Cordero v. Torres

Plaintiff: Vincent Cordero
Defendant: David Torres
Case Number: 1:2018cv06863
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: Illinois Northern District Court
0 Judge: Jorge L Alonso
1 Judge: Young B Kim
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2018 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: A status hearing is scheduled for December 11, 2018, at 1:00 p.m. by phone. The conference call number for the status hearing is (877) 336-1839 and the passcode is 4333213. Mailed notice (ma,)
December 4, 2018 15 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case referred to the Honorable Young B. Kim. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/4/2018. (nsf, )
December 4, 2018 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Status hearing held and continued to 3/7/19 at 9:30 a.m. Plaintiff's motion to dismiss Defendant's counterclaim shall be filed by 1/9/19. Defendant's response shall be filed by 1/23/19. Plaintiff's reply in support shall be filed by 2/6/19. Parties' MIDP disclosures shall be served by 12/28/18. Responses to ESI discovery are extended to 1/21/19. All fact discovery shall be notice in time to be completed by 3/29/19. This case is referred to the magistrate judge for discovery supervision, with authority to extend deadlines, and a settlement conference. Notices mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
December 3, 2018 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Counter Defendant Vincent Cordero, Plaintiff Vincent Cordero by Edward David Shapiro (Shapiro, Edward)
November 29, 2018 12 STATUS Report JOINT INITIAL STATUS REPORT by Vincent Cordero (O'Hara, Martin)
November 28, 2018 11 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM filed by David Torres against Vincent Cordero . by David Torres (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Weissberg, Ariel)
November 27, 2018 10 JURY Demand (Weissberg, Ariel)
November 7, 2018 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant David Torres by Rakesh Khanna (Khanna, Rakesh)
November 7, 2018 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant David Torres by Lindsey Louise Purdy (Purdy, Lindsey)
November 7, 2018 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant David Torres by Ariel Weissberg (Weissberg, Ariel)
November 5, 2018 6 Featured Case MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Initial status hearing set for 12/4/18 at 9:30 a.m. Parties shall review and comply with Judge Alonso's Standing Order on The Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project on his website. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
October 15, 2018 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (lf, )
October 12, 2018 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant David Torres (pj, )
October 12, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. (pj, )
October 12, 2018 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Vincent Cordero by Daniel Adam Hantman (Hantman, Daniel)
October 12, 2018 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Vincent Cordero by Martin John O'Hara (O'Hara, Martin)
October 12, 2018 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (O'Hara, Martin)
October 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT filed by Vincent Cordero; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15052750. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(O'Hara, Martin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cordero v. Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Cordero
Represented By: Daniel Adam Hantman
Represented By: Martin John O'Hara
Represented By: Edward David Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Torres
Represented By: Ariel Weissberg
Represented By: Rakesh Khanna
Represented By: Lindsey Louise Purdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?