Luna v. 4C Kinzie Investor, LLC et al
Plaintiff: ERIK LUNA, Laura Palya, Rachel Foley, Annie Callanta, Erin Rottenberg, Jennifer Strait, Noelle Hoffman, Melissa Mosher and Kathleen Cahill
Defendant: FOUR CORNERS TAVERN FUND I, LLC, FOUR CORNERS CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC, 1001 W. Lake Opco, LLC d/b/a Federales, FOUR CORNERS SHUTTLE, LLC, 4C RIVERSIDE, LLC d/b/a PORTER KITCHEN & DECK, 4C CHEVAL LLC, WELLS HOLDINGS MANAGER, LLC, SHEF AT OAK, INC. d/b/a KIRKWOOD BAR & GRILL f/k/a BROWNSTONE TAVERN & GRILL (Sheffield & Oakdale), ANDREW GLOOR, SALOON HOLDINGS, LLC d/b/a THE CROSSING TAVERN, MATTHEW MENNA, 4C WRIGLEY, LLC d/b/a BRICKHOUSE TAVERN, FOUR CORNERS, a voluntary unincorporated association, WELLS HOLDINGS, LLC a/b/a BENCHMARK BAR AND GRILL, CLARK STREET RESTAURANT PARTNERS, LLC f/k/a 2450 N. CLARK, INC. d/b/a GASLIGHT, 4C 1500 N. WELLS OPCO, LLC, THE CHASE TAVERN, INC. d/b/a TRELLIS WINE BAR, FOUR CORNERS TAVERN GROUP FUND INVESTOR, LLC, RIVER NORTH TAP, INC. d/b/a SIDEBAR GRILLE, 1001 W. LAKE, LLC, 4C 1001 W. LAKE OPCO, LLC, 1500 N. WELLS OPCO, LLC d/b/a 80 Proof f/k/a STEAKBAR, HARDTALES, INC. d/b/a BROWNSTONE TAVERN & GRILL (Lincoln and Irving Park), FOUR CORNERS HOLDINGS, LLC, WEST LOOP TAP, LLC d/b/a WESTEND BAR & GRILL f/k/a BROWNSTONE TAVERN & GRILL (Madison and Ada), KEYSTONE HOLDINGS CORP., ROCCO'S LLC d/b/a RANALLI'S, TALBOTT ASSOCIATES, L.P. d/b/a 20 EAST, FOUR CORNERS TAVERN FUND MANAGEMENT, LLC, FOUR CORNERS TAVERN PARTNERS, LLC, SALOON HOLDINGS MANAGER, LLC, ASCLOSE, INC. d/b/a SCHOOLYARD TAVERN & GRILL, CHEVAL PORTER MANAGER, LLC, 4C Kinzie Investor, LLC d/b/a Highline Bar & Lounge, FOUR CORNERS TAVERN GROUP, INC., 4C 15 E. ILLINOIS OPERATIONS, LLC d/b/a FREMONT BAR, Clark Street Restaurant Partners, LLC, Asclose, Inc., 1001 W. Lake Opco, LLC, The Chase Tavern, Inc., Four Corners, 4C Wrigley, LLC, 4C 15 E. Illinois Operations, LLC, Wells Holdings, LLC, Rocco's, LLC, Talbott Associates, LP, Hardtales, Inc., West Loop Tap, LLC, 4C Kinzie Investor, LLC, 1500 N. Wells Opco, LLC, River North Tap, Inc., Shef at Oak, Inc., Saloon Holdings, LLC. and 4C Riverside, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv05165
Filed: July 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Harry D Leinenweber
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 72 REPLY by Defendant 4C Kinzie Investor, LLC to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #65 Four Corners' Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Showel, Matthew)
August 29, 2019 Filing 71 RESPONSE by Kathleen Cahill, Annie Callanta, Rachel Foley, Noelle Hoffman, Erik Luna, Melissa Mosher, Laura Palya, Erin Rottenberg, Jennifer Straitin Opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant 4C Kinzie Investor, LLC Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #65 (De Re, Matthew)
August 8, 2019 Filing 70 Defendants' ANSWER to amended complaint by 4C Kinzie Investor, LLC(Showel, Matthew)
July 25, 2019 Filing 69 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: The Court's 7/25/19 order is amended to reflect the following: Reply to the motion to dismiss shall be filed by 9/6/19. Mailed notice (maf)
July 25, 2019 Filing 68 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Status hearing held. Defendants' motion to dismiss #65 is entered and briefed as follows: response by 8/29/19, 9/6/19. Status hearing/ruling is set for 11/6/19 at 9:00 a.m. Defendant shall answer the outstanding issues in the complaint by 8/8/19. Mailed notice(maf)
July 22, 2019 Filing 67 MEMORANDUM by 4C Kinzie Investor, LLC in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #65 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint (Showel, Matthew)
July 22, 2019 Filing 66 NOTICE of Motion by Matthew Showel for presentment of before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 7/25/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Showel, Matthew)
July 22, 2019 Filing 65 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant 4C Kinzie Investor, LLC Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (Showel, Matthew)
July 17, 2019 Filing 64 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: The Court's 7/17/19 order is amended as follows: Agreed motion for extension of time to 7/22/19 to answer or otherwise plead is granted #61 . Mailed notice(maf)
July 17, 2019 Filing 63 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Agreed motion for extension of time to 7/22/19 to answer or otherwise plead #61 . Mailed notice(maf)
July 17, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE of Motion by Matthew Showel for presentment of extension of time #61 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 7/23/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Showel, Matthew)
July 17, 2019 Filing 61 MOTION by Defendant 4C Kinzie Investor, LLC for extension of time to respond to Amended Complaint (Showel, Matthew)
June 21, 2019 Filing 60 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Unopposed motion for extension of time to 7/18/19 to answer or otherwise plead #58 is granted. Status hearing set for 7/10/19 is re-set to 7/25/19 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice(maf)
June 21, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE of Motion by Matthew Showel for presentment of extension of time #58 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 6/27/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Showel, Matthew)
June 21, 2019 Filing 58 MOTION by Defendant 4C Kinzie Investor, LLC for extension of time to respond to Amended Complaint (Showel, Matthew)
June 13, 2019 Filing 57 AMENDED complaint by Erik Luna against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(De Re, Matthew)
May 9, 2019 Filing 56 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Ruling on motion hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's motion to compel #53 is granted as follows: Defendants are to produce transaction level data for the establishment at which Mr. Luna worked, for three years prior to Plaintiff's filing the Complaint. Defendants shall produce this discovery on or before 5/30/19. Plaintiffs shall file their amended complaint on or before 6/13/19. The status date set for 5/28/19 is re-set to 7/10/19 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice(maf)
May 6, 2019 Filing 55 Re- NOTICE of Motion by Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr for presentment of motion to compel, #53 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 5/9/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Zimmerman, Thomas)
May 3, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE of Motion by Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr for presentment of motion to compel, #53 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 5/8/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Zimmerman, Thomas)
May 3, 2019 Filing 53 MOTION by Plaintiff Erik Luna to compel Further Responses to His Written Discovery Requests (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pltf Luna's Written Discovery to Defs, #2 Exhibit B - Defs' Res to First Set of Written Discovery)(Zimmerman, Thomas)
April 22, 2019 Filing 52 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Unopposed motion for extension of time to 5/13/19 to file an amended complaint #50 is granted. Mailed notice(maf)
April 19, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Motion by Matthew C. De Re for presentment of extension of time #50 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 4/30/2019 at 09:30 AM. (De Re, Matthew)
April 19, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION by Plaintiff Erik Luna for extension of time to File His Amended Complaint (Unopposed) (De Re, Matthew)
April 9, 2019 Filing 49 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Status hearing/ruling set for 4/11/19 is vacated. Status hearing set for 5/28/19 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (maf)
March 18, 2019 Filing 48 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. For the reasons stated herein, the Court grants in part and denies in part Defendants' motion to dismiss #23 . Counts V-IX are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff has leave to amend his Complaint on or before 4/22/19. Failure to do so will convert the Courts Order from one without prejudice to one with prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 3/18/2019: Mailed notice(maf)
February 28, 2019 Filing 47 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Status hearing and ruling on motion hearing held. Motion to compel #34 is withdrawn without prejudice with leave to re-file. Status hearing/ruling re: motion to dismiss #23 is set for 4/11/19 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice(maf)
February 14, 2019 Filing 46 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Status hearing held and continued to 2/28/19 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (maf)
February 8, 2019 Filing 45 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Ruling date of 2/14/19 is stricken. The Court will rule by mail. Status hearing set for 2/14/19 at 9:00 a.m. shall stand. Mailed notice(maf) Modified on 2/8/2019 (maf, ).
January 29, 2019 Filing 44 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Status hearing held and continued to 2/14/19 at 9:00 a.m. Status hearing date of 2/12/19, stated on the record, is vacated. Production to be made by 2/5/19. Mailed notice(maf)
January 22, 2019 Filing 43 Enter agreed confidentiality order. Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 1/22/2019: Mailed notice (maf )
January 15, 2019 Filing 42 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: In court hearing held. Parties agreed to tender protective order to the Court on or by 1/18/19. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's request for document production by 1/25/19. Pending resolution of that production, the Court will rule on Plaintiff's motion to compel #34. In court hearing set for 1/29/19 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice(maf) Modified on 1/22/2019 (maf, ).
January 10, 2019 Filing 41 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Erik Luna (De Re, Matthew)
January 10, 2019 Filing 40 SUPPLEMENT to motion to compel #34 (De Re, Matthew)
January 2, 2019 Filing 39 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 12/13/2018 before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Order Number: 33262. Court Reporter Contact Information: Judith A. Walsh, CSR, RDR, F/CRR. Official Court Reporter. judith_walsh@ilnd.uscourts.gov.

< Redaction Request due 1/23/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/4/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/2/2019. (Walsh, Judy)
December 13, 2018 Filing 38 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Hearing on pending motions [34, 36] held. Luna's motion to compel Defendants to cooperate in discovery and for referral to the magistrate #36 is denied without prejudice. Defendants represented that they were not served with written discovery prior to said discovery being attached to the pending motions. Defendants shall respond to Luna's written discovery but may raise cost or overbreadth objections if they have them. As for Luna's motion #34 to compel non-party National Cash Register Company to comply with Luna's subpoena to produce documents: Defendants and NCRC contend that Defendants possess these documents and Plaintiff should seek to obtain them from Defendants directly; NCRC also contends that as a jurisdictional matter, Luna must take its non-party subpoena to the Northern District of Georgia, where NCRC is headquartered, for enforcement. The Court expressed no opinion on these arguments at this time and ordered the parties to meet and confer concerning this dispute and try to resolve it by the next status hearing, set for 1/15/19 at 9:00 a.m. If the parties are unable to settle this dispute among themselves by then, the Court will take up the issues itself. The Motion to compel NCRC's compliance with the subpoena #34 is entered and continued until the 1/15/19 status. Mailed notice(maf)
December 7, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE of Motion by Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr for presentment of motion to compel #36 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 12/13/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Zimmerman, Thomas)
December 7, 2018 Filing 36 MOTION by Plaintiff Erik Luna to compel Defendants to Cooperate in Discovery, and to Refer the Matter to the Magistrate Judge for Discovery Supervision (Zimmerman, Thomas)
December 7, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE of Motion by Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr for presentment of motion to compel #34 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 12/13/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Zimmerman, Thomas)
December 7, 2018 Filing 34 MOTION by Plaintiff Erik Luna to compel National Cash Register Company to Comply with Plaintiff's Subpoena to Produce Documents (Zimmerman, Thomas)
November 30, 2018 Filing 33 REPLY by Defendants 4C 15 E. Illinois Operations, LLC, 4C Kinzie Investor, LLC, 1001 W. Lake Opco, LLC, 1001 W. Lake, LLC, 1500 N. Wells Opco, LLC, 4C 1001 W. Lake Opco, LLC, 4C 1500 N. Wells Opco, LLC, 4C Cheval LLC, 4C Riverside, LLC, 4C Wrigley, LLC, Asclose, Inc., Cheval Porter Manager, LLC, Clark Street Restaurant Partners, LLC, Four Corners, Four Corners Capital Advisors, LLC, Four Corners Holdings, LLC, Four Corners Shuttle, LLC, Four Corners Tavern Fund I, LLC, Four Corners Tavern Fund Management, LLC, Four Corners Tavern Group Fund Investor, LLC, Four Corners Tavern Group, Inc., Four Corners Tavern Partners, LLC, Andrew Gloor, Hardtales, Inc., Keystone Holdings Corp., Matthew Menna, River North Tap, Inc., Rocco's, LLC, Saloon Holdings Manager, LLC, Saloon Holdings, LLC., Shef at Oak, Inc., Talbott Associates, LP, The Chase Tavern, Inc., Wells Holdings Manager, LLC, Wells Holdings, LLC, West Loop Tap, LLC to motion to dismiss,,, #23 (Showel, Matthew)
November 16, 2018 Filing 32 RESPONSE by Erik Lunain Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Four Corners Shuttle, LLC, Four Corners Capital Advisors, LLC, Asclose, Inc., 1500 N. Wells Opco, LLC, Four Corners, Shef at Oak, Inc., 4C Kinzie Investor, LLC, River North Tap, Inc., Four Corners Tavern Group, Inc., West Loop Tap, #23 (Zimmerman, Thomas)
November 2, 2018 Filing 31 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Plaintiff's motion #29 for leave to file an oversize response is denied. The Court earlier ruled on this request, allowing each party 20 pages for their respective briefing on Defendants' motion to dismiss #23 . Defendants adhered to the 20-page ruling by filing a 20-page memorandum in support 24. Plaintiff should be able to respond to the arguments articulated therein within the same page limit. Plaintiff shall file his response, no longer than 20 pages, by 11/16/18. Reply by 11/30/18. Status hearing/ruling set for 1/15/19 is re-set to 2/14/19 at 9:00 a.m. No appearance needed on 11/6/18. Mailed notice(maf)
October 31, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE of Motion by Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr for presentment of motion for leave to file #29 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 11/6/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Zimmerman, Thomas)
October 31, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION by Plaintiff Erik Luna for leave to file Oversize Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Proffered Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(De Re, Matthew)
October 18, 2018 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Unopposed motion for an extension of time to respond to defendants' motion to dismiss #26 is granted. The briefing schedule re: motion to dismiss #23 is amended as follows: response by 10/31/18, reply by 11/21/18. Status hearing/ruling set for 12/6/18 is re-set to 1/15/19 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice(maf)
October 17, 2018 Filing 27 Unopposed NOTICE of Motion by Matthew C. De Re for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply #26 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 10/23/2018 at 09:30 AM. (De Re, Matthew)
October 17, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION by Plaintiff Erik Luna for extension of time to file response/reply as to motion to dismiss,,, #23 (Unopposed) (De Re, Matthew)
October 4, 2018 Filing 25 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Erik Luna by Sharon Harris (Harris, Sharon)
September 18, 2018 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM by 4C 15 E. Illinois Operations, LLC, 4C Kinzie Investor, LLC, 1001 W. Lake Opco, LLC, 1001 W. Lake, LLC, 1500 N. Wells Opco, LLC, 4C 1001 W. Lake Opco, LLC, 4C 1500 N. Wells Opco, LLC, 4C Cheval LLC, 4C Riverside, LLC, 4C Wrigley, LLC, Asclose, Inc., Cheval Porter Manager, LLC, Clark Street Restaurant Partners, LLC, Four Corners, Four Corners Capital Advisors, LLC, Four Corners Holdings, LLC, Four Corners Shuttle, LLC, Four Corners Tavern Fund I, LLC, Four Corners Tavern Fund Management, LLC, Four Corners Tavern Group Fund Investor, LLC, Four Corners Tavern Group, Inc., Four Corners Tavern Partners, LLC, Andrew Gloor, Hardtales, Inc., Keystone Holdings Corp., Matthew Menna, River North Tap, Inc., Rocco's, LLC, Saloon Holdings Manager, LLC, Saloon Holdings, LLC., Shef at Oak, Inc., Talbott Associates, LP, The Chase Tavern, Inc., Wells Holdings Manager, LLC, Wells Holdings, LLC, West Loop Tap, LLC in support of motion to dismiss,,, #23 (Showel, Matthew)
September 18, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION by Defendants Four Corners Shuttle, LLC, Four Corners Capital Advisors, LLC, Asclose, Inc., 1500 N. Wells Opco, LLC, Four Corners, Shef at Oak, Inc., 4C Kinzie Investor, LLC, River North Tap, Inc., Four Corners Tavern Group, Inc., West Loop Tap, LLC, Hardtales, Inc., Four Corners Tavern Fund I, LLC, Four Corners Tavern Group Fund Investor, LLC, Wells Holdings, LLC, Clark Street Restaurant Partners, LLC, Saloon Holdings Manager, LLC, 4C Wrigley, LLC, Four Corners Holdings, LLC, 1001 W. Lake, LLC, Keystone Holdings Corp., The Chase Tavern, Inc., Cheval Porter Manager, LLC, Saloon Holdings, LLC., Four Corners Tavern Partners, LLC, Four Corners Tavern Fund Management, LLC, 1001 W. Lake Opco, LLC, Matthew Menna, Talbott Associates, LP, 4C Riverside, LLC, Wells Holdings Manager, LLC, 4C 1500 N. Wells Opco, LLC, 4C 1001 W. Lake Opco, LLC, 4C Cheval LLC, Andrew Gloor, Rocco's, LLC, 4C 15 E. Illinois Operations, LLC to dismiss complaint (Showel, Matthew)
September 18, 2018 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Status hearing and ruling on motion hearing held. Unopposed motion for leave to file a brief in excess of the page limit #20 is granted. Motion to dismiss shall be filed instanter, response by 10/17/18, reply by 10/31/18. All briefs are granted in excess of the page limit as set forth on the record. Status hearing/ruling set for 12/6/18 at 9:00 a.m. Status hearing date of 11/29/18, stated on the record is vacated. Mailed notice(maf)
September 11, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Motion by Matthew Showel for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages,,,, #20 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 9/18/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Showel, Matthew)
September 11, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION by Defendants 4C 15 E. Illinois Operations, LLC, 4C Kinzie Investor, LLC, 1001 W. Lake Opco, LLC, 1001 W. Lake, LLC, 1500 N. Wells Opco, LLC, 4C 1001 W. Lake Opco, LLC, 4C 1500 N. Wells Opco, LLC, 4C Cheval LLC, 4C Riverside, LLC, 4C Wrigley, LLC, Asclose, Inc., Cheval Porter Manager, LLC, Clark Street Restaurant Partners, LLC, Four Corners, Four Corners Capital Advisors, LLC, Four Corners Holdings, LLC, Four Corners Shuttle, LLC, Four Corners Tavern Fund I, LLC, Four Corners Tavern Fund Management, LLC, Four Corners Tavern Group Fund Investor, LLC, Four Corners Tavern Group, Inc., Four Corners Tavern Partners, LLC, Andrew Gloor, Hardtales, Inc., Keystone Holdings Corp., Matthew Menna, River North Tap, Inc., Rocco's, LLC, Saloon Holdings Manager, LLC, Saloon Holdings, LLC., Shef at Oak, Inc., Talbott Associates, LP, The Chase Tavern, Inc., Wells Holdings Manager, LLC, Wells Holdings, LLC, West Loop Tap, LLC for leave to file excess pages (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Showel, Matthew)
August 30, 2018 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Unopposed motion for extension of time to 9/11/18 to answer #17 is granted. Status hearing set for 9/11/18 is re-set to 9/18/18 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice(maf)
August 29, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Motion by David G. Wix for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer,,,, #17 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 9/4/2018 at 09:30 PM. (Wix, David)
August 29, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION by Defendants 4C 15 E. Illinois Operations, LLC, 4C Kinzie Investor, LLC, 1001 W. Lake Opco, LLC, 1001 W. Lake, LLC, 1500 N. Wells Opco, LLC, 4C 1001 W. Lake Opco, LLC, 4C 1500 N. Wells Opco, LLC, 4C Cheval LLC, 4C Riverside, LLC, 4C Wrigley, LLC, Asclose, Inc., Cheval Porter Manager, LLC, Clark Street Restaurant Partners, LLC, Four Corners, Four Corners Capital Advisors, LLC, Four Corners Holdings, LLC, Four Corners Shuttle, LLC, Four Corners Tavern Fund I, LLC, Four Corners Tavern Fund Management, LLC, Four Corners Tavern Group Fund Investor, LLC, Four Corners Tavern Group, Inc., Four Corners Tavern Partners, LLC, Andrew Gloor, Hardtales, Inc., Keystone Holdings Corp., Matthew Menna, River North Tap, Inc., Rocco's, LLC, Saloon Holdings Manager, LLC, Saloon Holdings, LLC., Shef at Oak, Inc., Talbott Associates, LP, The Chase Tavern, Inc., Wells Holdings Manager, LLC, Wells Holdings, LLC, West Loop Tap, LLC for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead (Wix, David)
August 7, 2018 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Unopposed motion for extension of time to 9/4/18 to answer or otherwise plead #8 is granted. Status hearing set for 9/11/18 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice(maf)
August 6, 2018 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Motion hearing held. Plaintiff's motion for protective order governing Defendants' communications with potential class/collective members #11 is denied as moot given the parties' agreement, which was set forth on the record. Mailed notice. (lf, )
August 6, 2018 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants 4C 15 E. Illinois Operations, LLC, 4C Kinzie Investor, LLC, 1001 W. Lake Opco, LLC, 1001 W. Lake, LLC, 1500 N. Wells Opco, LLC, 4C 1001 W. Lake Opco, LLC, 4C 1500 N. Wells Opco, LLC, 4C Cheval LLC, 4C Riverside, LLC, 4C Wrigley, LLC, Asclose, Inc., Cheval Porter Manager, LLC, Clark Street Restaurant Partners, LLC, Four Corners, Four Corners Capital Advisors, LLC, Four Corners Holdings, LLC, Four Corners Shuttle, LLC, Four Corners Tavern Fund I, LLC, Four Corners Tavern Fund Management, LLC, Four Corners Tavern Group Fund Investor, LLC, Four Corners Tavern Group, Inc., Four Corners Tavern Partners, LLC, Andrew Gloor, Hardtales, Inc., Keystone Holdings Corp., Matthew Menna, River North Tap, Inc., Rocco's, LLC, Saloon Holdings Manager, LLC, Saloon Holdings, LLC., Shef at Oak, Inc., Talbott Associates, LP, The Chase Tavern, Inc., Wells Holdings Manager, LLC, Wells Holdings, LLC, West Loop Tap, LLC by David G. Wix (Wix, David)
August 5, 2018 Filing 13 RESPONSE by 4C 15 E. Illinois Operations, LLC, 4C Kinzie Investor, LLC, 1001 W. Lake Opco, LLC, 1001 W. Lake, LLC, 1500 N. Wells Opco, LLC, 4C 1001 W. Lake Opco, LLC, 4C 1500 N. Wells Opco, LLC, 4C Cheval LLC, 4C Riverside, LLC, 4C Wrigley, LLC, Asclose, Inc., Cheval Porter Manager, LLC, Clark Street Restaurant Partners, LLC, Four Corners, Four Corners Capital Advisors, LLC, Four Corners Holdings, LLC, Four Corners Shuttle, LLC, Four Corners Tavern Fund I, LLC, Four Corners Tavern Fund Management, LLC, Four Corners Tavern Group Fund Investor, LLC, Four Corners Tavern Group, Inc., Four Corners Tavern Partners, LLC, Andrew Gloor, Hardtales, Inc., Keystone Holdings Corp., Matthew Menna, River North Tap, Inc., Rocco's, LLC, Saloon Holdings Manager, LLC, Saloon Holdings, LLC., Shef at Oak, Inc., Talbott Associates, LP, The Chase Tavern, Inc., Wells Holdings Manager, LLC, Wells Holdings, LLC, West Loop Tap, LLCin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Erik Luna for protective order governing Defendants' communications with potential class/collective members #11 (Luce, Cheryl)
August 4, 2018 Filing 12 EMERGENCY NOTICE of Motion by Matthew C. De Re for presentment of motion for protective order, #11 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 8/6/2018 at 09:00 AM. (De Re, Matthew)
August 4, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION by Plaintiff Erik Luna for protective order governing Defendants' communications with potential class/collective members (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Meeting Email, #2 Exhibit B - Rudny Email, #3 Exhibit C - De Re Declaration)(De Re, Matthew)
August 4, 2018 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Erik Luna by Matthew C. De Re (De Re, Matthew)
August 3, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Daniel W. Tarpey for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer,,, #8 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 8/9/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Tarpey, Daniel)
August 3, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendants 4C 15 E. Illinois Operations, LLC, 4C Kinzie Investor, LLC, 1001 W. Lake Opco, LLC, 1001 W. Lake, LLC, 1500 N. Wells Opco, LLC, 4C 1001 W. Lake Opco, LLC, 4C 1500 N. Wells Opco, LLC, 4C Cheval LLC, 4C Riverside, LLC, 4C Wrigley, LLC, Asclose, Inc., Cheval Porter Manager, LLC, Clark Street Restaurant Partners, LLC, Four Corners, Four Corners Capital Advisors, LLC, Four Corners Holdings, LLC, Four Corners Shuttle, LLC, Four Corners Tavern Fund I, LLC, Four Corners Tavern Fund Management, LLC, Four Corners Tavern Group Fund Investor, LLC, Four Corners Tavern Group, Inc., Four Corners Tavern Partners, LLC, Andrew Gloor, Hardtales, Inc., Keystone Holdings Corp., Matthew Menna, River North Tap, Inc., Rocco's, LLC, Saloon Holdings Manager, LLC, Saloon Holdings, LLC., Shef at Oak, Inc., Talbott Associates, LP, The Chase Tavern, Inc., Wells Holdings Manager, LLC, Wells Holdings, LLC, West Loop Tap, LLC for extension of time to file answer (Tarpey, Daniel)
July 31, 2018 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Erik Luna by Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr (Zimmerman, Thomas)
July 31, 2018 Filing 6 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (aee, )
July 31, 2018 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants 4C 15 E. Illinois Operations, LLC, 4C Kinzie Investor, LLC, 1001 W. LAKE, LLC, 1001 W. Lake Opco, LLC, 1500 N. Wells Opco, LLC, 4C 1001 W. Lake Opco, LLC, 4C 1500 N. Wells Opco, LLC, 4C CHEVAL LLC, 4C Riverside, LLC, 4C Wrigley, LLC, ASCLOSE, INC. d/b/a SCHOOLYARD TAVERN & GRILL, Cheval Porter Manager, LLC, Clark Street Restaurant Partners, LLC, FOUR CORNERS CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC, FOUR CORNERS HOLDINGS, LLC, FOUR CORNERS SHUTTLE, LLC, FOUR CORNERS TAVERN FUND I, LLC, FOUR CORNERS TAVERN GROUP FUND INVESTOR, LLC, FOUR CORNERS TAVERN GROUP, INC., FOUR CORNERS TAVERN PARTNERS, LLC, FOUR CORNERS, a voluntary unincorporated association, Four Corners Tavern Fund Management, LLC, ANDREW GLOOR, HARDTALES, INC. d/b/a BROWNSTONE TAVERN & GRILL (Lincoln and Irving Park), Keystone Holdings Corp., MATTHEW MENNA, River North Tap, Inc., Rocco's, LLC, SALOON HOLDINGS MANAGER, LLC, SALOON HOLDINGS, LLC d/b/a THE CROSSING TAVERN, Shef at Oak, Inc., THE CHASE TAVERN, INC. d/b/a TRELLIS WINE BAR, Talbott Associates, LP, Wells Holdings Manager, LLC, Wells Holdings, LLC, West Loop Tap, LLC by Cheryl A Luce (Luce, Cheryl)
July 31, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants 4C 15 E. Illinois Operations, LLC, 4C Kinzie Investor, LLC, 1001 W. LAKE, LLC, 1001 W. Lake Opco, LLC, 1500 N. Wells Opco, LLC, 4C 1001 W. Lake Opco, LLC, 4C 1500 N. Wells Opco, LLC, 4C CHEVAL LLC, 4C Riverside, LLC, 4C Wrigley, LLC, ASCLOSE, INC. d/b/a SCHOOLYARD TAVERN & GRILL, Cheval Porter Manager, LLC, Clark Street Restaurant Partners, LLC, FOUR CORNERS CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC, FOUR CORNERS HOLDINGS, LLC, FOUR CORNERS SHUTTLE, LLC, FOUR CORNERS TAVERN FUND I, LLC, FOUR CORNERS TAVERN GROUP FUND INVESTOR, LLC, FOUR CORNERS TAVERN GROUP, INC., FOUR CORNERS TAVERN PARTNERS, LLC, FOUR CORNERS, a voluntary unincorporated association, Four Corners Tavern Fund Management, LLC, ANDREW GLOOR, HARDTALES, INC. d/b/a BROWNSTONE TAVERN & GRILL (Lincoln and Irving Park), Keystone Holdings Corp., MATTHEW MENNA, River North Tap, Inc., Rocco's, LLC, SALOON HOLDINGS MANAGER, LLC, SALOON HOLDINGS, LLC d/b/a THE CROSSING TAVERN, Shef at Oak, Inc., THE CHASE TAVERN, INC. d/b/a TRELLIS WINE BAR, Talbott Associates, LP, Wells Holdings Manager, LLC, Wells Holdings, LLC, West Loop Tap, LLC by Noah A Finkel (Finkel, Noah)
July 30, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants 1001 W. LAKE, LLC, 1001 W. Lake Opco, LLC d/b/a Federales, 1500 N. WELLS OPCO, LLC d/b/a 80 Proof f/k/a STEAKBAR, 4C 1001 W. LAKE OPCO, LLC, 4C 15 E. ILLINOIS OPERATIONS, LLC d/b/a FREMONT BAR, 4C 1500 N. WELLS OPCO, LLC, 4C CHEVAL LLC, 4C Kinzie Investor, LLC d/b/a Highline Bar & Lounge, 4C RIVERSIDE, LLC d/b/a PORTER KITCHEN & DECK, 4C WRIGLEY, LLC d/b/a BRICKHOUSE TAVERN, ASCLOSE, INC. d/b/a SCHOOLYARD TAVERN & GRILL, CHEVAL PORTER MANAGER, LLC, CLARK STREET RESTAURANT PARTNERS, LLC f/k/a 2450 N. CLARK, INC. d/b/a GASLIGHT, FOUR CORNERS CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC, FOUR CORNERS HOLDINGS, LLC, FOUR CORNERS SHUTTLE, LLC, FOUR CORNERS TAVERN FUND I, LLC, FOUR CORNERS TAVERN FUND MANAGEMENT, LLC, FOUR CORNERS TAVERN GROUP FUND INVESTOR, LLC, FOUR CORNERS TAVERN GROUP, INC., FOUR CORNERS TAVERN PARTNERS, LLC, FOUR CORNERS, a voluntary unincorporated association, ANDREW GLOOR, HARDTALES, INC. d/b/a BROWNSTONE TAVERN & GRILL (Lincoln and Irving Park), KEYSTONE HOLDINGS CORP., MATTHEW MENNA, RIVER NORTH TAP, INC. d/b/a SIDEBAR GRILLE, ROCCO'S LLC d/b/a RANALLI'S, SALOON HOLDINGS MANAGER, LLC, SALOON HOLDINGS, LLC d/b/a THE CROSSING TAVERN, SHEF AT OAK, INC. d/b/a KIRKWOOD BAR & GRILL f/k/a BROWNSTONE TAVERN & GRILL (Sheffield & Oakdale), TALBOTT ASSOCIATES, L.P. d/b/a 20 EAST, THE CHASE TAVERN, INC. d/b/a TRELLIS WINE BAR, WELLS HOLDINGS MANAGER, LLC, WELLS HOLDINGS, LLC a/b/a BENCHMARK BAR AND GRILL, WEST LOOP TAP, LLC d/b/a WESTEND BAR & GRILL f/k/a BROWNSTONE TAVERN & GRILL (Madison and Ada) by Matthew Showel (Showel, Matthew)
July 30, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Michael T. Mason. (jjr, )
July 30, 2018 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants 1001 W. LAKE, LLC, 1001 W. Lake Opco, LLC d/b/a Federales, 1500 N. WELLS OPCO, LLC d/b/a 80 Proof f/k/a STEAKBAR, 4C 1001 W. LAKE OPCO, LLC, 4C 15 E. ILLINOIS OPERATIONS, LLC d/b/a FREMONT BAR, 4C 1500 N. WELLS OPCO, LLC, 4C CHEVAL LLC, 4C Kinzie Investor, LLC d/b/a Highline Bar & Lounge, 4C RIVERSIDE, LLC d/b/a PORTER KITCHEN & DECK, 4C WRIGLEY, LLC d/b/a BRICKHOUSE TAVERN, ASCLOSE, INC. d/b/a SCHOOLYARD TAVERN & GRILL, CHEVAL PORTER MANAGER, LLC, CLARK STREET RESTAURANT PARTNERS, LLC f/k/a 2450 N. CLARK, INC. d/b/a GASLIGHT, FOUR CORNERS CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC, FOUR CORNERS HOLDINGS, LLC, FOUR CORNERS SHUTTLE, LLC, FOUR CORNERS TAVERN FUND I, LLC, FOUR CORNERS TAVERN FUND MANAGEMENT, LLC, FOUR CORNERS TAVERN GROUP FUND INVESTOR, LLC, FOUR CORNERS TAVERN GROUP, INC., FOUR CORNERS TAVERN PARTNERS, LLC, FOUR CORNERS, a voluntary unincorporated association, ANDREW GLOOR, HARDTALES, INC. d/b/a BROWNSTONE TAVERN & GRILL (Lincoln and Irving Park), KEYSTONE HOLDINGS CORP., MATTHEW MENNA, RIVER NORTH TAP, INC. d/b/a SIDEBAR GRILLE, ROCCO'S LLC d/b/a RANALLI'S, SALOON HOLDINGS MANAGER, LLC, SALOON HOLDINGS, LLC d/b/a THE CROSSING TAVERN, SHEF AT OAK, INC. d/b/a KIRKWOOD BAR & GRILL f/k/a BROWNSTONE TAVERN & GRILL (Sheffield & Oakdale), TALBOTT ASSOCIATES, L.P. d/b/a 20 EAST, THE CHASE TAVERN, INC. d/b/a TRELLIS WINE BAR, WELLS HOLDINGS MANAGER, LLC, WELLS HOLDINGS, LLC a/b/a BENCHMARK BAR AND GRILL, WEST LOOP TAP, LLC d/b/a WESTEND BAR & GRILL f/k/a BROWNSTONE TAVERN & GRILL (Madison and Ada) by Daniel W. Tarpey (Tarpey, Daniel)
July 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Notice of Removal filed by FOUR CORNERS SHUTTLE, LLC, FOUR CORNERS CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC, ASCLOSE, INC. d/b/a SCHOOLYARD TAVERN & GRILL, 1500 N. WELLS OPCO, LLC d/b/a 80 Proof f/k/a STEAKBAR, FOUR CORNERS, a voluntary unincorporated association, SHEF AT OAK, INC. d/b/a KIRKWOOD BAR & GRILL f/k/a BROWNSTONE TAVERN & GRILL (Sheffield & Oakdale), 4C Kinzie Investor, LLC d/b/a Highline Bar & Lounge, RIVER NORTH TAP, INC. d/b/a SIDEBAR GRILLE, FOUR CORNERS TAVERN GROUP, INC., WEST LOOP TAP, LLC d/b/a WESTEND BAR & GRILL f/k/a BROWNSTONE TAVERN & GRILL (Madison and Ada), HARDTALES, INC. d/b/a BROWNSTONE TAVERN & GRILL (Lincoln and Irving Park), FOUR CORNERS TAVERN FUND I, LLC, FOUR CORNERS TAVERN GROUP FUND INVESTOR, LLC, WELLS HOLDINGS, LLC a/b/a BENCHMARK BAR AND GRILL, CLARK STREET RESTAURANT PARTNERS, LLC f/k/a 2450 N. CLARK, INC. d/b/a GASLIGHT, SALOON HOLDINGS MANAGER, LLC, 4C WRIGLEY, LLC d/b/a BRICKHOUSE TAVERN, FOUR CORNERS HOLDINGS, LLC, 1001 W. LAKE, LLC, KEYSTONE HOLDINGS CORP., THE CHASE TAVERN, INC. d/b/a TRELLIS WINE BAR, CHEVAL PORTER MANAGER, LLC, SALOON HOLDINGS, LLC d/b/a THE CROSSING TAVERN, FOUR CORNERS TAVERN PARTNERS, LLC, FOUR CORNERS TAVERN FUND MANAGEMENT, LLC, 1001 W. Lake Opco, LLC d/b/a Federales, MATTHEW MENNA, TALBOTT ASSOCIATES, L.P. d/b/a 20 EAST, 4C RIVERSIDE, LLC d/b/a PORTER KITCHEN & DECK, WELLS HOLDINGS MANAGER, LLC, 4C 1500 N. WELLS OPCO, LLC, 4C 1001 W. LAKE OPCO, LLC, 4C CHEVAL LLC, ANDREW GLOOR, ROCCO'S LLC d/b/a RANALLI'S, 4C 15 E. ILLINOIS OPERATIONS, LLC d/b/a FREMONT BAR; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14755017. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Notice of Filing Notice of Filing)(Tarpey, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luna v. 4C Kinzie Investor, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIK LUNA
Represented By: Sharon Harris
Represented By: Nickolas J. Hagman
Represented By: Matthew C. De Re
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Palya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie Callanta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Rottenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Strait
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noelle Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Mosher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Cahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOUR CORNERS TAVERN FUND I, LLC
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Represented By: Noah A Finkel
Represented By: David G. Wix
Represented By: Cheryl A Luce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOUR CORNERS CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Represented By: Noah A Finkel
Represented By: David G. Wix
Represented By: Cheryl A Luce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1001 W. Lake Opco, LLC d/b/a Federales
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOUR CORNERS SHUTTLE, LLC
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Represented By: Noah A Finkel
Represented By: David G. Wix
Represented By: Cheryl A Luce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4C RIVERSIDE, LLC d/b/a PORTER KITCHEN & DECK
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4C CHEVAL LLC
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Represented By: Noah A Finkel
Represented By: David G. Wix
Represented By: Cheryl A Luce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLS HOLDINGS MANAGER, LLC
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Represented By: Noah A Finkel
Represented By: David G. Wix
Represented By: Cheryl A Luce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHEF AT OAK, INC. d/b/a KIRKWOOD BAR & GRILL f/k/a BROWNSTONE TAVERN & GRILL (Sheffield & Oakdale)
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW GLOOR
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Represented By: Noah A Finkel
Represented By: David G. Wix
Represented By: Cheryl A Luce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SALOON HOLDINGS, LLC d/b/a THE CROSSING TAVERN
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW MENNA
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Represented By: Noah A Finkel
Represented By: David G. Wix
Represented By: Cheryl A Luce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4C WRIGLEY, LLC d/b/a BRICKHOUSE TAVERN
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOUR CORNERS, a voluntary unincorporated association
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLS HOLDINGS, LLC a/b/a BENCHMARK BAR AND GRILL
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLARK STREET RESTAURANT PARTNERS, LLC f/k/a 2450 N. CLARK, INC. d/b/a GASLIGHT
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4C 1500 N. WELLS OPCO, LLC
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Represented By: Noah A Finkel
Represented By: David G. Wix
Represented By: Cheryl A Luce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE CHASE TAVERN, INC. d/b/a TRELLIS WINE BAR
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOUR CORNERS TAVERN GROUP FUND INVESTOR, LLC
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Represented By: Noah A Finkel
Represented By: David G. Wix
Represented By: Cheryl A Luce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RIVER NORTH TAP, INC. d/b/a SIDEBAR GRILLE
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1001 W. LAKE, LLC
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Represented By: Noah A Finkel
Represented By: David G. Wix
Represented By: Cheryl A Luce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4C 1001 W. LAKE OPCO, LLC
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Represented By: Noah A Finkel
Represented By: David G. Wix
Represented By: Cheryl A Luce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1500 N. WELLS OPCO, LLC d/b/a 80 Proof f/k/a STEAKBAR
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARDTALES, INC. d/b/a BROWNSTONE TAVERN & GRILL (Lincoln and Irving Park)
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOUR CORNERS HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Represented By: Noah A Finkel
Represented By: David G. Wix
Represented By: Cheryl A Luce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEST LOOP TAP, LLC d/b/a WESTEND BAR & GRILL f/k/a BROWNSTONE TAVERN & GRILL (Madison and Ada)
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEYSTONE HOLDINGS CORP.
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Represented By: Noah A Finkel
Represented By: David G. Wix
Represented By: Cheryl A Luce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROCCO'S LLC d/b/a RANALLI'S
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TALBOTT ASSOCIATES, L.P. d/b/a 20 EAST
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOUR CORNERS TAVERN FUND MANAGEMENT, LLC
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Represented By: Noah A Finkel
Represented By: David G. Wix
Represented By: Cheryl A Luce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOUR CORNERS TAVERN PARTNERS, LLC
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Represented By: Noah A Finkel
Represented By: David G. Wix
Represented By: Cheryl A Luce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SALOON HOLDINGS MANAGER, LLC
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Represented By: Noah A Finkel
Represented By: David G. Wix
Represented By: Cheryl A Luce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASCLOSE, INC. d/b/a SCHOOLYARD TAVERN & GRILL
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHEVAL PORTER MANAGER, LLC
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Represented By: Noah A Finkel
Represented By: David G. Wix
Represented By: Cheryl A Luce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4C Kinzie Investor, LLC d/b/a Highline Bar & Lounge
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOUR CORNERS TAVERN GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Represented By: Noah A Finkel
Represented By: David G. Wix
Represented By: Cheryl A Luce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4C 15 E. ILLINOIS OPERATIONS, LLC d/b/a FREMONT BAR
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark Street Restaurant Partners, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Represented By: Noah A Finkel
Represented By: David G. Wix
Represented By: Cheryl A Luce
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asclose, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Represented By: Noah A Finkel
Represented By: David G. Wix
Represented By: Cheryl A Luce
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1001 W. Lake Opco, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Represented By: Noah A Finkel
Represented By: David G. Wix
Represented By: Cheryl A Luce
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chase Tavern, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Represented By: Noah A Finkel
Represented By: David G. Wix
Represented By: Cheryl A Luce
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Four Corners
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Represented By: Noah A Finkel
Represented By: David G. Wix
Represented By: Cheryl A Luce
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4C Wrigley, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Represented By: Noah A Finkel
Represented By: David G. Wix
Represented By: Cheryl A Luce
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4C 15 E. Illinois Operations, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Represented By: Noah A Finkel
Represented By: David G. Wix
Represented By: Cheryl A Luce
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Represented By: Noah A Finkel
Represented By: David G. Wix
Represented By: Cheryl A Luce
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rocco's, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Represented By: Noah A Finkel
Represented By: David G. Wix
Represented By: Cheryl A Luce
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Talbott Associates, LP
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Represented By: Noah A Finkel
Represented By: David G. Wix
Represented By: Cheryl A Luce
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hardtales, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Represented By: Noah A Finkel
Represented By: David G. Wix
Represented By: Cheryl A Luce
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Loop Tap, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Represented By: Noah A Finkel
Represented By: David G. Wix
Represented By: Cheryl A Luce
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4C Kinzie Investor, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Represented By: Noah A Finkel
Represented By: David G. Wix
Represented By: Cheryl A Luce
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1500 N. Wells Opco, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Represented By: Noah A Finkel
Represented By: David G. Wix
Represented By: Cheryl A Luce
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: River North Tap, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Represented By: Noah A Finkel
Represented By: David G. Wix
Represented By: Cheryl A Luce
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shef at Oak, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Represented By: Noah A Finkel
Represented By: David G. Wix
Represented By: Cheryl A Luce
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saloon Holdings, LLC.
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Represented By: Noah A Finkel
Represented By: David G. Wix
Represented By: Cheryl A Luce
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4C Riverside, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Showel
Represented By: Noah A Finkel
Represented By: David G. Wix
Represented By: Cheryl A Luce
Represented By: Daniel W. Tarpey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?