Kasper v. Becovic Management Group, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Constance Kasper
Defendant: Becovic Management Group, Inc. and 6001 N.Kenmore, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv06228
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2018 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motion hearing held. Plaintiff Connie Kasper's motion for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction #11 is entered and continued to 11/21/2018 at 9:00 a.m. Defendants are given until 11/29/2018 to file their answer to the complaint. Mailed notice (cdh, )
November 8, 2018 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Becovic Management Group, Inc. by Thomas Gerald Cronin (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Cronin, Thomas)
November 8, 2018 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Becovic Management Group, Inc. by Chirag Haresh Patel (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Patel, Chirag)
October 31, 2018 12 NOTICE of Motion by Mary Elizabeth Rosenberg for presentment of motion for temporary restraining order #11 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 11/8/2018 at 09:15 AM. (Rosenberg, Mary)
October 31, 2018 11 MOTION by Plaintiff Constance Kasper for temporary restraining order (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit Memorandum Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Memorandum Exhibit B, #4 Notice of Filing)(Rosenberg, Mary)
October 19, 2018 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing held. Defendants did not appear. Mandatory initial disclosures are due 11/30/2018. A further status hearing is set for 2/13/2019 at 9:00 a.m. If at any time the parties jointly wish to have a settlement conference, they shall contact the Court's Courtroom Deputy for a referral to the magistrate judge. Mailed notice (cdh, )
October 17, 2018 9 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) , filed by Plaintiff Constance Kasper. (Rosenberg, Mary)
October 10, 2018 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Constance Kasper by Kenneth M Walden (Walden, Kenneth)
October 10, 2018 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Constance Kasper as to Becovic Management Group, Inc. on 10/3/2018, answer due 10/24/2018. (Rosenberg, Mary)
October 10, 2018 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Constance Kasper as to 6001 N.Kenmore, LLC on 10/3/2018, answer due 10/24/2018. (Rosenberg, Mary)
September 25, 2018 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial status hearing is set for 10/19/2018 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the courts action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least two days prior to the initial status. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (cdh, )
September 13, 2018 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (nsf, )
September 12, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants 6001 N.Kenmore, LLC, Becovic Management Group, Inc. (kb, )
September 12, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. (ec, )
September 12, 2018 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Constance Kasper by Mary Elizabeth Rosenberg (Rosenberg, Mary)
September 12, 2018 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Rosenberg, Mary)
September 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed by Constance Kasper; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14935847. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Rosenberg, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kasper v. Becovic Management Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Becovic Management Group, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Gerald Cronin
Represented By: Chirag Haresh Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 6001 N.Kenmore, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constance Kasper
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Rosenberg
Represented By: Kenneth M Walden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?