Evans v. Nation Star Mortgage LLC

Plaintiff: Dan T Evans
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv05344
Filed: August 6, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
0 Judge: John Robert Blakey
1 Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2018 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case is hereby dismissed for want of prosecution based upon the parties' failure to file the status report required by the Court's prior order #12 . For questions concerning the dismissal of this case or the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project, the parties should immediately call Judge Blakey's chambers at (312) 435-6058. Mailed notice (gel, )
September 10, 2018 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been reassigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. During the course of the litigation, attorneys and pro se parties must appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney or party has a conflict with a set court date, he or she must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312) 818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. The litigants are ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Courts own standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Court's official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. An initial status conference is hereby set for 10/10/18 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Without exception, the parties must also file a status report no later than 10/1/18, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. If the defendants have not been served or are not yet at issue, Plaintiff must file an individual status report and explain why a joint report could not be filed. Failure to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute or failure to comply with this Court's order. Plaintiff's motion for attorney representation #4 is denied. Plaintiff paid the filing fee and has not sought leave to proceed in this case on an in forma pauperis basis. Thus, the Court has no basis to find Plaintiff indigent and no basis for recruiting counsel. Plaintiff's motion to summon unknown mortgage company #5 is denied as moot. The Clerk issued summons to Defendant on 8/6/18. To the extent Plaintiff is asking the Court to direct the Marshal to serve the summons, that request is denied for the same reason the motion for counsel is denied: Plaintiff has not asserted or demonstrated indigence. Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time #10 is granted. Motion hearing set for 9/11/2018, is stricken. Plaintiff may want to file an appearance form for ProSe Litigants, checking the box for email notification, which will ensure proper notice of all filed documents in this case. The form is located on the Court's website at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/home/PUBLIC/Forms/ProSeAppfill.pdf. Plaintiff should review the Court's standing order for pro se litigants, which is available on the Court's webpage at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Plaintiff may also wish to contact the District Court Pro Se Assistance Program, the Hibbler Help Desk, which may be reached at the Clerk's Office Intake desk, Dirksen Federal Building, 219 S. Dearborn, 20th floor, or by calling (312) 435-5691. Mailed notice (gel, )
September 6, 2018 11 NOTICE of Motion by Dan T Evans for presentment of MOTION for extension of time #10 before the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 9/11/2018 at 9:45 AM. (sxb, )
September 6, 2018 10 MOTION by Plaintiff Dan T Evans for extension of time (sxb, )
August 15, 2018 9 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable John Robert Blakey for all further proceedings. Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/15/18. (kp, )
August 7, 2018 8 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (kp, )
August 6, 2018 7 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant NationStar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Champion Mortgage Company; City of Elgin. (kp, )
August 6, 2018 5 MOTION by Plaintiff Dan T Evans to request the Court to summon unknown mortgage company. (kp, )
August 6, 2018 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Dan T Evans for attorney representation. (kp, )
August 6, 2018 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Dan T Evans. (kp, )
August 6, 2018 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (kp, )
August 6, 2018 1 COMPLAINT and no copies filed by Dan T Evans (Exhibits). (kp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Nation Star Mortgage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan T Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?