Kuraszek v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation

Plaintiff: Scott Kuraszek
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation Amtrak
Case Number: 1:2018cv05439
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Charles P Kocoras
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Filing 16 First AMENDED complaint by Scott Kuraszek against National Railroad Passenger Corporation Amtrak (McMahon, William)
September 20, 2018 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motion hearing held. Defendant's motion to dismiss count II of plaintiff's complaint for failure to state a claim is #11 is granted. Motion for leave to file an amended complaint is granted. Status hearing set for 10/9/2018 is stricken and reset to 11/1/2018 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (vcf, )
September 10, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation Amtrak for disclosure Corporate Disclosure Statement and Notification of Affiliates (Cooke, Kristen)
September 10, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by National Railroad Passenger Corporation Amtrak(Cooke, Kristen)
September 10, 2018 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM by National Railroad Passenger Corporation Amtrak in support of motion to dismiss #11 (Cooke, Kristen)
September 10, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation Amtrak to dismiss Count II of Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim (Cooke, Kristen)
September 10, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Kristen Anne Cooke for presentment of before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 9/20/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Cooke, Kristen)
September 10, 2018 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation Amtrak by Kristen Anne Cooke (Cooke, Kristen)
September 10, 2018 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation Amtrak by Kristen Anne Cooke Appearance of A. Jay Koehler (Cooke, Kristen)
September 10, 2018 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Scott Kuraszek regarding Summons/Complaint served on National Railroad Passenger Corporation, d/b/a AMTRAK on 8/20/18 (McMahon, William)
August 31, 2018 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status hearing set for 10/9/2018 at 9:30 AM. At the initial hearing, parties to report on the following: 1. Possibility of settlement. 2. If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to prepare the case for resolution. Lead counsel for each party is required to attend the initial hearing. Failure to appear at any scheduled court hearing may result in the dismissal of claims for want of prosecution. Pursuant to Local Rule 5.3(a)(1), service of motions and notice of motions must be accomplished no later than 4:00 p.m. of the third business day preceding the date of presentment. This includes delivering a hard copy of the motion and notice of motion to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B no later than 4:00 p.m. the day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the matter from the Court's motion call. The Court requires hard copies of all documents be submitted to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B the same day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the document from the record. The Court directs counsel's attention to its Motion Schedule and Case Management Procedures located at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Plaintiff is directed to advise all other parties of the Court's action herein. Mailed notice (vcf, )
August 17, 2018 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #4 is granted. Mailed notice (vcf, )
August 10, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14809212. (McMahon, William)
August 10, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation Amtrak (jjr, )
August 10, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. (jn, )
August 10, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Scott Kuraszek by William John McMahon (McMahon, William)
August 10, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (McMahon, William)
August 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Scott Kuraszek; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14807891.(McMahon, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kuraszek v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Kuraszek
Represented By: Charles C Goetsch
Represented By: William John McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation Amtrak
Represented By: Kristen Anne Cooke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?