O.O.L.G. v. Sessions et al

Plaintiff: O.O.L.G.
Defendant: Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Daniel Bible, E. Scott Lloyd, Ronald D. Vitiello, Kevin K. McAleenan, Ricardo Wong, Alex M. Azar II, Jefferson B. Sessions, III and Heartland Human Care Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv06307
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:0701
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 7, 2018 32 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Status hearing held on 11/7/2018. Based upon the representation of the parties, this case is hereby voluntarily dismissed without prejudice. All pending deadlines and hearings are stricken. Mailed notice (gel, )
October 25, 2018 31 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Oral agreed motion to reset status hearing is granted. Status hearing previously set for 10/25/2018 is reset for 11/7/2018 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, )
October 16, 2018 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Status hearing held on 10/16/2018 and continued to 10/25/2018 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, )
October 15, 2018 29 First Amended Petition for Judicial Review of Placement Determination Pursuant to Flores Settlement Agreement and Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus AMENDED complaint by O.O.L.G. against Alex M. Azar II, Heartland Human Care Services, Inc., E. Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Ronald D. Vitiello, Ricardo Wong and terminating Daniel Bible (Director, ICE Field Office for Enforcement and Removal Operations in San Antonio, Texas) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-C, #2 Certificate of Service)(Maldonado, Amy)
October 2, 2018 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Status hearing held on 10/2/2018 and continued to 10/16/2018 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Status will be stricken if parties file dismissal documents prior to the next hearing. Mailed notice (gel, )
October 2, 2018 27 Featured Case ORDER Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 10/2/2018. Mailed notice(gel, )
October 2, 2018 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This Court denies Defendant's motion to reconsider temporary restraining order #8 . All other deadlines and hearings to stand at this time. Mailed notice (gel, )
October 1, 2018 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: On the Court's own motion, the case is set for status hearing at 10/2/18 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, )
September 27, 2018 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Motion hearing held on 9/27/2018. Defendant's motion for reconsideration #8 is taken under advisement and the Court will issue a ruling by separate order. The Court's issued Temporary Restraining Order #10 remains in place. Mailed notice (gel, )
September 27, 2018 23 DESIGNATION of Sarah Bernadette Fabian as U.S. Attorney for Defendants Alex M. Azar II, Daniel Bible, E. Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Ronald D. Vitiello, Ricardo Wong (Fabian, Sarah)
September 27, 2018 22 SUR-REPLY by Defendants Alex M. Azar II, Daniel Bible, E. Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Ronald D. Vitiello, Ricardo Wong to order on motion to appear pro hac vice,,,, order on motion for protective order,,,, order on motion for leave to file excess pages,,,, terminate hearings,,,, motion hearing,,,, set motion and R&R deadlines/hearings,,, #17 , Response #20 , order on motion for miscellaneous relief, text entry #21 , memorandum #18 , motion for reconsideration #8 (Press, Joshua)
September 26, 2018 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Plaintiff's unopposed motion for miscellaneous relief #19 is granted. Defendants' sur-reply should be filed by 6:30am on 9/27/18. Mailed notice (gel, )
September 25, 2018 20 RESPONSE by Plaintiff O.O.L.G. to memorandum in support of motion #15 , memorandum #18 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-D, #2 Certificate of Service)(Maldonado, Amy)
September 25, 2018 19 MOTION by Plaintiff O.O.L.G.Motion to Accept Late Filed Supplemental Response (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Late Filed Response, #2 Exhibit Proposed Late Filed Exhibits, #3 Certificate of Service)(Maldonado, Amy)
September 21, 2018 18 MEMORANDUM motion for reconsideration #8 by Alex M. Azar II, Daniel Bible, E. Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Ronald D. Vitiello, Ricardo Wong SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM (Press, Joshua)
September 19, 2018 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Motion hearing held on 9/19/2018. Defendants' motion #16 to exceed the 15-page limit is granted without objection. Defendants are granted leave to file an amended memorandum in support of its emergency motion #8 for reconsideration by 9/21/2018. Plaintiff's response due by 9/24/2018, defendants' sur-reply due by 9/26/2018. Oral motion to exceed page limitation up to 30 pages granted as to both parties. Attorney Bridget Cambria's motion #6 for leave to appear pro hac vice is granted without objection. Plaintiff's motion #13 for a protective order for the redaction of plaintiff's name and A-file number from all orders, transcripts and filings available to the public is granted without objection. Motion hearing set for 9/27/2018 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (cn).
September 19, 2018 16 MOTION by Defendants Alex M. Azar II, Daniel Bible, E. Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Jefferson B. Sessions, III for leave to file excess pages (Oswald, Craig)
September 19, 2018 15 MEMORANDUM by Alex M. Azar II, Daniel Bible, E. Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Ronald D. Vitiello, Ricardo Wong in support of motion for reconsideration #8 (Press, Joshua)
September 19, 2018 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Alex M. Azar II, Daniel Bible, E. Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Ronald D. Vitiello, Ricardo Wong by Joshua Samuel Press (Press, Joshua)
September 18, 2018 13 MOTION by Plaintiff O.O.L.G. for protective order pursuant to F.R.C.P. 5.2(E)(1) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Maldonado, Amy)
September 18, 2018 12 RESPONSE by Plaintiff O.O.L.G. to motion for reconsideration #8 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Maldonado, Amy)
September 18, 2018 11 SEALED EXHIBIT A regarding temporary restraining order #10 . (gel, )
September 18, 2018 10 TEMPORARY Restraining Order Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 9/18/2018. Mailed notice(gel, )
September 18, 2018 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This Court grants Plaintiff's emergency motion for a temporary restraining order #5 . Exhibit A to this Court's order shall be filed under seal. This Court will address Defendant's emergency motion for reconsideration #8 at on 9/19/18 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, )
September 18, 2018 8 MOTION by Defendants Alex M. Azar II, Daniel Bible, E. Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Jefferson B. Sessions, III for reconsideration (Oswald, Craig)
September 18, 2018 7 DESIGNATION of Craig Arthur Oswald as U.S. Attorney for Defendants Alex M. Azar II, Daniel Bible, E. Scott Lloyd, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Ronald D. Vitiello, Ricardo Wong (Oswald, Craig)
September 17, 2018 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14957229. (Cambria, Bridget)
September 17, 2018 5 MOTION by Plaintiff O.O.L.G. for temporary restraining order (Emergency) (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration Exhibit A, Declaration of Ms. L.O.L.G., #3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Maldonado, Amy)
September 17, 2018 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Heartland Human Care Services, Inc. by Nasir Hussain (Hussain, Nasir)
September 17, 2018 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Heartland Human Care Services, Inc. by Linda T. Coberly (Coberly, Linda)
September 17, 2018 2 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (tt, )
September 17, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. (acm)
September 14, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed by O.O.L.G.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14950820. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Maldonado, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O.O.L.G. v. Sessions et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen M. Nielsen
Represented By: Joshua Samuel Press
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Sarah Bernadette Fabian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Bible
Represented By: Joshua Samuel Press
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Sarah Bernadette Fabian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Scott Lloyd
Represented By: Joshua Samuel Press
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Sarah Bernadette Fabian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald D. Vitiello
Represented By: Joshua Samuel Press
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Sarah Bernadette Fabian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K. McAleenan
Represented By: Joshua Samuel Press
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Sarah Bernadette Fabian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricardo Wong
Represented By: Joshua Samuel Press
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Sarah Bernadette Fabian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar II
Represented By: Joshua Samuel Press
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Sarah Bernadette Fabian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson B. Sessions, III
Represented By: Joshua Samuel Press
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Sarah Bernadette Fabian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heartland Human Care Services, Inc.
Represented By: Nasir Hussain
Represented By: Linda T. Coberly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: O.O.L.G.
Represented By: Amy Maldonado
Represented By: Bridget Cambria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?