Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. Bansley & Kiener, L.L.P.
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Petitioner: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Washington Federal Bank for Savings
Respondent: Bansley & Kiener, L.L.P.
Case Number: 1:2018cv05501
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2018 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM by Bansley & Kiener, L.L.P. in Opposition of Petition to Enforce Administrative Subpoena (Falkenberg, Thomas)
September 26, 2018 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motion hearing held. Petition to enforce administrative subpoena #1 is taken under advisement; response is due 10/15/2018; reply is due 11/5/2018. Motion to intervene #11 is taken under advisement; reply is due 10/10/2018; the Court will issue a ruling by mail on both motions. The Court strikes the status report deadline and the status hearing set for 10/23/2018. Mailed notice (cdh, ) Modified on 9/28/2018 (cdh, ).
September 25, 2018 Filing 14 RESPONSE by Bansley & Kiener, L.L.P. in Opposition to MOTION to intervene #11 (Falkenberg, Thomas)
September 24, 2018 Filing 13 RESPONSE by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporationin Opposition to MOTION to intervene #11 (Heftman, Lawrence)
September 17, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion for presentment of to intervene pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 24(b) #11 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 9/26/2018 at 09:15 AM. (bg, )
September 17, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to intervene pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 24(b) by Robert M Kowalski (bg, )
August 17, 2018 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial status hearing is set for 10/25/2018 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the courts action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least two days prior to the initial status. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (cdh, )
August 15, 2018 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Bansley & Kiener, L.L.P.. (Falkenberg, Thomas)
August 15, 2018 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Respondent Bansley & Kiener, L.L.P. by Thomas F. Falkenberg (Falkenberg, Thomas)
August 14, 2018 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: John Stuart Tonkinson's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of FDIC as Receiver for Washington Federal Bank for Savings #4 is granted. Mailed notice (cdh, )
August 13, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. (jjr, )
August 13, 2018 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Petitioner Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Washington Federal Bank for Savings by Lawrence Harris Heftman (Heftman, Lawrence)
August 13, 2018 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support of Petition to Enforce Subpoena (Tonkinson, Stuart)
August 13, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Petitioner Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Washington Federal Bank for Savings by Stuart Tonkinson for Leave to Appear (Tonkinson, Stuart) (Docket text modified by Clerk's Office)
August 13, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Petitioner Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Washington Federal Bank for Savings by Stuart Tonkinson (Tonkinson, Stuart)
August 13, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Tonkinson, Stuart)
August 13, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION to enforce administrative subpoena by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Washington Federal Bank for Savings Petition to Enforce Administrative Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Steven B. Hall, #2 Declaration Declaration of Stuart Tonkinson)(Tonkinson, Stuart) Modified on 8/14/2018 (bg, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. Bansley & Kiener, L.L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver for Washington Federal Bank for Savings
Represented By: Stuart Tonkinson
Represented By: Lawrence Harris Heftman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bansley & Kiener, L.L.P.
Represented By: Thomas F. Falkenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Stuart Tonkinson
Represented By: Lawrence Harris Heftman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?