Juric v. Nielsen et al

Plaintiff: Goran Juric
Defendant: Director L. Francis Cissna, Secretary Kirstjen Nielsen, U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney Genera Jeff Sessions and Director Martha Medina-Maltes
Case Number: 1:2018cv06283
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Jorge L Alonso
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:0701
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 2, 2018 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Pursuant to the Parties' joint initial status report, initial status hearing previously set for 11/7/18 is stricken and reset to 12/20/18 at 9:30 a.m. Notices mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
November 1, 2018 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Goran Juric (Bartos, Sara)
October 12, 2018 6 Featured Case MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Initial status hearing set for 11/7/18 at 9:30 a.m. Parties shall review and comply with Judge Alonso's Standing Order on The Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project on his website. Notices mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
September 19, 2018 5 DESIGNATION of Craig Arthur Oswald as U.S. Attorney for Defendants L. Francis Cissna, Martha Medina-Maltes, Kirstjen Nielsen, Jeff Sessions, U.S. Attorney (Oswald, Craig)
September 17, 2018 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (gcy, )
September 14, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants L. Francis Cissna, Martha Medina-Maltes, Kirstjen Nielsen, Jeff Sessions, U.S. Attorney (pj, )
September 14, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. (pj, )
September 14, 2018 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Goran Juric by Sara Judith Bartos (Bartos, Sara)
September 14, 2018 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Bartos, Sara)
September 14, 2018 1 COMPLAINT for Writ of Mandamus filed by Goran Juric; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14946901. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Bartos, Sara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Juric v. Nielsen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director L. Francis Cissna
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Attorney
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Attorney Genera Jeff Sessions
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Martha Medina-Maltes
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Goran Juric
Represented By: Sara Judith Bartos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?