Telebrands Corp. v. My Pilllow, Inc.

Plaintiff: Telebrands Corp.
Defendant: MY PILLOW, INC. and My Pilllow, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv06318
Filed: September 17, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 14, 2018 23 NOTICE by Telebrands Corp. SERVICE OF TELEBRANDS MIDP INITIAL DISCLOSURES (Leighton, Robert)
November 13, 2018 22 NOTICE by My Pilllow, Inc. of Service of Mandatory Initial Discovery (Hickman, Corey)
November 7, 2018 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Motion hearing held on 11/7/2018. Response to Plaintiff's motion to dismiss counts I through VI of Defendant's counterclaim #17 to be filed by 11/29/2018. Reply to be filed by 12/17/2018. Once the matter is fully briefed, the Court shall take it under advisement. MIDP disclosures are due by 11/13/2018. Status hearing set for 1/4/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, )
November 6, 2018 20 RESPONSE by Telebrands Corp.in Opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant My Pilllow, Inc. #12 (Leighton, Robert)
October 30, 2018 19 NOTICE of Motion by Robert Douglas Leighton for presentment of motion to dismiss #17 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 11/7/2018 at 08:45 AM. (Leighton, Robert)
October 30, 2018 18 MEMORANDUM by Telebrands Corp. in support of motion to dismiss #17 Counts I Through VI of Defendant's Counterclaim (Leighton, Robert)
October 30, 2018 17 MOTION by Plaintiff Telebrands Corp., Counter Defendant Telebrands Corp. to dismiss Counts I Through VI of Defendant's Counterclaim (Leighton, Robert)
October 30, 2018 16 ANSWER to counterclaim by Telebrands Corp.(Leighton, Robert)
October 12, 2018 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Plaintiff's response to defendant's motion to dismiss #12 to be filed by 11/6/2018. Reply to be filed by 11/29/2018. No appearance necessary on 10/16/2018. Mailed notice. (ym, )
October 9, 2018 14 NOTICE of Motion by James Gregory Argionis for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #12 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 10/16/2018 at 08:45 AM. (Argionis, James)
October 9, 2018 13 MEMORANDUM by My Pilllow, Inc. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #12 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint & Demand for Jury Trial)(Argionis, James)
October 9, 2018 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant My Pilllow, Inc. (Argionis, James)
October 9, 2018 11 Exhibit A to Defendant's Counterclaim by My Pilllow, Inc. (Argionis, James)
October 9, 2018 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM filed by My Pilllow, Inc. against Telebrands Corp. . by My Pilllow, Inc.(Argionis, James)
October 9, 2018 9 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure STATEMENT by My Pilllow, Inc. (Argionis, James)
September 20, 2018 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant My Pilllow, Inc. by James Gregory Argionis (Argionis, James)
September 19, 2018 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant My Pilllow, Inc. by Corey Thomas Hickman (Hickman, Corey)
September 18, 2018 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pk, )
September 17, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant MY PILLOW, INC. (kb, )
September 17, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. (acm)
September 17, 2018 5 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Telebrands Corp. (Leighton, Robert)
September 17, 2018 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Telebrands Corp. by Kenneth Steven Ulrich (Ulrich, Kenneth)
September 17, 2018 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Telebrands Corp. by Robert Douglas Leighton (Leighton, Robert)
September 17, 2018 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Leighton, Robert)
September 17, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed by Telebrands Corp.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14952676. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Leighton, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Telebrands Corp. v. My Pilllow, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MY PILLOW, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: My Pilllow, Inc.
Represented By: Corey Thomas Hickman
Represented By: James Gregory Argionis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Telebrands Corp.
Represented By: Kenneth Steven Ulrich
Represented By: Robert Douglas Leighton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?