Comerica Bank v. Key Used Cars, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Comerica Bank
Defendant: Key Used Cars, Ltd. and Thomas J. Dufore, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2018cv05589
Filed: August 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Office: Chicago Office
County: Cook
Presiding Judge: Harry D Leinenweber
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2018 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Status hearing held and continued to 11/15/18 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice(maf)
October 2, 2018 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Comerica Bank by Justin Kyle Malenius (Malenius, Justin)
September 10, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Comerica Bank as to Thomas J. Dufore, Jr. on 9/1/2018, answer due 9/24/2018. (Carlson, Kurt)
September 10, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Comerica Bank as to Key Used Cars, Ltd. on 9/8/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. (Carlson, Kurt)
August 21, 2018 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Status hearing set for 10/3/18 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice(maf)
August 16, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Thomas J. Dufore, Jr., Key Used Cars, Ltd. (dal, )
August 16, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. (ec, )
August 15, 2018 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Comerica Bank by Steven D. Mroczkowski (Mroczkowski, Steven)
August 15, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Kurt M. Carlson as to Military Service (Carlson, Kurt)
August 15, 2018 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Comerica Bank (Carlson, Kurt)
August 15, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Comerica Bank by Kurt M. Carlson (Carlson, Kurt)
August 15, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Carlson, Kurt)
August 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint for Foreclosure, Replevin, and Other Relief filed by Comerica Bank; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14830315. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A through F)(Carlson, Kurt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Comerica Bank v. Key Used Cars, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Key Used Cars, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J. Dufore, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Comerica Bank
Represented By: Steven D. Mroczkowski
Represented By: Kurt M. Carlson
Represented By: Justin Kyle Malenius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?