Laning v. United States Department of Veterans Affairs et al

Plaintiff: Kenneth Laning
Defendant: Sinai Health System and Stavros Maltezos
Respondent: United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Case Number: 1:2018cv06861
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 28, 2018 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Status hearing held. Plaintiff was unable to appear for today's hearing. Defendant's agreed oral motion to continue their motion to dismiss #3 is granted. Motion is continued to 1/9/19 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (air, )
October 24, 2018 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Motion hearing held. On the parties' agreed oral motion, the respondent's motion to dismiss #3 is taken under advisement pending further negotiations between the parties. A status hearing is set on 11/28/18 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (air, )
October 22, 2018 6 NOTICE of Correction regarding #5 (ph, )
October 18, 2018 5 ENTERED IN ERROR (Heffron, Scott) Modified on 10/22/2018 (ph, ).
October 17, 2018 4 NOTICE of Motion by Scott Dennis Heffron for presentment of motion to dismiss #3 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 10/24/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Heffron, Scott)
October 17, 2018 3 MOTION by Respondent United States Department of Veterans Affairs to dismiss United States' Department of Veterans Affairs Motion To Dismiss (Heffron, Scott)
October 16, 2018 2 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (gcy, )
October 12, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. (pj, )
October 12, 2018 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2017 L 3437) filed by United States Department of Veterans Affairs as to the Petition for Rule to Show Cause (Heffron, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laning v. United States Department of Veterans Affairs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Laning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sinai Health System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stavros Maltezos
Represented By: Thomas R Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Scott Dennis Heffron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?