Stokes v. US Bank NA
Plaintiff: Johnetta Stokes
Defendant: US Bank NA
Case Number: 1:2018cv06290
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion hearing held on 10/18/2018. Defendant has filed a motion to dismiss #8 . Plaintiff Johnetta Stokes is to file a written response by 11/8/2018. defendant is to file a reply to the response by 11/21/2018. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
October 11, 2018 Filing 10 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by US Bank NA (Seccombe, Justin)
October 11, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Justin Anthony Seccombe for presentment of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #8 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/18/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Seccombe, Justin)
October 11, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendant US Bank NA to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Seccombe, Justin)
October 11, 2018 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant US Bank NA by Justin Anthony Seccombe (Seccombe, Justin)
October 11, 2018 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant US Bank NA by Ryan Matthew Holz (Holz, Ryan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant US Bank NA (bg, )
September 14, 2018 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Johnetta Stokes (bg, )
September 14, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (bg, )
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Johnetta Stokes (bg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stokes v. US Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnetta Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank NA
Represented By: Ryan Matthew Holz
Represented By: Justin Anthony Seccombe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?