Raglin v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. et al
Plaintiff: Dean Raglin
Defendant: Will County Sheriffs Office, Brenda A. LiKavec, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. and Mitchell Shanks
Case Number: 1:2018cv05493
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Will
Presiding Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Correction regarding #11 . (eaa, )
September 10, 2018 Filing 11 ENTERED in Error. (eaa, ) Modified on 9/11/2018 (eaa, ).
September 6, 2018 Filing 9 AMENDED complaint by Dean Raglin against Brenda A. LiKavec, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC., Mitchell Shanks, Will County Sheriffs Office. (Exhibits).(gcy, ) Text Modified on 9/7/2018 (gcy, ).
August 20, 2018 ***Civil Case Terminated. (nsf, )
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the Statement below, the Court grants the plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 . The plaintiff may proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. The Court, however, dismisses the complaint on initial review pursuant to 28 U.S.C.1915A for lack of jurisdiction. Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 8/20/2018. Mailed notice (nsf, )
August 14, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (jk, )
August 13, 2018 Filing 5 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Dean Raglin. (jk, )
August 13, 2018 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Dean Raglin for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (jk, )
August 13, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (jk, )
August 13, 2018 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and 4 copies by Dean Raglin (Exhibits). (jk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raglin v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Will County Sheriffs Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda A. LiKavec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell Shanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Raglin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?