Tatar v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Jerome A. Tatar
Defendant: CIT Bank N.A., Loancare, LLC, Equifax Information Services, Inc. and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv06857
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Charles R Norgle
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2018 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion for extension of time to answer #21 is granted. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, December 7, 2018. An Agreed Written Status Report is due on 3/1/2019. Mailed notice (ewf, )
November 29, 2018 22 UNOPPOSED - NOTICE of Motion by Rodney L. Lewis for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #21 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 12/7/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Lewis, Rodney)
November 29, 2018 21 MOTION by Defendant Equifax Information Services, Inc. for extension of time to file answer - UNOPPOSED (Lewis, Rodney)
November 15, 2018 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion for extension of time to answer plaintiff's complaint #10 is granted. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, November 16, 2018. An Agreed Written Status Report is due on 1/31/2019.Mailed notice (ewf, )
November 13, 2018 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants CIT Bank N.A., Loancare, LLC by Ethan Geoffrey Ostroff (Ostroff, Ethan)
November 9, 2018 18 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Langston, Nicole)
November 9, 2018 17 ANSWER to Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(Langston, Nicole)
November 9, 2018 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. by Nicole Langston (Langston, Nicole)
November 9, 2018 15 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Loancare, LLC (TrKundmueller, Mark)
November 9, 2018 14 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by CIT Bank N.A. (TrKundmueller, Mark)
November 9, 2018 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by CIT Bank N.A., Loancare, LLC(TrKundmueller, Mark)
November 9, 2018 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants CIT Bank N.A., Loancare, LLC by Mark D. TrKundmueller (TrKundmueller, Mark)
November 8, 2018 11 UNOPPOSED - NOTICE of Motion by Rodney L. Lewis for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #10 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 11/16/2018 at 09:30 AM. (Lewis, Rodney)
November 8, 2018 10 MOTION by Defendant Equifax Information Services, Inc. for extension of time to file answer - UNOPPOSED (Lewis, Rodney)
November 8, 2018 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Equifax Information Services, Inc. by Rodney L. Lewis (Lewis, Rodney)
November 8, 2018 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Equifax Information Services, Inc. by Mary Kathryn Curry (Curry, Mary)
October 22, 2018 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jerome A. Tatar as to Loancare, LLC on 10/19/2018, answer due 11/9/2018. (Tatar, Stephanie)
October 22, 2018 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jerome A. Tatar as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. on 10/19/2018, answer due 11/9/2018. (Tatar, Stephanie)
October 18, 2018 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jerome A. Tatar as to Equifax Information Services, Inc. on 10/18/2018, answer due 11/8/2018. (Tatar, Stephanie)
October 15, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Equifax Information Services, Inc., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Loancare, LLC (ec, )
October 12, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. (pj, )
October 12, 2018 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jerome A. Tatar by Steven J. Uhrich (Uhrich, Steven)
October 12, 2018 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jerome A. Tatar by Stephanie R Tatar (Tatar, Stephanie)
October 12, 2018 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Tatar, Stephanie)
October 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jerome A. Tatar; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15052632.(Tatar, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tatar v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIT Bank N.A.
Represented By: Mark D. Kundmueller
Represented By: Ethan Geoffrey Ostroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loancare, LLC
Represented By: Mark D. Kundmueller
Represented By: Ethan Geoffrey Ostroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, Inc.
Represented By: Mary Kathryn Curry
Represented By: Rodney L. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole Langston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome A. Tatar
Represented By: Stephanie R Tatar
Represented By: Steven J. Uhrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?