McMillan v. BMO Harris Bank N.A.
Plaintiff: Virginia McMillan
Defendant: BMO Harris Bank N.A.
Case Number: 1:2018cv06386
Filed: September 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 Filing 17 REPLY by Defendant BMO Harris Bank N.A. to memorandum in support of motion #9 , motion to dismiss #8 (Jamison, Jeffrey)
October 30, 2018 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to extend briefing schedule #13 is granted. Response to Motion to Dismiss #8 due by 10/26/2018. Reply due by 11/2/2018. Motion hearing set for 11/1/2018 is stricken. Mailed notice (lk, )
October 26, 2018 Filing 15 RESPONSE by Virginia McMillanin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant BMO Harris Bank N.A. to dismiss #8 (Sweis, David)
October 23, 2018 Filing 14 Notice of Motion NOTICE of Motion by David R. Sweis for presentment of extension of time #13 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 11/1/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Sweis, David)
October 23, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION by Plaintiff Virginia McMillan for extension of time Plaintiffs Uncontested Motion to Extend Briefing Schedule (Sweis, David)
October 9, 2018 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Briefing schedule set as to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #8 . Response due by 10/23/2018. Reply due by 10/30/2018. Initial Status hearing set for 1/14/2019 at 9:00 AM stands.Mailed notice (lk, )
October 5, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE by Jeffrey Edmund Jamison of Change of Address (Jamison, Jeffrey)
October 5, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Jeffrey Edmund Jamison for presentment of motion to dismiss #8 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 10/23/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Jamison, Jeffrey)
October 5, 2018 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM by BMO Harris Bank N.A. in support of motion to dismiss #8 (Jamison, Jeffrey)
October 5, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendant BMO Harris Bank N.A. to dismiss (Jamison, Jeffrey)
October 5, 2018 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant BMO Harris Bank N.A. by Jeffrey Edmund Jamison (Jamison, Jeffrey)
October 1, 2018 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial status hearing set for 1/14/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Joint Status Report due by 1/10/2019. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge (see attached Consent form). At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (lk, )
September 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (smm)
September 20, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Virginia McMillan by Marcus Hurlbert (Hurlbert, Marcus)
September 20, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Virginia McMillan by David R. Sweis (Sweis, David)
September 20, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant BMO Harris Bank N.A. (pj, )
September 19, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. (lma, )
September 19, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Sweis, David)
September 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Virginia McMillan; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14965988.(Sweis, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McMillan v. BMO Harris Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMO Harris Bank N.A.
Represented By: Jeffrey Edmund Jamison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia McMillan
Represented By: David R. Sweis
Represented By: Marcus Hurlbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?