Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. DOE subscriber assigned IP address 207.181.210.20
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 207.181.210.20
Case Number: 1:2018cv06094
Filed: September 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2018 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Plaintiff's Motion for leave to file a third party subpoena prior to a Rule 26(F) Conference #8 is granted. Motion hearing set for 10/2/2018 is stricken. Mailed notice (lk, )
September 18, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC re memorandum in support of motion #10 NOTICE OF FILING (Smith, Marc)
September 18, 2018 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE A THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(F) CONFERENCE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Smith, Marc)
September 18, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Marc Craig Smith for presentment of motion for leave to file #8 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 10/2/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Smith, Marc)
September 18, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC for leave to file MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE A THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(F) CONFERENCE (Smith, Marc)
September 14, 2018 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial status hearing set for 12/4/2018 at 9:00 a.m. Joint Status Report due by 11/28/2018. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing.Mailed notice (lk, )
September 7, 2018 Filing 6 MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (sxb, )
September 7, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (sxb, )
September 6, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. (acm)
September 6, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC re attorney appearance #3 , civil cover sheet #2 , complaint #1 NOTICE OF FILING FRCP 7.1 AND LR 3.2 DISCLOSURE (Smith, Marc)
September 6, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC by Marc Craig Smith ATTORNEY APPEARANCE (Smith, Marc)
September 6, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Smith, Marc)
September 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT COMPLAINT-ACTION FOR DAMAGES FOR PROPERTY RIGHTS INFRINGEMENT filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC; JURY DEMAND. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14915354. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Smith, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. DOE subscriber assigned IP address 207.181.210.20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Marc Craig Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 207.181.210.20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?