City of Chicago, an Illinois Municipal Corporation v. Shannon

Appellee: Timothy Shannon
Appellant: City of Chicago, an Illinois Municipal Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv06287
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2018 FINAL closing order dated 10/17/2018 entered on USBC docket. (yap, )
October 17, 2018 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Appellant's motion to terminate this bankruptcy appeal is granted #6 in light of the Court of Appeals' acceptance of a direct appeal in this case. Civil case terminated. (pjg, )
October 15, 2018 7 NOTICE of Motion by David Paul Holtkamp for presentment of motion for order #6 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/18/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Holtkamp, David)
October 15, 2018 6 MOTION by Appellant City of Chicago, an Illinois Municipal Corporation for order Terminating Case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Holtkamp, David)
October 15, 2018 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Appellant's opening brief in this bankruptcy appeal is to be filed by 11/19/2018. Appellee's brief is to be filed by 12/17/2018. Appellant's reply brief is to be filed by 1/7/2019. (mk)
September 24, 2018 4 MAILED Rule 83.16 and Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3) letters with an attorney appearance form to all counsel of record. (yap, )
September 19, 2018 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellee Timothy Shannon by John Peter Wonais (Wonais, John)
September 14, 2018 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellant City of Chicago, an Illinois Municipal Corporation by David Paul Holtkamp (Holtkamp, David)
September 14, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. (pj, )
September 14, 2018 1 APPEAL from U.S. Bankruptcy Court case number 18 B 4116 (Judge Doyle) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Transmittal Letter NOA, #3 BK Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(USBC-Gonzalez, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Chicago, an Illinois Municipal Corporation v. Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Timothy Shannon
Represented By: John Peter Wonais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: City of Chicago, an Illinois Municipal Corporation
Represented By: David Paul Holtkamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?