City of Chicago v. Peake

Appellee: George Peake
Appellant: City of Chicago, an Illinois Municipal Corporation and City Of Chicago
Case Number: 1:2018cv06089
Filed: September 6, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 5, 2018 8 TRANSCRIPT OF BANKRUPTCY PROCEEDINGS held on 6/27/2018, 6/27/2018, 7/11/2018 regarding Notice of Appeal #1 . (To view an image of this document please visit the Bankruptcy Court docket.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Transmittal Letter)(USBC-Green, )
October 5, 2018 7 SUPPLEMENT to bankruptcy appeal #1 Appellant Designation of Record (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(USBC-Green, )
October 4, 2018 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motion hearing held. City of Chicago's motion to stay proceedings #4 is granted. Counsel is directed to keep the Court apprised of the Seventh Circuit's schedule for oral argument. Mailed notice (cdh, )
September 28, 2018 5 NOTICE of Motion by David Paul Holtkamp for presentment of motion to stay #4 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 10/4/2018 at 09:15 AM. (Holtkamp, David)
September 28, 2018 4 MOTION by Appellant City Of Chicago to stay proceedings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Holtkamp, David)
September 25, 2018 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial status hearing is set for 11/8/2018 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the courts action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least two days prior to the initial status. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (cdh, )
September 12, 2018 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellant City Of Chicago by David Paul Holtkamp (Holtkamp, David)
September 7, 2018 MAILED Rule 83.16 and Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3) letters with an attorney appearance form to all counsel of record. (nsf, )
September 6, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. (acm)
September 6, 2018 1 APPEAL from U.S. Bankruptcy Court case number 18 B 16544 (Judge Thorne) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Transmittal Letter, #3 BK Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit)(USBC-Gonzalez, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Chicago v. Peake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: George Peake
Represented By: John Peter Wonais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: City of Chicago, an Illinois Municipal Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: City Of Chicago
Represented By: David Paul Holtkamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?