Senegal et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.
Plaintiff: Erika Williams, Amanda Jason, Kellie Farrish, Jerome Senegal, Irvin Nash and Brent Griffin
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.
Case Number: 1:2018cv06006
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2018 Filing 19 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Kellie Farrish, Brent Griffin, Amanda Jason, Irvin Nash, Jerome Senegal, Erika Williams CONFIDENTIAL EXHIBIT A TO THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND RELEASE (Friedman, Linda)
September 12, 2018 Filing 18 PRELIMINARY APPROVAL ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 9/12/2018. Notices mailed. (psm, )
September 12, 2018 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion to seal #7 and the motion for preliminary approval #6 are granted. The parties engaged in pre-suit investigation and mediation, at arm's length, and used a mediator. The proposed non-monetary and monetary relief are within the range of reasonableness for preliminary approval, because they provide tangible prospective and compensatory remedies commensurate with the claims and litigation risk in the case. The notice and claim procedures are reasonable and the proposed neutral administrator is qualified and appropriate. For settlement purposes, the Rule 23 requirements are met and the class certified. A final approval hearing is set for December 18, 2018, at 10:30 a.m. The motion for final approval and fee petition are due December 11, 2018. Enter preliminary approval order. No appearance on September 13, 2018 is necessary. Notices mailed. (psm, )
September 12, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14937736. (Turnbull, Kenneth)
September 11, 2018 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. by Scott Robert Koch (Koch, Scott)
September 10, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14929654. (Killeen, Brendan)
September 7, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14922230. (Toal, Daniel)
September 7, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14922174. (Karp, Brad)
September 7, 2018 Filing 11 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. (Alamuddin, Sari)
September 5, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PROVISIONAL CLASS CERTIFICATION, PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, AND APPROVAL AND DISTRIBUTION OF NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT; and JOINT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL NOTICE of Motion by Suzanne E. Bish for presentment of motion to certify class,, #6 , motion for leave to file #7 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 9/13/2018 at 09:45 AM. (Bish, Suzanne)
September 5, 2018 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. by Sari M. Alamuddin (Alamuddin, Sari)
September 4, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (sxb, )
August 31, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiffs Kellie Farrish, Brent Griffin, Amanda Jason, Irvin Nash, Jerome Senegal, Erika Williams for leave to file JOINT Motion For Leave To File Exhibit A to Settlement Agreement Under Seal (Friedman, Linda)
August 31, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiffs Kellie Farrish, Brent Griffin, Amanda Jason, Irvin Nash, Jerome Senegal, Erika Williams to certify class for Preliminarily Approve Class Settlement and Approve and Distribute Notice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 Class Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit Ex. A to Ex. 1, Confidential Ex A to Stlmt Agmt, #3 Exhibit Ex. B Notice to Class Members, #4 Exhibit Ex. C Notice to Potential Class Members, #5 Exhibit Ex. D Proposed Preliminary Approval Order, #6 Exhibit Ex. E General Release for Class Representatives, #7 Exhibit Ex. F Proposed Order Appointing Master)(Friedman, Linda)
August 31, 2018 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Kellie Farrish, Brent Griffin, Amanda Jason, Irvin Nash, Jerome Senegal, Erika Williams by George S. Robot (Robot, George)
August 31, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Kellie Farrish, Brent Griffin, Amanda Jason, Irvin Nash, Jerome Senegal, Erika Williams by Suzanne E. Bish (Bish, Suzanne)
August 31, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. (daj, )
August 31, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Kellie Farrish, Brent Griffin, Amanda Jason, Irvin Nash, Jerome Senegal, Erika Williams by Linda Debra Friedman (Friedman, Linda)
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Friedman, Linda)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action filed by Kellie Farrish, Jerome Senegal, Irvin Nash, Brent Griffin, Erika Williams, Amanda Jason; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14900538.(Friedman, Linda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Senegal et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erika Williams
Represented By: George S. Robot
Represented By: Linda Debra Friedman
Represented By: Suzanne E. Bish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Jason
Represented By: George S. Robot
Represented By: Linda Debra Friedman
Represented By: Suzanne E. Bish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kellie Farrish
Represented By: George S. Robot
Represented By: Linda Debra Friedman
Represented By: Suzanne E. Bish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Senegal
Represented By: George S. Robot
Represented By: Linda Debra Friedman
Represented By: Suzanne E. Bish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irvin Nash
Represented By: George S. Robot
Represented By: Linda Debra Friedman
Represented By: Suzanne E. Bish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Griffin
Represented By: George S. Robot
Represented By: Linda Debra Friedman
Represented By: Suzanne E. Bish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.
Represented By: Kenneth J Turnbull
Represented By: Brendan Killeen
Represented By: Daniel J. Toal
Represented By: Brad S Karp
Represented By: Scott Robert Koch
Represented By: Sari M. Alamuddin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?