J&J Sports Productions Inc v. Zheng et al

Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions Inc
Defendant: Hokkaido Supermeville, Inc. and Li Guang Zheng
Case Number: 1:2018cv06232
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Edmond E Chang
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by J&J Sports Productions Inc as to Li Guang Zheng on 10/24/2018, answer due 11/14/2018. (Smith, Zane)
October 26, 2018 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: In light of R. 5, Plaintiff shall make prompt service efforts. The status hearing of 10/30/2018 is reset to 12/14/2018 at 8:30 a.m., with another status report due by 12/08/2018. Emailed notice (slb, )
October 25, 2018 Filing 5 STATUS Report by J&J Sports Productions Inc (Smith, Zane)
October 15, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Li Guang Zheng (ec, )
September 13, 2018 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Initial status hearing set for 10/30/2018 at 8:30 a.m. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements at least 3 business days before the initial status hearing. Plaintiff must still file the report even if not all Defendants have been served or have responded to requests to craft a joint report. Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel must read them anew even if counsel has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases. Emailed notice (Attachments: #1 Status Report Requirements) (slb, )
September 13, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (eaa, )
September 12, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. (ec, )
September 12, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Smith, Zane)
September 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by J&J Sports Productions Inc; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14936686.(Smith, Zane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J&J Sports Productions Inc v. Zheng et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hokkaido Supermeville, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Li Guang Zheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions Inc
Represented By: Zane D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?