Gutierrez v. Imperial La Mian Chicago LLC

Plaintiff: Aracely Gutierrez
Defendant: Imperial La Mian Chicago LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv06309
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Charles P Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 11, 2018 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Imperial La Mian Chicago LLC by Laura Ann Elkayam (Elkayam, Laura)
October 11, 2018 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Imperial La Mian Chicago LLC by Camille N. Khodadad (Khodadad, Camille)
October 9, 2018 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Aracely Gutierrez. All Defendants. (Becerra, Carlos)
October 3, 2018 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status hearing set for 11/13/2018 at 9:30 AM. At the initial hearing, parties to report on the following: 1. Possibility of settlement. 2. If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to prepare the case for resolution. Lead counsel for each party is required to attend the initial hearing. Failure to appear at any scheduled court hearing may result in the dismissal of claims for want of prosecution. Pursuant to Local Rule 5.3(a)(1), service of motions and notice of motions must be accomplished no later than 4:00 p.m. of the third business day preceding the date of presentment. This includes delivering a hard copy of the motion and notice of motion to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B no later than 4:00 p.m. the day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the matter from the Court's motion call. The Court requires hard copies of all documents be submitted to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B the same day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the document from the record. The Court directs counsel's attention to its Motion Schedule and Case Management Procedures located at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Plaintiff is directed to advise all other parties of the Court's action herein. Mailed notice (vcf, )
September 17, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. (acm)
September 14, 2018 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Aracely Gutierrez by Carlos Gerardo Becerra (Becerra, Carlos)
September 14, 2018 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Becerra, Carlos)
September 14, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed by Aracely Gutierrez; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14951062.(Becerra, Carlos)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gutierrez v. Imperial La Mian Chicago LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imperial La Mian Chicago LLC
Represented By: Laura Ann Elkayam
Represented By: Camille N. Khodadad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aracely Gutierrez
Represented By: Carlos Gerardo Becerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?