Umbrella Baby LLC v. ABCD Capital, LLC

Plaintiff: Umbrella Baby LLC
Defendant: ABCD Capital, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv05408
Filed: August 8, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Charles P Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 25, 2018 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status hearing held. Defendant is to answer by 10/31/2018. Status hearing is set for 11/1/2018 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (vcf, )
September 24, 2018 19 STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by Umbrella Baby LLC (Comack, Brian)
September 18, 2018 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motion hearing held. ABCD Capital LLC's Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim #13 is withdrawn. ABCD Capital LLC's notice of withdrawal of its motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim #17 is granted. Mailed notice (vcf, )
September 17, 2018 17 MOTION by Defendant ABCD Capital, LLC to withdraw Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #13 (Micheletti, Randy)
September 17, 2018 16 Exhibits A-D to AMENDED complaint by Umbrella Baby LLC against ABCD Capital, LLC (Comack, Brian)
September 17, 2018 15 AMENDED complaint by Umbrella Baby LLC against ABCD Capital, LLC (Comack, Brian)
September 11, 2018 14 MEMORANDUM by ABCD Capital, LLC in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #13 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Micheletti, Randy)
September 11, 2018 13 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant ABCD Capital, LLC (Micheletti, Randy)
September 11, 2018 12 NOTICE of Motion by Randy R Micheletti for presentment of before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 9/18/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Micheletti, Randy)
September 11, 2018 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant ABCD Capital, LLC by Randy R Micheletti (Micheletti, Randy)
August 30, 2018 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Umbrella Baby LLC as to ABCD Capital, LLC on 8/22/2018, answer due 9/12/2018. (Flaming, Todd)
August 21, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant ABCD Capital, LLC. (lw, )
August 20, 2018 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status hearing set for 9/25/2018 at 9:30 AM. At the initial hearing, parties to report on the following: 1. Possibility of settlement. 2. If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to prepare the case for resolution. Lead counsel for each party is required to attend the initial hearing. Failure to appear at any scheduled court hearing may result in the dismissal of claims for want of prosecution. Pursuant to Local Rule 5.3(a)(1), service of motions and notice of motions must be accomplished no later than 4:00 p.m. of the third business day preceding the date of presentment. This includes delivering a hard copy of the motion and notice of motion to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B no later than 4:00 p.m. the day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the matter from the Court's motion call. The Court requires hard copies of all documents be submitted to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B the same day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the document from the record. The Court directs counsel's attention to its Motion Schedule and Case Management Procedures located at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Plaintiff is directed to advise all other parties of the Court's action herein. Mailed notice (vcf, )
August 17, 2018 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motions to appear pro hac vice #5 and #6 are granted. Mailed notice (vcf, )
August 11, 2018 7 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Umbrella Baby LLC (RULE 7.1 AND LOCAL RULE 3.2 DISCLOSURE OF UMBRELLA BABY LLC) (Flaming, Todd)
August 10, 2018 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14810376. (Rotberg, Tuvia)
August 10, 2018 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14810162. (Comack, Brian)
August 9, 2018 4 MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (pk, )
August 8, 2018 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Umbrella Baby LLC by Todd H. Flaming (Flaming, Todd)
August 8, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. (dal, )
August 8, 2018 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Flaming, Todd)
August 8, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed by Umbrella Baby LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14798982. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Flaming, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Umbrella Baby LLC v. ABCD Capital, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Umbrella Baby LLC
Represented By: Todd H. Flaming
Represented By: Tuvia Rotberg
Represented By: Brian A Comack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABCD Capital, LLC
Represented By: Randy R Micheletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?