Wells Fargo Bank v. Muhammad
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank
Defendant: Ronald Muhammad
Case Number: 1:2018cv06548
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert W Gettleman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Motion by Adam A Price for presentment of motion to bar #12 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 12/13/2018 at 09:15 AM. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Price, Adam)
November 16, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion by Ronald Muhammad for presentment of motion for reconsideration #15 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 12/13/2018 at 09:15 AM. (kp, )
November 16, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION by Defendant Ronald Muhammad for reconsideration. (kp, )
November 15, 2018 Filing 14 REMAND with certified copy of order dated 11/15/18 and letter to Circuit Court of Cook County via email. (gcy, )
November 15, 2018 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 11/15/2018. Plaintiff's motion #10 to remand the Third Notice of Removal is granted. The Clerk is directed to remand this case to the Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, from where it originated, forthwith. Mailed notice (cn).
October 24, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION by Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank to bar additional filings pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11(b) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Price, Adam)
October 24, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Adam A Price for presentment of motion to remand, #10 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 11/15/2018 at 09:15 AM. (Price, Adam)
October 24, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION by Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank to remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Group C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Certificate of Service)(Price, Adam)
October 17, 2018 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank by Adam A Price (Price, Adam)
September 28, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronald Muhammad as to Wells Fargo Bank on 9/28/2018, answer due 10/19/2018. (sxb, )
September 27, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Correction regarding Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot(MIDP) #5 . (kp, )
September 27, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Plaintiff Wells Fargo Bank (yt)
September 27, 2018 Filing 6 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to all counsel on record. (kp, )
September 27, 2018 Filing 5 ENTERED IN ERROR. Modified on 9/27/2018 (kp, ).
September 26, 2018 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Defendant Ronald Muhammad. (kp, )
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (kp, )
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from The Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois County Department, Chancery Division, case number (12 CH 021767) filed by Ronald Muhammad. (kp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank v. Muhammad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Muhammad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank
Represented By: Adam A Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?