartz, Edwin A Perry, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, Cheryl T Bormann, John G Baker and U.S. Army Matthew H Seeger
Case Number: 1:2018cv04432
Filed: June 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Robert W Gettleman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2018 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 7/10/2018. Co-defendant United States' motion #6 to dismiss for failure to exhaust administrative remedies is entered and continued to 8/29/2018 at 9:10 a.m. Mailed notice (cn).
June 28, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion by Kathleen Marie Flannery for presentment of motion to dismiss #6 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/10/2018 at 09:15 AM. (Flannery, Kathleen)
June 28, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION by Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA to dismiss for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Declaration)(Flannery, Kathleen)
June 27, 2018 Filing 5 EMAILED petition for removal letter to Raymond G. Wigell (las, )
June 26, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. (kb, )
June 26, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re notice of removal, #1 Notice of Filing of Removal and Partial Substitution (Flannery, Kathleen)
June 26, 2018 Filing 3 DESIGNATION of Kathleen Marie Flannery as U.S. Attorney for Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Flannery, Kathleen)
June 26, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Flannery, Kathleen)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2018-L-004222) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA & Partial Substitution of th United States as a Co-Defendant (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- Certification)(Flannery, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Semmerling v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin A Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Flannery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl T Bormann
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Flannery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John G Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Army Matthew H Seeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Jon Semmerling
Represented By: Raymond G. Wigell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?