PNC Bank, National Association, v. Huang

Plaintiff: PNC Bank, National Association,
Defendant: Susan J Huang
Case Number: 1:2018cv06787
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Contract: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 7, 2018 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Rule 16(b) status hearing held on 12/7/2018 with only plaintiff's attorney. Defendant's attorney fails to appear. Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures are to be made by 12/28/2018. Telephone status hearing, to be initiated by the parties, is set for 1/18/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Both sides' attorneys must participate. All discovery ordered closed 3/8/2019. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
December 4, 2018 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: At the Court's instance, the status hearing set for 12/7/2018 is moved to 9:15 AM on that date, in chambers (Room 2188). (mk)
November 19, 2018 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Susan J Huang(Lobb, Lawrence)
November 12, 2018 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Susan J Huang by Lawrence William Lobb (Lobb, Lawrence)
November 9, 2018 7 CERTIFICATE of Service by Justin Kyle Malenius on behalf of PNC Bank, National Association, regarding set/reset hearings,, #6 (Malenius, Justin)
November 9, 2018 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Initial status hearing is set to 9:00 a.m. on 12/7/2018 before Judge Kennelly, in Chambers, Room 2188. Parties are to review and comply with Judge Kennelly's standing initial order, which may be found on his web page, located at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/_forms/_JUDGES/KENNELLY/INIT-ORD.htm. Counsel for plaintiff(s) are ordered to cause a copy of this order to be delivered forthwith to each defendant who has not yet appeared by counsel in the same manner that summons has been or is being served on each defendant. (mk)
October 29, 2018 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PNC Bank, National Association, as to Susan J Huang on 10/28/2018, answer due 11/19/2018. (Malenius, Justin)
October 9, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Susan J Huang (lma, )
October 9, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. (daj, )
October 9, 2018 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff PNC Bank, National Association, by Martin J. Wasserman (Wasserman, Martin)
October 9, 2018 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff PNC Bank, National Association, by Kurt M. Carlson (Carlson, Kurt)
October 9, 2018 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Malenius, Justin)
October 9, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed by PNC Bank, National Association,; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15037619. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - D)(Malenius, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PNC Bank, National Association, v. Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PNC Bank, National Association,
Represented By: Martin J. Wasserman
Represented By: Justin Kyle Malenius
Represented By: Kurt M. Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan J Huang
Represented By: Lawrence William Lobb, -
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?