Spratt v. Bellwood Public Library
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Spratt
Defendant: Bellwood Public Library
Case Number: 1:2018cv06573
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:623
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by Garth C.K. Madison for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #8 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 11/27/2018 at 08:45 AM. (Madison, Garth)
November 15, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by Alexis D Martin for presentment of motion to file instanter, #11 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 11/27/2018 at 08:45 AM. (Martin, Alexis)
November 15, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION by Plaintiff Jacqueline Spratt to file instanter corrected pleading (UNOPPOSED MOTION) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Corrected First Amended Complaint - Redline), #2 Exhibit B (Corrected First Amended Complaint - Clean with ExA))(Martin, Alexis)
November 13, 2018 Filing 10 FIRST AMENDED complaint by Jacqueline Spratt against All Defendants Bellwood Public Library (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Right to Sue)(Martin, Alexis)
November 2, 2018 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman. Plaintiff is directed to advise the defendant of the status hearing forthwith. The parties are reminded that responsive pleadings must comply with section A(3) of this Court's Standing Order Regarding the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project. Status hearing set for 12/28/2018 at 9:00 AM. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 business days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. The Court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. In the event that the defendant files a motion under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b), the defendant is granted leave to notice that motion for presentment at the date and time of the status hearing. Mailed notice. (ym, )
October 23, 2018 Filing 8 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Bellwood Public Library (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint)(Madison, Garth)
October 23, 2018 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Bellwood Public Library by Garth C.K. Madison Madison, Garth C.K. (Madison, Garth)
October 12, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jacqueline Spratt as to Bellwood Public Library on 10/2/2018, answer due 10/23/2018. (Martin, Alexis)
September 28, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Bellwood Public Library (lma, )
September 27, 2018 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jacqueline Spratt by Alejandro Caffarelli (Caffarelli, Alejandro)
September 27, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (tt, )
September 27, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. (jjr, )
September 26, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jacqueline Spratt by Alexis D Martin (Martin, Alexis)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Martin, Alexis)
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jacqueline Spratt; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14996611. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Martin, Alexis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spratt v. Bellwood Public Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bellwood Public Library
Represented By: Garth C.K. Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Spratt
Represented By: Alexis D Martin
Represented By: Alejandro Caffarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?