Oliver v. ICC Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rudy Oliver
Defendant: ICC Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv05137
Filed: July 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Will
Presiding Judge: Charles P Kocoras
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2018 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status hearing held. Oral motion for leave to file an amended answer by 10/4/2018 is granted. Status hearing set for 10/11/2018 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (vcf, )
August 21, 2018 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rudy Oliver by Gary William Baun (Baun, Gary)
August 15, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by ICC Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Cullinan, Patrick)
August 13, 2018 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant ICC Group, Inc. by John Andrew O'Donnell (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(O'Donnell, John)
August 13, 2018 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant ICC Group, Inc. by Steven Brian Belgrade (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Belgrade, Steven)
August 13, 2018 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant ICC Group, Inc. by Patrick Joseph Cullinan (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Cullinan, Patrick)
August 10, 2018 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Order entered on 8/10/2018 #6 is amended as follows: Status hearing set for 8/10/2018 is reset to 9/20/2018 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice (vcf, )
August 10, 2018 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status hearing set for 8/20/2018 at 9:30 AM. At the initial hearing, parties to report on the following: 1. Possibility of settlement. 2. If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to prepare the case for resolution. Lead counsel for each party is required to attend the initial hearing. Failure to appear at any scheduled court hearing may result in the dismissal of claims for want of prosecution. Pursuant to Local Rule 5.3(a)(1), service of motions and notice of motions must be accomplished no later than 4:00 p.m. of the third business day preceding the date of presentment. This includes delivering a hard copy of the motion and notice of motion to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B no later than 4:00 p.m. the day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the matter from the Court's motion call. The Court requires hard copies of all documents be submitted to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B the same day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the document from the record. The Court directs counsel's attention to its Motion Schedule and Case Management Procedures located at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Plaintiff is directed to advise all other parties of the Court's action herein. Mailed notice (vcf, )
August 3, 2018 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Attorney Dennis M. O'Bryan's application to appear pro hac vice #3 is granted. Mailed notice (vcf, )
July 27, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rudy Oliver by Frederic A. Mendelsohn (Mendelsohn, Frederic)
July 27, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant ICC Group, Inc. (kb, )
July 27, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14752330. (Attachments: #1 Courts in good standing)(O'Bryan, Dennis)
July 27, 2018 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rudy Oliver by Dennis M. O'Bryan (O'Bryan, Dennis)
July 27, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. (acm)
July 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Rudy Oliver; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14750710. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(O'Bryan, Dennis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oliver v. ICC Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICC Group, Inc.
Represented By: John Andrew O'Donnell
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Cullinan
Represented By: Steven Brian Belgrade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rudy Oliver
Represented By: Dennis M. O'Bryan
Represented By: Frederic A. Mendelsohn
Represented By: Gary William Baun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?