U.S. Bank National Association et al v. Lawson
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, New Residential Investment Corporation, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. (MERS) and New Residential Mortgage, LLC
Defendant: Breanna Lawson
Case Number: 1:2018cv05584
Filed: August 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Charles R Norgle
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2018 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion to remand #6 is granted. The case is remanded to the Circuit Court of Cook County. Motion hearing held on 9/14/2018. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (ewf, )
September 7, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Robert Brunner for presentment of motion to remand #6 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 9/14/2018 at 10:30 AM. (Brunner, Robert)
September 7, 2018 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM by U.S. Bank National Association in support of motion to remand #6 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Brunner, Robert)
September 7, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association to remand (Brunner, Robert)
September 7, 2018 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association by Jena M. Valdetero (Valdetero, Jena)
September 7, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association by Robert Brunner (Brunner, Robert)
August 14, 2018 Filing 3 PETITIONER'S NOTICE of Petitioner's Right to Court Access Without Filing Fees. ("EXHIBITS"). (ks, )
August 14, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (ks, )
August 14, 2018 Filing 1 RECEIVED NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court Cook County, case number (2018 M1706892) filed by Breanna Lawson. (ks, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/21/2018) (ks, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association et al v. Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Jena M. Valdetero
Represented By: Robert Brunner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Residential Investment Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. (MERS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Residential Mortgage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Breanna Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?