Nanduri v. Gogo Inc. et al
Plaintiff: S.S.K. Nanduri
Defendant: Charles C Townsend, Robert L Crandall, John Wade, Norman Smagley, Barry Rowan, Ronald T Lemay, Hugh W Jones, Oakleigh Thorne, Michael J Small, Christopher D Payne, Robert H Mundheim, Gogo Inc., Michele Coleman Mayes and Harris N Williams
Case Number: 1:2018cv06524
Filed: September 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Filing 16 AMENDED NOTICE of Motion by Carl V. Malmstrom for presentment of motion by filer to set a briefing schedule #13 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 11/30/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Malmstrom, Carl)
November 20, 2018 Filing 15 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 11-16-18 before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Order Number: 32874. Court Reporter Contact Information: Sandra M. Mullin, Sandra_Mullin@ilnd.uscourts.gov, 312-554-8244. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 12/11/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/21/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/19/2019. (Mullin, Sandra)
November 16, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion by Carl V. Malmstrom for presentment of motion by filer to set a briefing schedule #13 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 11/26/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Malmstrom, Carl)
November 16, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION by Plaintiff S.S.K. Nanduri to set a briefing schedule (Malmstrom, Carl)
November 15, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15182518. Jerome S. Fortinsky (Fortinsky, Jerome)
November 15, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15182469. Brian H. Polovoy (Polovoy, Brian)
November 8, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Carl V. Malmstrom for presentment of motion to reassign case #9 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 11/16/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Malmstrom, Carl)
November 8, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION by Plaintiff S.S.K. Nanduri to reassign case (Plaintiffs' Motion for Reassignment of Cases as Related) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Malmstrom, Carl)
October 25, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE by Carl V. Malmstrom of Change of Address (Malmstrom, Carl)
October 11, 2018 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Scheduling conference set for 1/17/2019 at 09:30 AM. Rule 26 report re MIDP due 1/14/2019. The report must comply with the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot program of the district court. The report form can be found on Judge Bucklo's page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (reg)
October 5, 2018 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Gogo Inc. by Andrew Gordon May (May, Andrew)
October 5, 2018 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Gogo Inc. by Jonathan Stuart Quinn (Quinn, Jonathan)
September 27, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by S.S.K. Nanduri as to Gogo Inc. on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018. (Malmstrom, Carl)
September 26, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (lf, )
September 26, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Gogo Inc. (daj, )
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff S.S.K. Nanduri by Carl V. Malmstrom (Malmstrom, Carl)
September 26, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. (daj, )
September 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint) filed by S.S.K. Nanduri; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14990262. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Malmstrom, Carl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nanduri v. Gogo Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles C Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L Crandall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman Smagley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Rowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald T Lemay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugh W Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakleigh Thorne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher D Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert H Mundheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gogo Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Stuart Quinn
Represented By: Andrew Gordon May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michele Coleman Mayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harris N Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.S.K. Nanduri
Represented By: Carl V. Malmstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?