Turner v. Middle River Marine, LLC
Plaintiff: Duane Turner
Defendant: Middle River Marine, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv04978
Filed: July 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Putnam
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2018 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Duane Turner by David W. Olivero (Olivero, David)
August 21, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE by Middle River Marine, LLC re answer to complaint #11 Exhibit A (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Carr, Christopher)
August 21, 2018 Filing 11 Defendant ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Middle River Marine, LLC (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Notice of Filing-Answer/Affirmative Defenses)(Carr, Christopher)
August 21, 2018 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Middle River Marine, LLC by Samantha Elizabeth Kaplan SEK Appearance (Kaplan, Samantha)
August 21, 2018 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Middle River Marine, LLC by Bryan Eliot Curry BEC Appearance (Curry, Bryan)
August 21, 2018 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Middle River Marine, LLC by Christopher P. Carr CPC Appearance (Carr, Christopher)
August 17, 2018 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Duane Turner by Kirk E. Karamanian (Karamanian, Kirk)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Joint status report due by 9/26/2018. Status hearing set for 10/1/2018 at 09:00 AM. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 8/3/2018:Mailed notice(srn, )
July 26, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Middle River Marine, LLC (yt)
July 24, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ew, )
July 23, 2018 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Motion to appear pro hac vice #3 is granted; Dennis O'Bryan added for plaintiff. Mailed notice (srn, )
July 23, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14729411. (Attachments: #1 Courts in good standing)(O'Bryan, Dennis)
July 23, 2018 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Duane Turner by Dennis M. O'Bryan (O'Bryan, Dennis)
July 23, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland (jn, ) Docket Text Modified by Clerks Office (ew, ).
July 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Duane Turner; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14726279. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(O'Bryan, Dennis) Docket Text Modified by Clerks Office (ew, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Middle River Marine, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duane Turner
Represented By: Dennis M. O'Bryan
Represented By: David W. Olivero
Represented By: Kirk E. Karamanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Middle River Marine, LLC
Represented By: Christopher P. Carr
Represented By: Samantha Elizabeth Kaplan
Represented By: Bryan Eliot Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?