Cicero Gas & Food, Inc. et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Faizan Ghani and Cicero Gas & Food, Inc.
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2018cv04917
Filed: July 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 28:7422
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2018 Filing 9 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Reschedule Initial Status Conference by Cicero Gas & Food, Inc., Faizan Ghani Set for September 27, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Concurrence)(Tapp, Andrew)
August 29, 2018 Filing 8 DESIGNATION of Jimmy Lorenzo Arce as U.S. Attorney for Defendant United States of America (Arce, Jimmy)
August 6, 2018 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motion to appear pro hac vice #6 is granted. Mailed notice (cdh, )
August 2, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14772091. (Tapp, Andrew)
July 30, 2018 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial status hearing is set for 9/27/2018 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the courts action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least two days prior to the initial status. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (cdh, )
July 20, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (acm)
July 19, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (yap, )
July 18, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. (ec, )
July 18, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Cicero Gas & Food, Inc., Faizan Ghani by Mark E King (King, Mark)
July 18, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (King, Mark)
July 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Cicero Gas & Food, Inc., Faizan Ghani; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14716844. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Final Agency Decision)(King, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cicero Gas & Food, Inc. et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faizan Ghani
Represented By: Mark E King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cicero Gas & Food, Inc.
Represented By: Mark E King
Represented By: Andrew Zachary Tapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Jimmy Lorenzo Arce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?