Haney et al v. Bridge to Life, LTD., a Wyoming Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Barbara Slack and Camille Haney
Defendant: Stevan Schweighardt and Bridge to Life, LTD., a Wyoming Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv05417
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Contract: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Hearing on plaintiffs' motion to consolidate or reassign #11 is stricken and no appearance on 9/27/18 is necessary. Motions seeking to consolidate and reassign cases must be brought in the lower numbered case and noticed for presentment before the judge assigned to that case. See Local Rule 40.4(c). Notices mailed. (psm, )
September 18, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by Colin Ryne Hagan for presentment of motion to consolidate cases #11 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 9/27/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Hagan, Colin)
September 18, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION by Plaintiffs Camille Haney, Barbara Slack to consolidate cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hagan, Colin)
September 10, 2018 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion for extension of time to answer #8 is granted. Defendants must respond to the complaint by 9/28/18. No appearance on the motion is necessary. The motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #6 is granted. A status hearing is set for 10/9/18 at 9:30 a.m. with an initial status report due three days prior. Notices mailed. (psm, )
September 7, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Robert Thomas Zielinski for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #8 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 9/13/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Zielinski, Robert)
September 7, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendants Bridge to Life, LTD., a Wyoming Corporation, Stevan Schweighardt for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Zielinski, Robert)
September 7, 2018 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Bridge to Life, LTD., a Wyoming Corporation, Stevan Schweighardt by Robert Thomas Zielinski (Zielinski, Robert)
August 21, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14849218. (Ruscheinski, Paul)
August 9, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (dlc, )
August 9, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. (jjr, )
August 9, 2018 Filing 4 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Ruscheinski, Paul)
August 9, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Camille Haney, Barbara Slack by Thomas M. Crawford (Crawford, Thomas)
August 9, 2018 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Camille Haney, Barbara Slack by Paul A. Ruscheinski (Ruscheinski, Paul)
August 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Camille Haney, Barbara Slack; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14804064. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Ruscheinski, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haney et al v. Bridge to Life, LTD., a Wyoming Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Slack
Represented By: Thomas M. Crawford
Represented By: Paul A. Ruscheinski
Represented By: Colin Ryne Hagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camille Haney
Represented By: Thomas M. Crawford
Represented By: Paul A. Ruscheinski
Represented By: Colin Ryne Hagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stevan Schweighardt
Represented By: Robert Thomas Zielinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridge to Life, LTD., a Wyoming Corporation
Represented By: Robert Thomas Zielinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?