Capital One Equipment Finance Corp. f/k/a All Points Capital Corp, d/ba/ Capital One Taxi Medallion Finance v. Chinesco Transport, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Capital One Equipment Finance Corp. f/k/a All Points Capital Corp, d/ba/ Capital One Taxi Medallion Finance
Defendant: Ernest Madu and Chinesco Transport, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv06113
Filed: September 6, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
0 Judge: Sidney I Schenkier
1 Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: Contract: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 30, 2018 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: Status hearing held. The parties report on the status of discovery. Mandatory initial disclosures, absent ESI, are due by 11/27/18. This matter is set for a status hearing before the magistrate judge on 12/11/18 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (dal, )
October 24, 2018 19 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by Capital One Equipment Finance Corp. f/k/a All Points Capital Corp, d/ba/ Capital One Taxi Medallion Finance as to Chinesco Transport, Inc.. (Lesko, Christina)
October 24, 2018 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: The Court, sua sponte, sets the matter for a status hearing before the magistrate judge on 10/30/18 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (jj, )
October 23, 2018 17 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: discovery scheduling and supervision and any settlement conference. (air, )Mailed notice.
October 23, 2018 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Status hearing held. Defendants did not appear. This case is under the MIDP pilot program. Once the parties have complied with MIDP, formal discovery may be served. Case is referred to Magistrate Judge Schenkier for further discovery scheduling and supervision and any settlement conference the parties may wish to conduct. Mailed notice (air, )
October 22, 2018 15 DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to Complaint by Chinesco Transport, Inc., Ernest Madu(Oparanozie, George)
October 16, 2018 14 STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by Capital One Equipment Finance Corp. f/k/a All Points Capital Corp, d/ba/ Capital One Taxi Medallion Finance (Lesko, Christina)
October 5, 2018 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #11 is granted. Defendants must answer or otherwise plead by 10/22/2018. No appearance on the motion is required. Mailed notice (air, )
October 4, 2018 12 NOTICE of Motion by George Umunna Oparanozie for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #11 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 10/11/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Oparanozie, George)
October 4, 2018 11 MOTION by Defendants Chinesco Transport, Inc., Ernest Madu for extension of time to file answer (Oparanozie, George)
October 1, 2018 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant Chinesco Transport, Inc.. (jn, )
October 1, 2018 10 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by Capital One Equipment Finance Corp. f/k/a All Points Capital Corp, d/ba/ Capital One Taxi Medallion Finance as to Chinesco Transport, Inc.. (Lesko, Christina)
September 25, 2018 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Chinesco Transport, Inc., Ernest Madu by George Umunna Oparanozie (Oparanozie, George)
September 18, 2018 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:This case is set for an initial status conference on 10/23/18 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are directed to review the procedures for initial status conferences, located at [https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?79eF+7uiX7ewBj/ITKrjoA==], and to submit the required initial status report no later than 10/16/2018. Mailed notice (air, )
September 17, 2018 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Capital One Equipment Finance Corp. f/k/a All Points Capital Corp, d/ba/ Capital One Taxi Medallion Finance as to Ernest Madu on 9/14/2018, answer due 10/5/2018. (Lesko, Christina)
September 7, 2018 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (gcy, )
September 7, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Ernest Madu (jjr, )
September 7, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Chinesco Transport, Inc. (jjr, )
September 7, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. (pj, )
September 6, 2018 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Capital One Equipment Finance Corp. f/k/a All Points Capital Corp, d/ba/ Capital One Taxi Medallion Finance by Robert Edward Browne, Jr (Browne, Robert)
September 6, 2018 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Capital One Equipment Finance Corp. f/k/a All Points Capital Corp, d/ba/ Capital One Taxi Medallion Finance by Christina Joanne Blackfor Lesko (Lesko, Christina)
September 6, 2018 3 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Capital One Equipment Finance Corp. f/k/a All Points Capital Corp, d/ba/ Capital One Taxi Medallion Finance re complaint #1 (Lesko, Christina)
September 6, 2018 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Lesko, Christina)
September 6, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed by Capital One Equipment Finance Corp. f/k/a All Points Capital Corp, d/ba/ Capital One Taxi Medallion Finance ; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14918535. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lesko, Christina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Capital One Equipment Finance Corp. f/k/a All Points Capital Corp, d/ba/ Capital One Taxi Medallion Finance v. Chinesco Transport, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest Madu
Represented By: George Umunna Oparanozie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chinesco Transport, Inc.
Represented By: George Umunna Oparanozie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capital One Equipment Finance Corp. f/k/a All Points Capital Corp, d/ba/ Capital One Taxi Medallion Finance
Represented By: Christina Joanne Blackfor Lesko
Represented By: Robert Edward Browne, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?