Luxottica Group S.p.A. et al v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Plaintiff: Luxottica Group S.p.A. and Oakley, Inc.
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A", Deanna Lunceford, Laurel Solomon, Matthew Pulido, Pamela Martin, Tao Shen, David Diaz, Sherry Brown, Gwendolyn Waugh, Susie Cervantez, Liu Lei, wei kang, Veronica Eckenrode, Nicholas Tavarez, Yao Long He, Dustin Colyer, Deanna Frank, Sarah Henty, Larry Walker, Scott Northern, Jose Hunter, Donna Branstetter, wenquan liu, John Adams, Ming Hua Chen, Eric Tiller, Mark Fuller, Penny Torres, Daniel McKee, Ruth Copp, John Garrick, Yin Lin, Xie Ji Ping, Gordon Rothwell, Eric Robinson, Samuel Rumbaugh, Komissarova Anastasija, James Roberts, Victor Brown, Leona Wise, Valerie Atwood, Golda Walker, Joshua Hooks, Laura Cooper, yaolong he (2), Gerald Fitzmaurice, Jean Hereford, wangyuye, Mike Hughes, Mary Cross, Daniel Ponder, Yan Zhi, Lee Correa, zengpeng, James Keeley, Jeffrey Rausch, huang dashi, He Ho Long, Guo Guo, George Vandorn, Nancy Simpson, Fredric Torres, Michael Ferguson, yaolong he, Richard Grooms, Ke Zhi Jie, jeokey li, zheng ze, William Shively, Doug Sharma, Naivette Carlton, Tracy Allen, Susan Harmon, John Brooks, guo degang and Michael Hulsey
Case Number: 1:2018cv06608
Filed: September 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Filing 42 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER, Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 11/20/2018. Mailed notice. (ek, )
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER ; Motion hearing held on ll/20/20l8. Plaintiff's motion for entry of a preliminary injunction is granted. #38 Enter Preliminary Injunction Order. Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint #11 and Exhibits I and 2 thereto U l-U and [ 1-2], Schedule A to the Complaint #10 and the Amended Complaint I l-3], Exhibits 5 and 6 to the Declaration of Jason Groppe #16 #17 and #18 and the TRO #26 are all unsealed. The $10,000 bond posted by plaintiffs shall remain with the Court until a Final disposition of this case or until this Preliminary Injunction is terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 11/20/2018. Mailed notice. (ek, )
November 15, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #38 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 11/20/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
November 15, 2018 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM by Luxottica Group S.p.A., Oakley, Inc. in support of motion for preliminary injunction #38 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin)
November 15, 2018 Filing 38 MOTION by Plaintiffs Luxottica Group S.p.A., Oakley, Inc. for preliminary injunction Correcting #36 (Gaudio, Justin)
November 15, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE of Correction regarding MOTION by Plaintiffs Luxottica Group S.p.A., Oakley, Inc. for preliminary injunction #36 (ew, )
November 15, 2018 Filing 36 FILED on the incorrect docket. (Docket Text Modified by Clerks Office.) (Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 11/15/2018 (ew, ).
November 8, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Zheng Ze and all other Defendants identified in the Amended Complaint. (acm)
November 6, 2018 Filing 35 EXTENSION of Temporary Restraining Order. Plaintiffs' motion for extension of the temporary restraining order #32 is granted. Motion hearing held on 11/6/2018. The temporary restraining order is extended until 11/20/2018. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 11/6/2018:Mailed notice(srn, )
November 1, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of extension of time #32 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 11/6/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
November 1, 2018 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM by Luxottica Group S.p.A., Oakley, Inc. in support of extension of time #32 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio)(Gaudio, Justin)
November 1, 2018 Filing 32 MOTION by Plaintiffs Luxottica Group S.p.A., Oakley, Inc. for extension of time of Temporary Restraining Order (Gaudio, Justin)
October 22, 2018 Filing 31 EXTENSION of Temporary Restraining Order. Plaintiffs' motion for extension of the temporary restraining order #27 is granted. Motion hearing held on 10/22/2018. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 10/22/2018:Mailed notice(srn, )
October 18, 2018 Filing 30 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER BOND in the amount of $ 10,000.00 posted by Luxottica Group S.p.A. (ek, )
October 17, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of extension of time #27 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 10/22/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
October 17, 2018 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM by Luxottica Group S.p.A., Oakley, Inc. in support of extension of time #27 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio)(Gaudio, Justin)
October 17, 2018 Filing 27 MOTION by Plaintiffs Luxottica Group S.p.A., Oakley, Inc. for extension of time of Temporary Restraining Order (Gaudio, Justin)
October 9, 2018 Filing 26 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 10/9/2018. (td, ) Modified on 11/21/2018 (ek, ).
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: Motion hearing held 10/9/2018. Plaintiffs' motion for a temporary restraining order, including a temporary injunction, a temporary transfer of the domain names, a temporary asset restraint, and expedited discovery is granted. #12 Enter Sealed Temporary Restraining Order. Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file under seal is granted. #6 Plaintiffs' motion for electronic service of process is granted. #19 Plaintiffs shall deposit with the Court ten thousand ($10,000.00), either cash or surety bond, as security, which amount was determined adequate for the payment of such damages as any person may be entitled to recover as a result of a wrongful restraint hereunder. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 10/9/2018. Mailed notice (td, )
October 3, 2018 Filing 24 Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by Luxottica Group S.p.A., Oakley, Inc. (Gaudio, Justin)
October 3, 2018 Filing 23 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Luxottica Group S.p.A., Oakley, Inc. (Gaudio, Justin)
October 3, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for temporary restraining order, #12 , motion for miscellaneous relief #19 , motion for leave to file #6 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 10/9/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
October 3, 2018 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #20 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Gaudio, Justin)
October 3, 2018 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM by Luxottica Group S.p.A., Oakley, Inc. in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #19 (Gaudio, Justin)
October 3, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION by Plaintiffs Luxottica Group S.p.A., Oakley, Inc.for Electronic Service of Process Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) (Gaudio, Justin)
October 3, 2018 Filing 18 EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Luxottica Group S.p.A., Oakley, Inc. Exhibit 6 regarding declaration #15 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6)(Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 11/21/2018 (ek, ).
October 3, 2018 Filing 17 EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Luxottica Group S.p.A., Oakley, Inc. Exhibit 5 - Parts 11-16 regarding declaration #15 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5-11, #2 Exhibit 5-12, #3 Exhibit 5-13, #4 Exhibit 5-14, #5 Exhibit 5-15, #6 Exhibit 5-16)(Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 11/21/2018 (ek, ).
October 3, 2018 Filing 16 EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Luxottica Group S.p.A., Oakley, Inc. Exhibit 5 - Parts 1-10 regarding declaration #15 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5-1, #2 Exhibit 5-2, #3 Exhibit 5-3, #4 Exhibit 5-4, #5 Exhibit 5-5, #6 Exhibit 5-6, #7 Exhibit 5-7, #8 Exhibit 5-8, #9 Exhibit 5-9, #10 Exhibit 5-10)(Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 11/21/2018 (ek, ).
October 3, 2018 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Jason Groppe regarding memorandum in support of motion #13 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Gaudio, Justin)
October 3, 2018 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #13 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Gaudio, Justin)
October 3, 2018 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM by Luxottica Group S.p.A., Oakley, Inc. in support of motion for temporary restraining order, #12 (Gaudio, Justin)
October 3, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION by Plaintiffs Luxottica Group S.p.A., Oakley, Inc. for temporary restraining order , including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Transfer of the Defendant Domain Names, a Temporary Asset Restraint, and Expedited Discovery (Gaudio, Justin)
October 3, 2018 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Plaintiffs Luxottica Group S.p.A., Oakley, Inc. Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Schedule A)(Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 11/21/2018 (ek, ).
October 3, 2018 Filing 10 EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Luxottica Group S.p.A., Oakley, Inc. Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 11/21/2018 (ek, ).
September 28, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (tt, )
September 28, 2018 Filing 8 MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials. (tt, )
September 28, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. (daj, )
September 28, 2018 Filing 7 MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (Attachments: #1 Registration Numbers) (tt, )
September 27, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiffs Luxottica Group S.p.A., Oakley, Inc. for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin)
September 27, 2018 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Luxottica Group S.p.A., Oakley, Inc. by RiKaleigh C. Johnson (Johnson, RiKaleigh)
September 27, 2018 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Luxottica Group S.p.A., Oakley, Inc. by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy)
September 27, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Luxottica Group S.p.A., Oakley, Inc. by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin)
September 27, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin)
September 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Luxottica Group S.p.A., Oakley, Inc.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15002510. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Schedule A)(Gaudio, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luxottica Group S.p.A. et al v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deanna Lunceford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurel Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Pulido
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tao Shen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwendolyn Waugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susie Cervantez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liu Lei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: wei kang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veronica Eckenrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Tavarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yao Long He
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Colyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deanna Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Henty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Northern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Branstetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: wenquan liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ming Hua Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Tiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penny Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth Copp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Garrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yin Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xie Ji Ping
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon Rothwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Rumbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Komissarova Anastasija
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leona Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valerie Atwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golda Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Hooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: yaolong he (2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Fitzmaurice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Hereford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: wangyuye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Ponder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yan Zhi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Correa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: zengpeng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Keeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Rausch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: huang dashi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: He Ho Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guo Guo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Vandorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fredric Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: yaolong he
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Grooms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ke Zhi Jie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jeokey li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: zheng ze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Shively
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Sharma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naivette Carlton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: guo degang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Hulsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luxottica Group S.p.A.
Represented By: Amy Crout Ziegler
Represented By: RiKaleigh C. Johnson
Represented By: Justin R. Gaudio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oakley, Inc.
Represented By: Amy Crout Ziegler
Represented By: RiKaleigh C. Johnson
Represented By: Justin R. Gaudio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?