City of Harvey et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: VILLAGE OF POSEN, VILLAGE OF ORLAND PARK, CITY OF PEORIA, CITY OF HARVEY, VILLAGE OF DOLTON, ORLAND FIRE PROTECTION DISTRICT, VILLAGE OF HOFFMAN ESTATES, VILLAGE OF MERRIONETTE PARK, VILLAGE OF RIVER GROVE, VILLAGE OF MAYWOOD, VILLAGE OF NORTH RIVERSIDE, VILLAGE OF STONE PARK, VILLAGE OF CHICAGO RIDGE and VILLAGE OF BROADVIEW
Defendant: MCKESSON CORPORATION, ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC., PURDUE PHARMA L.P., MALLINCKRODT LLC, MALLINCKRODT PLC, JOSEPH GIACCHINO, PURDUE PHARMA, INC., INSYS THERAPEUTICS, INC., ACTAVIS PLC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., ALLERGAN PLC, TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC, ACTAVIS LLC, CARDINAL HEALTH, INC., WILLIAM MCMAHON, ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC., PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC., WATSON LABORATORIES, INC., RHODES PHARMACEUTICALS, CEPHALON, INC., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., AMERISOURCEBERGEN CORPORATION, PAUL MADISON, WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., NORAMCO, INC., ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA, INC., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.,, Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Jassen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Allergan plc f/k/a Actavis plc
Case Number: 1:2018cv05756
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2018 Filing 46 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Defendants' motions for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #43 are granted. Defendants' responsive pleadings are due the later of 21 days after a ruling on the motion to remand or transfer to MDL court. The Court strikes the status date set for 9/20/18 and resets it to 12/13/18 at 1:30 p.m. to report on transfer to MDL court. The Court enters and continues the motion to remand #28 and motion for leave to file excess pages #31 to 12/13/18 at 1:30 p.m. Mailed notice (mw, )
September 19, 2018 Filing 45 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Insys Therapeutics, Inc. (Fuga, Anthony)
September 19, 2018 Filing 44 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Insys Therapeutics, Inc. by Anthony James Fuga (Fuga, Anthony)
September 18, 2018 Filing 43 MOTION by Defendants Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Allergan plc f/k/a Actavis plc for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead (unopposed) (Knapp, Timothy)
September 18, 2018 Filing 42 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND LOCAL RULE 3.2 NOTIFICATION OF AFFILIATES STATEMENT by Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Knapp, Timothy)
September 18, 2018 Filing 41 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND LOCAL RULE 3.2 NOTIFICATION OF AFFILIATES STATEMENT by Allergan plc f/k/a Actavis plc (Knapp, Timothy)
September 18, 2018 Filing 40 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Allergan plc f/k/a Actavis plc, Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Timothy William Knapp (Knapp, Timothy)
September 18, 2018 Filing 39 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc. by Anita Maria Kidd (Kidd, Anita)
September 13, 2018 Filing 38 STATUS Report (Joint Initial Status Report) by City Of Harvey, City of Peoria, Orland Fire Protection District, Village Of Chicago Ridge, Village Of Hoffman Estates, Village Of Maywood, Village Of River Grove, Village of Broadview, Village of Dolton, Village of Merrionette Park, Village of North Riverside, Village of Orland Park, Village of Posen, Village of Stone Park (Richman, Benjamin)
September 13, 2018 Filing 37 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.,, Watson Laboratories, Inc. by Megan Rose Braden (Braden, Megan)
September 13, 2018 Filing 36 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.,, Watson Laboratories, Inc. by Tinos Diamantatos (Diamantatos, Tinos)
September 13, 2018 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14942756. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Addendum)(Napolitano, Steven)
September 13, 2018 Filing 34 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Rhodes Pharmaceuticals by Heidi Ann Kuffel (Kuffel, Heidi)
September 13, 2018 Filing 33 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Rhodes Pharmaceuticals by Michael J. Rosen (Rosen, Michael)
September 12, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE of Motion by Jay Edelson for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages, #31 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 9/20/2018 at 01:45 PM. (Edelson, Jay)
September 12, 2018 Filing 31 MOTION by Plaintiffs City Of Harvey, City of Peoria, Orland Fire Protection District, Village Of Chicago Ridge, Village Of Hoffman Estates, Village Of Maywood, Village Of River Grove, Village of Broadview, Village of Dolton, Village of Merrionette Park, Village of North Riverside, Village of Orland Park, Village of Posen, Village of Stone Park for leave to file excess pages in Memo of Law in Support of Motion to Remand, Instanter (Edelson, Jay)
September 12, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE of Motion by Jay Edelson for presentment of motion to remand, #28 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 9/20/2018 at 01:45 PM. (Edelson, Jay)
September 12, 2018 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM by City Of Harvey, City of Peoria, Orland Fire Protection District, Village Of Chicago Ridge, Village Of Hoffman Estates, Village Of Maywood, Village Of River Grove, Village of Broadview, Village of Dolton, Village of Merrionette Park, Village of North Riverside, Village of Orland Park, Village of Posen, Village of Stone Park in support of motion to remand, #28 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavits of Service, #2 Declaration Decl. of Benjamin H. Richman)(Edelson, Jay)
September 12, 2018 Filing 28 MOTION by Plaintiffs City Of Harvey, City of Peoria, Orland Fire Protection District, Village Of Chicago Ridge, Village Of Hoffman Estates, Village Of Maywood, Village Of River Grove, Village of Broadview, Village of Dolton, Village of Merrionette Park, Village of North Riverside, Village of Orland Park, Village of Posen, Village of Stone Park to remand to the Circuit Court of Cook County (Edelson, Jay)
September 10, 2018 Filing 27 Distributor Defendants' Joint Motion To Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation NOTICE of Motion by Alexander S. Vesselinovitch for presentment of motion to stay, #26 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 9/20/2018 at 01:45 PM. (Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
September 10, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION by Defendants Amerisourcebergen Corporation, McKesson Corporation to stay (Distributor Defendants Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
September 10, 2018 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Initial status hearing reset to 9/20/18 at 1:30 p.m. (Time Change Only) Mailed notice (mw, )
September 5, 2018 Filing 24 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Amerisourcebergen Corporation by Margaret Marcia Schuchardt (Schuchardt, Margaret)
September 5, 2018 Filing 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Amerisourcebergen Corporation by Daniel I. Schlessinger (Schlessinger, Daniel)
September 4, 2018 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Defendants' motions for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #13 , #16 are granted. Defendants' responsive pleadings are due the later of 21 days after a ruling on the motion to remand or transfer to MDL court. Mailed notice (mw, )
September 4, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Motion by Sara Roitman for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #16 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 9/5/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Roitman, Sara)
September 4, 2018 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs City Of Harvey, City of Peoria, Orland Fire Protection District, Village Of Chicago Ridge, Village Of Hoffman Estates, Village Of Maywood, Village Of River Grove, Village of Broadview, Village of Dolton, Village of Merrionette Park, Village of North Riverside, Village of Orland Park, Village of Posen, Village of Stone Park by Benjamin Harris Richman (Richman, Benjamin)
August 30, 2018 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Paul Madison by Phillip John Oliver (Oliver, Phillip)
August 30, 2018 Filing 18 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Cardinal Health, Inc. (Meyer, Julie)
August 29, 2018 Filing 17 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc. (Roitman, Sara)
August 29, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION by Defendants Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc. for extension of time to file answer (Roitman, Sara)
August 29, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion by Sara Roitman for presentment of extension of time #13 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 9/5/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Roitman, Sara)
August 28, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion by Alexander S. Vesselinovitch for presentment of extension of time #13 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 9/4/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
August 28, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION by Defendants Amerisourcebergen Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation for extension of time to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint (Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
August 24, 2018 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant McKesson Corporation by Matthew H Bunn (Bunn, Matthew)
August 24, 2018 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 9/20/18 at 9:30 a.m. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 9/13/18. Mailed notice (mw, )
August 23, 2018 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc. by Julie Fix Meyer (Meyer, Julie)
August 23, 2018 Filing 9 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Jassen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Knutson, Sherry)
August 23, 2018 Filing 8 Supplemental Notice of Removal by Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Jassen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Supplemental Notice of Removal - Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Supplemental Notice of Removal - Process and Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Supplemental Notice of Removal - Case Docket)(Knutson, Sherry)
August 23, 2018 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Jassen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Sherry Ann Knutson of Tucker Ellis LLP (Knutson, Sherry)
August 23, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (tt, )
August 23, 2018 Filing 5 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (tt, )
August 23, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. (daj, )
August 22, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant MCKESSON CORPORATION by Matthew Thomas Connelly (Connelly, Matthew)
August 22, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant MCKESSON CORPORATION by Alexander S. Vesselinovitch (Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
August 22, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Supplement Civil Cover Sheet Attachment)(Vesselinovitch, Alexander)
August 22, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2018-CH-09020) filed by MCKESSON CORPORATION Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14859907. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Vesselinovitch, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Harvey et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCKESSON CORPORATION
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Connelly
Represented By: Alexander S. Vesselinovitch
Represented By: Matthew H Bunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON, INC.
Represented By: Sherry Ann Knutson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PURDUE PHARMA L.P.
Represented By: Roitman Sara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MALLINCKRODT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MALLINCKRODT PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH GIACCHINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PURDUE PHARMA, INC.
Represented By: Roitman Sara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INSYS THERAPEUTICS, INC.
Represented By: Anthony James Fuga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLERGAN PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS LLC
Represented By: Tinos Diamantatos
Represented By: Megan Rose Braden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARDINAL HEALTH, INC.
Represented By: Anita Maria Kidd
Represented By: Julie Fix Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM MCMAHON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTAVIS PHARMA, INC.
Represented By: Tinos Diamantatos
Represented By: Megan Rose Braden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: Roitman Sara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WATSON LABORATORIES, INC.
Represented By: Tinos Diamantatos
Represented By: Megan Rose Braden
Represented By: Benjamin Harris Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHODES PHARMACEUTICALS
Represented By: Heidi Ann Kuffel
Represented By: Steven Napolitano
Represented By: Michael J. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CEPHALON, INC.
Represented By: Tinos Diamantatos
Represented By: Megan Rose Braden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERISOURCEBERGEN CORPORATION
Represented By: Margaret Marcia Schuchardt
Represented By: Daniel I. Schlessinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAUL MADISON
Represented By: Phillip John Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WATSON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: Benjamin Harris Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORAMCO, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: Sherry Ann Knutson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA, INC.
Represented By: Sherry Ann Knutson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.,
Represented By: Tinos Diamantatos
Represented By: Megan Rose Braden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy William Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jassen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Sherry Ann Knutson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan plc f/k/a Actavis plc
Represented By: Timothy William Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VILLAGE OF POSEN
Represented By: Benjamin Harris Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VILLAGE OF ORLAND PARK
Represented By: Benjamin Harris Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CITY OF PEORIA
Represented By: Benjamin Harris Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CITY OF HARVEY
Represented By: Benjamin Harris Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VILLAGE OF DOLTON
Represented By: Benjamin Harris Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ORLAND FIRE PROTECTION DISTRICT
Represented By: Benjamin Harris Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VILLAGE OF HOFFMAN ESTATES
Represented By: Benjamin Harris Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VILLAGE OF MERRIONETTE PARK
Represented By: Benjamin Harris Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VILLAGE OF RIVER GROVE
Represented By: Benjamin Harris Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VILLAGE OF MAYWOOD
Represented By: Benjamin Harris Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VILLAGE OF NORTH RIVERSIDE
Represented By: Benjamin Harris Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VILLAGE OF STONE PARK
Represented By: Benjamin Harris Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VILLAGE OF CHICAGO RIDGE
Represented By: Benjamin Harris Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VILLAGE OF BROADVIEW
Represented By: Benjamin Harris Richman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?