Olympian Group, LLC et al v. Blevins et al
Plaintiff: City of Markham, an Illinois municipal corporation, Olympian Group, LLC, Mack Sanders, Corey Bradford and Michael Irvin
Defendant: Steven R Miller, William Barron, Rondal Jones, Erenest Blevins, Clifton Howard, David Webb, Jr., James Walker, Steve R. Miller, City of Markham and David Webb
Case Number: 1:2018cv04919
Filed: July 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Motion by Seth J Levin for presentment of extension of time, #16 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 9/19/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Levin, Seth)
September 14, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION by Defendants William Barron, Erenest Blevins, City of Markham, Clifton Howard, Rondal Jones, Steve R. Miller, Mack Sanders, James Walker, David Webb for extension of time Second Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Initial Complaint (Levin, Seth)
September 13, 2018 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Corey Bradford, Michael Irvin, Olympian Group, LLC by Lisa Ann Wesolowski (Wesolowski, Lisa)
September 13, 2018 Filing 14 STATUS Report Defendants' Supplement to Plaintiffs' "Joint" Initial Status Report by William Barron, Erenest Blevins, City of Markham, Clifton Howard, Rondal Jones, Steve R. Miller, Mack Sanders, James Walker, David Webb (Levin, Seth)
September 12, 2018 Filing 13 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) , filed by Plaintiffs Corey Bradford, Michael Irvin, Olympian Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing) (Casson, Luke)
August 29, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Mack Sanders and James Walker. (jjr, )
August 10, 2018 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Defendants' Motion for extension of time to answer #10 is granted. Defendants shall answer or otherwise plead by 9/18/2018. The motion presentment date of 8/14/2018 is stricken; parties need not appear. Mailed notice (ef, )
August 8, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Seth J Levin for presentment of extension of time, #10 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 8/14/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Levin, Seth)
August 8, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendants William Barron, Erenest Blevins, City of Markham, Clifton Howard, Rondal Jones, Steve R. Miller, Mack Sanders, James Walker, David Webb for extension of time Defendants' first unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint (Levin, Seth)
August 2, 2018 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants William Barron, Erenest Blevins, City of Markham, Clifton Howard, Rondal Jones, Steve R. Miller, Mack Sanders, James Walker, David Webb by Seth J Levin (Levin, Seth)
August 2, 2018 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants William Barron, Erenest Blevins, City of Markham, Clifton Howard, Rondal Jones, Steve R. Miller, Mack Sanders, James Walker, David Webb by Stepfon Rondell Smith (Smith, Stepfon)
July 24, 2018 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Initial status hearing set for 9/19/2018 at 9:00 AM. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice (ef, )
July 23, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Erenest Blevins (jjr, )
July 20, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant City of Markham. (acm)
July 19, 2018 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Corey Bradford, Michael Irvin, Olympian Group, LLC by Luke A. Casson (Casson, Luke)
July 19, 2018 Filing 5 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Casson, Luke)
July 19, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (jk, )
July 19, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants William Barron, Clifton Howard, Rondal Jones, Steve R Miller, Mack Sanders, James Walker, David Webb (yt)
July 19, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Corey Bradford, Michael Irvin, Olympian Group, LLC by Luke A. Casson (Casson, Luke)
July 19, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Casson, Luke)
July 19, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. (ec, )
July 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Olympian Group, LLC ; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14716894.(Casson, Luke)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olympian Group, LLC et al v. Blevins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Markham, an Illinois municipal corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olympian Group, LLC
Represented By: Luke A. Casson
Represented By: Lisa Ann Wesolowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mack Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Bradford
Represented By: Lisa Ann Wesolowski
Represented By: Luke A. Casson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Irvin
Represented By: Lisa Ann Wesolowski
Represented By: Luke A. Casson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven R Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barron
Represented By: Stepfon Rondell Smith
Represented By: Seth J Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rondal Jones
Represented By: Stepfon Rondell Smith
Represented By: Seth J Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erenest Blevins
Represented By: Stepfon Rondell Smith
Represented By: Seth J Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifton Howard
Represented By: Stepfon Rondell Smith
Represented By: Seth J Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Webb, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Walker
Represented By: Stepfon Rondell Smith
Represented By: Seth J Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve R. Miller
Represented By: Stepfon Rondell Smith
Represented By: Seth J Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Markham
Represented By: Stepfon Rondell Smith
Represented By: Seth J Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Webb
Represented By: Stepfon Rondell Smith
Represented By: Seth J Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?