Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 207.229.186.189
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 207.229.186.189
Case Number: 1:2018cv04945
Filed: July 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Robert W Gettleman
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2018 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Plaintiff's motion #5 for leave to serve a third party subpoena prior to a Rule 26(f) conference is granted. Mailed notice (cn).
July 24, 2018 Filing 8 REVISED NOTICE of Motion by Mary K. Schulz for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #5 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 8/14/2018 at 09:15 AM. (Schulz, Mary)
July 23, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion by Mary K. Schulz for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #5 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 8/2/2018 at 09:15 AM. (Schulz, Mary)
July 23, 2018 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM by Malibu Media, LLC in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #5 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schulz, Mary)
July 23, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLCto serve a third party subpoena prior to a Rule 26(f) conference (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schulz, Mary)
July 23, 2018 Filing 4 MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (ek, )
July 20, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. (rc, )
July 20, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLC by Mary K. Schulz (Schulz, Mary)
July 20, 2018 Filing 2 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Malibu Media, LLC (Schulz, Mary)
July 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Malibu Media, LLC; jury demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14723295. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schulz, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 207.229.186.189
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 207.229.186.189
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Mary K. Schulz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?