Romspen Mortgage Limited Partnership v. BGC Holdings LLC et al
Plaintiff: Romspen Mortgage Limited Partnership
Defendant: Puthenveetil K. Bobby, BGC Holdings LLC, Unknown Claimants, Samuel K. Bobby, Non-Record Claimants, BGC Holdings LLC - Arlington Place One, Zone Mechanical LLC and Unknown Owners
Case Number: 1:2018cv06196
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting motion for appointment of receiver. Signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 10/26/2018. Mailed notice (smm)
October 26, 2018 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Motion hearing held on 10/26/2018. Plaintiff's motion for appointment of receiver #8 is granted. Status hearing set for 1/18/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
October 25, 2018 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Romspen Mortgage Limited Partnership. Samuel K. Bobby waiver sent on 10/5/2018, answer due 12/4/2018. (Green, Trinitee)
October 5, 2018 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Motion hearing held on 10/5/2018. Plaintiff's motion for appointment of receiver #8 is entered and continued to 10/26/2018 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
September 27, 2018 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Romspen Mortgage Limited Partnership regarding Summons, Complaint, Motion for Appointment of Receiver, Notice of Motion served on Zone Mechanical, LLC, Angela Freeman, Assistant on 9/17/2018 (DeJonker, Jason)
September 27, 2018 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Romspen Mortgage Limited Partnership regarding Summons, Complaint, Motion for Appointment of Receiver, Notice of Motion served on Puthenveetli K. Bobby on 9/17/2018 (DeJonker, Jason)
September 27, 2018 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Romspen Mortgage Limited Partnership regarding Summons, Complaint, Motion for Appointment of Receiver, Notice of Motion served on BGC Holdings LLC c/o Samuel K. Bobby, Agent on 9/19/2018 (DeJonker, Jason)
September 27, 2018 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Romspen Mortgage Limited Partnership regarding Summons, Complaint, Motion for Appointment of Receiver, Notice of Motion served on BGC Holdings LLC-Arlington Place One, a Series of BGC Holdings LLC c/o Samuel K. Bobby, Agent on 9/19/2018 (DeJonker, Jason)
September 14, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Puthenveetil K. Bobby (pj, )
September 14, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Jason Jon DeJonker for presentment of motion to appoint receiver #8 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 10/5/2018 at 09:30 AM. (DeJonker, Jason)
September 14, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION by Plaintiff Romspen Mortgage Limited Partnership to appoint receiver (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(DeJonker, Jason)
September 14, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants BGC Holdings LLC, BGC Holdings LLC - Arlington Place One, Samuel K. Bobby, Zone Mechanical LLC. (acm)
September 14, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (smm)
September 11, 2018 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Romspen Mortgage Limited Partnership by Donald Alexander Cole (Cole, Donald)
September 11, 2018 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Plaintiff regarding complaint #1 Verification (DeJonker, Jason)
September 11, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. (jn, )
September 11, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Romspen Mortgage Limited Partnership by Trinitee Gale Green (Green, Trinitee)
September 11, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Romspen Mortgage Limited Partnership by Jason Jon DeJonker (DeJonker, Jason)
September 11, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (DeJonker, Jason)
September 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Romspen Mortgage Limited Partnership; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14931190. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-11)(DeJonker, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Romspen Mortgage Limited Partnership v. BGC Holdings LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puthenveetil K. Bobby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BGC Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Claimants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel K. Bobby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Non-Record Claimants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BGC Holdings LLC - Arlington Place One
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zone Mechanical LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Owners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Romspen Mortgage Limited Partnership
Represented By: Trinitee Gale Green
Represented By: Donald Alexander Cole
Represented By: Jason Jon DeJonker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?