Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. et al v. BMO Securities, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. and Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. and Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited
Defendant: BMO NESBITT SECURITIES LTD. and BMO Harris Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2018cv06721
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Joan B Gottschall
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Defendants' agreed motion to extend time to answer or otherwise respond #17 is granted. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond by 12/14/18. The status hearing set for 12/7/18 is stricken and reset to 12/19/18 at 9:30 a.m. No appearance is required on 11/28/18. Mailed notice (mjc, )
November 15, 2018 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Attorney Susan J. Kohlmann's application to appear pro hac vice #16 on behalf of the defendants is granted. Mailed notice (mjc, )
November 14, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Motion by Benjamin J. Bradford for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #17 before Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 11/28/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Bradford, Benjamin)
November 14, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION by Defendants BMO Harris Bank, N.A., BMO Nesbitt Securities Ltd. for extension of time to file answer or otherwise respond (Agreed) (Bradford, Benjamin)
November 14, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15176408. (Kohlmann, Susan)
November 13, 2018 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants BMO Harris Bank, N.A., BMO Nesbitt Securities Ltd. by Anna Jane Mitran (Mitran, Anna)
November 13, 2018 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants BMO Harris Bank, N.A., BMO Nesbitt Securities Ltd. by Benjamin J. Bradford (Bradford, Benjamin)
November 13, 2018 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Attorney Robert Lester Powley's application to appear pro hac vice #12 on behalf of the plaintiffs is granted. Mailed notice (mjc, )
November 9, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15164307. (Powley, Robert)
November 9, 2018 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Attorney Jason Howard Kasner's application to appear pro hac vice #9 on behalf of the plaintiffs is granted. Attorney James M. Gibson's application to appear pro hac vice #10 on behalf of the plaintiffs is granted. Mailed notice (mjc, )
November 8, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15161561. (Gibson, James)
November 8, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15161507. (Kasner, Jason)
October 30, 2018 Filing 8 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. and Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited (Parks, Kevin)
October 30, 2018 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. and Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited regarding Summons; Complaint; Exhibit A; Civil Cover Sheet; Case Management Package and Order served on BMO Harris Nesbitt Securities, LTD. c/o Y. Nieves, Teller authorized to accept on October 19, 2018 (Goodarzi, Tara)
October 30, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. and Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited regarding Summons; Complaint; Exhibit A; Civil Cover Sheet; Case Management Package and Order served on BMO Harris Bank, N.A. c/o Y. Nieves, Teller authorized to accept on October 19, 2018 (Goodarzi, Tara)
October 30, 2018 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. and Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited by Tara Goodarzi (Goodarzi, Tara)
October 19, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants BMO Harris Bank, N.A., BMO Nesbitt Securities Ltd. (jjr, )
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Status hearing set for 12/7/2018 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 2325. If, by the date of the scheduled status hearing, defendant has not been served, plaintiff should call the courtroom deputy (312-435-5641) to request a new status date. No status hearing should be held until all defendants have been served. Plaintiff is directed to advise the defendants of the status hearing forthwith. Pursuant to LR 5.2(f), a stapled and/or bound paper copy of all electronically filed pleadings, including the complaint, must be delivered to chambers (2356) within one business day of filing. Noncompliance with LR 5.2(f) will result in the imposition of a $200.00 fine payable to the Clerk of the Court, 219 South Dearborn Street, 20th Floor, Chicago, Illinois 60604. Parties are directed to discuss settlement and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. They are further directed to meet and confer regarding a proposed discovery plan. See Judge Gottschall's civil case management packet regarding pretrial case management procedures at: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 10/5/2018. Mailed notice(mjc, )
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits). (eaa, )
October 4, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. (jjr, )
October 4, 2018 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. and Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited by Kevin C. Parks (Parks, Kevin)
October 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Energy Intelligence Group, Inc., Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. and Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15026806. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A through D, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Parks, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. et al v. BMO Securities, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMO NESBITT SECURITIES LTD.
Represented By: Anna Jane Mitran
Represented By: Susan J. Kohlmann
Represented By: Benjamin J. Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMO Harris Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Anna Jane Mitran
Represented By: Susan J. Kohlmann
Represented By: Benjamin J. Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Energy Intelligence Group, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin C. Parks
Represented By: Jason Howard Kasner
Represented By: James M Gibson
Represented By: Robert L. Powley
Represented By: Tara Goodarzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Energy Intelligence Group, Inc. and Energy Intelligence Group (UK) Limited
Represented By: Kevin C. Parks
Represented By: Jason Howard Kasner
Represented By: James M Gibson
Represented By: Robert L. Powley
Represented By: Tara Goodarzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?