Fels v. McConnell et al

Plaintiff: Alexander A. Fels
Defendant: Donald Trump and Mitch McConnell
Case Number: 1:2018cv05284
Filed: August 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 9/11/2018. Fels's Motion for Reconsideration #11 is denied. See Order for further details. Mailed notice(lk, )
August 27, 2018 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Motion hearing set for 8/28/2018 is stricken. Mailed notice (lk, )
August 22, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by Alexander A. Fels for presentment of motion #11 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 8/28/2018 at 09:00 AM. (pk, )
August 22, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION by Plaintiff Alexander A. Fels (pk, )
August 15, 2018 ***Civil Case Terminated. (lk, )
August 8, 2018 Filing 10 ENTERED JUDGMENT. Mailed notice(lk, )
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 8/7/2018. The Court dismisses Fels's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Germane Subpoena(s) #1 and denies as moot his in forma pauperis application #3 . Civil case terminated. Mailed notice(lk, )
August 2, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (dlc, )
August 2, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (dlc, )
August 2, 2018 Filing 4 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Alexander A. Fels (dlc, )
August 2, 2018 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Alexander A. Fels for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (dlc, )
August 2, 2018 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (dlc, )
August 2, 2018 Filing 1 RECEIVED Motion and 2 copies by Alexander A. Fels (dlc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fels v. McConnell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Trump
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitch McConnell
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander A. Fels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?