West Bend Mutual Insurance Company v. Bestway Transfer & Storage, Inc et al
Plaintiff: West Bend Mutual Insurance Company a/s/o Stella & Chewy's LLC and West Bend Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Unified Carrier Services Inc. and Bestway Transfer & Storage, Inc
Case Number: 1:2018cv06408
Filed: September 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Unified Carrier Services Inc. (2). (kb, )
November 15, 2018 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by West Bend Mutual Insurance Company. Bestway Transfer & Storage, Inc waiver sent on 10/10/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (Ostojic, Bozidar)
November 1, 2018 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: In light of issues of service, the status hearing set for 11/7/2018 is stricken and reset to 12/6/2018 at 9:00 a.m. Initial status report will now be due on 12/4/2018. Mailed notice (cdh, )
October 31, 2018 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff West Bend Mutual Insurance Company by John Andrew O'Donnell, Jr (O'Donnell, John)
September 25, 2018 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial status hearing is set for 11/7/2018 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the courts action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least two days prior to the initial status. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (cdh, )
September 21, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (kp, )
September 20, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff West Bend Mutual Insurance Company a/s/o Stella & Chewy's LLC by Bozidar Robert Ostojic (Ostojic, Bozidar)
September 20, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. (lma, )
September 20, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Ostojic, Bozidar)
September 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by West Bend Mutual Insurance Company a/s/o Stella & Chewy's LLC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14970940. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Ostojic, Bozidar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West Bend Mutual Insurance Company v. Bestway Transfer & Storage, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Bend Mutual Insurance Company a/s/o Stella & Chewy's LLC
Represented By: Bozidar Robert Ostojic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Bend Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: John Andrew O'Donnell, Jr.
Represented By: Bozidar Robert Ostojic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unified Carrier Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bestway Transfer & Storage, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?