Slabon v. Dart et al
Plaintiff: Andrew Slabon
Defendant: John Doe 1-6, Booker, Swanigan, Officer Yan, Unknown Employees, Officer Ludwig, Tom Dart and Officer Jones
Case Number: 1:2018cv05914
Filed: August 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Marvin E Aspen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2018 Filing 7 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Andrew Slabon for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Slabon, Andrew)
October 11, 2018 Filing 6 MAIL RETURNED, for document #5 sent to Andrew Slabon returned as undeliverable, return to sender. New address found, re-mailed to 2644 N. Mason Avenue, Chicago, IL 60639. (kb, )
September 24, 2018 MAILED copy of order dated 9/24/18 and a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis to Plaintiff. (lf, )
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is denied without prejudice. By October 24, 2018, Plaintiff is directed to either (1) submit a renewed, properly completed application that is certified by a trust fund officer and that includes a copy of Plaintiff's trust fund statements showing activity in his accounts for the six-month period preceding his response to this Order; or (2) pay the full statutory filing fee of $400.00. Failure to comply with this Order by that date will result in summary dismissal of this case. Plaintiff also must promptly submit a change-of-address notification if he is transferred to another facility or released. If Plaintiff fails to keep the Court informed of his address, this action will be subject to dismissal for failure to comply with a Court order and for failure to prosecute. Screening of Plaintiff's complaint is deferred pending resolution of his fee status. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis and a copy of this Order. Plaintiff's motion for attorney representation #4 is denied without prejudice to later renewal. Signed by the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 9/24/2018. Mailed notice (lf, )
August 28, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Andrew Slabon for attorney representation. (kp, )
August 28, 2018 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Andrew Slabon for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Exhibits). (kp, )
August 28, 2018 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (kp, )
August 28, 2018 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Andrew Slabon. (Attachments: #1 (Envelope not postmarked) (kp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slabon v. Dart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Slabon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Booker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swanigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Yan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Employees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Ludwig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Dart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?